Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 5:24-cr-00639
Case Filed:May 29, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jun 28, 2024 3:00 AM CDT
Defendant
Cornelio Aguilar (1)
Represented By
Christopher K Woodward
The Law Office Of Christopher K Woodward
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Brian Christopher Bajew
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/28/2024 5:02 AM CDT
Tuesday, April 30, 2024
Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo assigned to case as to Cornelio Aguilar. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00562 *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Cornelio Aguilar (1), filed. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00562 *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
2 2 Statement in Support of Probable Cause by USA as to Cornelio Aguilar, filed. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00562 *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
3 3 MOTION to Seal by USA as to Cornelio Aguilar, filed. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00562 *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER granting3 Motion to Seal as to Cornelio Aguilar (1).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga.) Parties notified. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00562 *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
5 5 MOTION for Issuance of Warrant by USA as to Cornelio Aguilar, filed. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00562 *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER granting5 Motion for Issuance of Warrant as to Cornelio Aguilar (1).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga.) Parties notified. (mtl5) [5:24-mj-00562 *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2024
10 10 MOTION for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum by USA as to Cornelio Aguilar, filed. (dmg5) [5:24-mj-00562 *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Proposed Writ
11 11 ORDER granting10 Motion for Writ of Habeas Corpus ad prosequendum for the appearance of Cornelio Aguilar.(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga.) Parties notified. (scg5) [5:24-mj-00562 *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
12 12 Writ of Habeas Corpus ad Testificandum Issued as to Cornelio Aguilar in case as to Cornelio Aguilar ( Signed by Judge Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga), filed. (scg5) [5:24-mj-00562 *SEALED*]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2024
Judge Marina Garcia Marmolejo assigned to case. (dmg5)
Related: [-]
14 14 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Cornelio Aguilar (1) count(s) 1, 2, 3, filed. (dmg5)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
15 15 MOTION to Seal Indictment, Enter Warrant in NCIC by USA as to Cornelio Aguilar, filed. (dmg5)
Related: [-]
16 16 ORDER granting15 Motion to Seal Indictment as to Cornelio Aguilar (1).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (dmg5)
Related: [-]
17 17 MOTION for Arrest Warrant by USA as to Cornelio Aguilar, filed. (dmg5)
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER granting17 Motion for Warrant as to Cornelio Aguilar (1).(Signed by Magistrate Judge Diana Song Quiroga) Parties notified. (dmg5)
Related: [-]