Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-03732
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2024
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 24, 2024 3:53 AM EST
Defendant
Corteva Inc
Defendant
United Technologies Corporation
Defendant
UTC Fire & Security Americas Corporation Inc
Defendant
Tyco Fire Products LP
Defendant
The Chemours Company FC LLC
Defendant
The Chemours Company
Defendant
National Foam Inc
Defendant
Nation Ford Chemical Company
Defendant
E.I. DuPont De Nemours and Company
Defendant
Dynax Corporation
Defendant
DuPont De Nemours Inc
Defendant
Clariant Corp
Defendant
Chubb Fire LTD
Defendant
Chemguard Inc
Defendant
ChemDesign Products Inc
Defendant
Carrier Global Corporation
Defendant
Buckeye Fire Equipment Company
Defendant
BASF Corporation
Defendant
Arkema Inc
Defendant
AGC Chemicals Amercas Inc
Defendant
3M Company
Plaintiff
Raymond E. Patterson
Represented By
Patrick D McMurtray
Frazer PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/18/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, June 28, 2024
3 3 misc MDL Member Case Opened Fri 06/28 7:51 AM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 06/27/2024), Raymond E. Patterson v. 3M Company et al, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03732-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Western Kentucky (mbon)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Fri 06/28 7:50 AM
Summons Issued as to All Defendants. (mbon) (Main Document 2 replaced on 6/28/2024) (mbon, )
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
1 1 46 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/28 7:49 AM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11848811.), filed by Raymond E. Patterson. Service due by 9/25/2024(mbon)
Related: [-]