South Carolina District Court
Judge:Joseph Dawson, III
Case #: 4:24-cv-03734
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Petition for Removal
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2024
Case in other court:Court of Common Pleas, Twelfth Judicial Circuit, 2024-CP-21-01346
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2024 4:27 AM EST
Defendant
Pavel Storazhau
Represented By
Everett Augustus Kendall, II
Murphy And Grantland (col)
contact info
Timothy John Caiello
Murphy And Grantland (col)
contact info
Defendant
ZV Group, Inc
Represented By
Timothy John Caiello
Murphy And Grantland (col)
contact info
Plaintiff
James F Bagwell
Represented By
James M Saleeby, Jr
Aiken Bridges
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Pava Logistics Inc
Terminated: 09/11/2024
Represented By
Everett Augustus Kendall, II
Murphy And Grantland (col)
contact info
Timothy John Caiello
Murphy And Grantland (col)
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/06/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 31, 2025
17 17 misc Defendant's ID of Expert Witnesses Fri 01/31 4:30 PM
DEFENDANT'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by ZV Group, Inc, Pavel Storazhau.(Caiello, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, January 02, 2025
16 16 misc Plaintiff's ID of Expert Witnesses Thu 01/02 3:22 PM
PLAINTIFF'S ID OF EXPERT WITNESSES by James F Bagwell.(Saleeby, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
14 14 misc Entry Deletion Wed 09/11 2:41 PM
DELETION OF DOCKET ENTRY NUMBER 11 Reason: filed in error by filer. Corrected Filing Document Number: 11 Amended Complaint. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
13 13 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 09/10 5:27 PM
ANSWER to12 Amended Complaint by Pavel Storazhau, ZV Group, Inc.(Caiello, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
12 12 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 09/09 3:52 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT Corrected against Pavel Storazhau, ZV Group, Inc, filed by James F Bagwell. Service due by 12/9/2024 (Saleeby, James)
Related: [-]
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 09/09 3:40 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against James F Bagwell, filed by James F Bagwell. Service due by 12/9/2024 (Saleeby, James)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Scheduling Order Mon 09/09 1:18 PM
AMENDED CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 12/2/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 1/1/2025, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 2/2/2025, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 2/2/2025, Discovery due by 4/3/2025, Motion in Limine due by 6/1/2025, Motions due by 5/4/2025, Rule 26(a)(3) Disclosures due by 7/1/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 8/1/2025, Mediation Due by 5/3/2025. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 9/9/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
9 9 motion Amend/Correct Fri 09/06 2:53 PM
Consent MOTION to Amend/Correct Scheduling Order by Pava Logistics Inc, Pavel Storazhau. Response to Motion due by 9/20/2024. Add an additional 3 days only if served by mail or otherwise allowed under Fed. R. Civ. P. 6 or Fed. R. Crim. P. 45. Proposed order is being emailed to chambers with copy to opposing counsel.(Caiello, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
8 8 discov Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 08/19 3:37 PM
Plaintiff's Local Rule 26.03 Answers to Interrogatories by James F Bagwell.(Saleeby, James)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
7 7 discov Rule 26(f) Report Wed 08/14 2:38 PM
Rule 26(f) Report by Pava Logistics Inc, Pavel Storazhau.(Caiello, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
6 6 order Scheduling Order Tue 07/09 12:00 PM
CONFERENCE AND SCHEDULING ORDER. Rule 26(f) Conference Deadline 7/30/2024, 26(a) Initial Disclosures due by 8/13/2024, Rule 26 Report due by 8/13/2024, Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 9/3/2024, Plaintiffs ID of Expert Witness due by 10/3/2024, Defendants ID of Expert Witnesses Due by 11/4/2024, Records Custodian Affidavit due by 11/4/2024, Discovery due by 1/3/2025, Motions due by 2/3/2025, Jury Selection Deadline 5/5/2025, Mediation Due by 1/3/2025. Signed by the Honorable Joseph Dawson, III on 7/9/2024. (lgib, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
5 5 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/03 4:58 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by Pava Logistics Inc, Pavel Storazhau.(Caiello, Timothy)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
4 4 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Mon 07/01 3:05 PM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by James F Bagwell.(Saleeby, James)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
3 3 discov Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories Fri 06/28 9:38 AM
Local Rule 26.01 Answers to Interrogatories by Pava Logistics Inc, Pavel Storazhau.(swel, )
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Fri 06/28 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Court of Common Pleas Twelfth Judicial Circuit, case number 2024-CP 21-01346 (Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11848725), filed by Pava Logistics Inc, Pavel Storazhau.(swel, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 State Court Documents