Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Robin L Rosenberg
Referred: Bruce E Reinhart
Case #: 9:24-cv-80795
Nature of Suit870 Federal Tax Suits - Taxes (U.S. Plaintiff or Defendant)
CauseTransmission of Proposed Findings of Fact and Concl. of Law
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2024
Terminated:Nov 20, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2024 5:39 AM EST
Defendant
Christopher Walsh
402 NW 10th Terrace
Boca Raton, FL 33431
Defendant
Karen Corcoran Walsh
402 NW 10th Terrace
Boca Raton, FL 33432
Plaintiff
United States Of America
U.S. Department of Justice, Tax Division P.O. Box 14198 Ben Franklin Station
Washington, DC 20044
Represented By
Christopher Merino
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
35 35 order Miscellaneous Case - Closeout Wed 11/20 4:54 PM
PAPERLESS Order directing the Clerk of Court to close this matter in light of the default posture of the case. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
34 34 order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 11/20 4:53 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting32 Motion for Default Judgment. Defendant Christopher Walsh has asserted no cognizable claims to the subject real property so the Court APPROVES the administrative levy on Defendant Christopher Walsh's Property located at 402 NE 10th Ter., Boca Raton, Florida 33432, to be executed by any authorized officer of the IRS. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
33 33 order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Wed 11/20 4:52 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting31 Motion for Default Judgment. Because Defendant Karen Walsh has failed to assert any cognizable claim to the subject real property the Court APPROVES the administrative levy on Defendant Karen Walsh's Property located at 402 NE 10th Ter., Boca Raton, Florida 33432, to be executed by any authorized officer of the IRS. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Thu 11/21 8:30 AM
Deadline(s) terminated per DE 35 . (wce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
32 32 motion Default Judgment Tue 11/05 8:34 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Christopher Walsh by United States Of America.(Merino, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Christopher Merino,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
31 31 motion Default Judgment Tue 11/05 8:31 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Karen Corcoran Walsh by United States Of America.(Merino, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Christopher Merino,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, November 01, 2024
30 30 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Fri 11/01 8:36 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Karen Corcoran Walsh, Christopher Walsh - Motions Terminated:28 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default,29 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 11/1/2024. (cds)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT Fri 11/01 7:46 AM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Christopher Walsh by United States Of America.(Merino, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
28 28 motion CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT Fri 11/01 7:44 AM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Karen Corcoran Walsh by United States Of America.(Merino, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Friday, October 04, 2024
27 27 order Order on Motion for Default Judgment Order on Motion to Vacate Fri 10/04 10:00 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting the Defendants' Motion to Vacate Default22 and denying as moot the Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment20 . The Court's prior entry of default is vacated. The Court also grants the Defendants an extension of time through October 30, 2024, to file an answer or responsive motion to the Complaint. However, as this case is now four months old and as the Court has granted multiple extensions of time, this extension shall be the final extension. The parties should expect no further extensions of time until the pleadings in this matter have closed. In the event the Defendants do not file an answer or responsive motion by October 30, 2024, the Plaintiff shall file a motion for default by November 7, 2024, and a motion for final default judgment by November 14, 2024. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
utility ~Util - Set/Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline Fri 10/04 10:25 AM
Reset Response/Answer Due Deadline: Christopher Walsh response/answer due 10/30/2024; Karen Corcoran Walsh response/answer due 10/30/2024. (ls)(per DE #27)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
26 26 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Wed 10/02 10:00 AM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re24 Notice (Other). Wrong Event Selected ; ERROR - The Filer selected the wrong event. The document was re-docketed by the Clerk, see [de [25 ]. It is not necessary to refile this document. (wce)
Related: [-]
25 25 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Wed 10/02 9:59 AM
UNITED STATES' NOTICE OF OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS'22 MOTION TO VACATE20 filed by United States Of America re Order at DE 23 . Replies due by 10/9/2024. (Please see DE24 for Image)(wce) Modified Text on 10/2/2024 (wce)
Related: [-]
24 24 notice Notice (Other) Wed 10/02 7:27 AM
NOTICE of Opposition by United States Of America re 23 Order (Merino, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
23 23 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 09/30 1:56 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER requiring the Plaintiff to inform the Court whether the motion at docket entry 22 is opposed or unopposed. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
21 21 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Mon 09/30 10:19 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting19 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
22 22 motion Vacate Mon 09/30 11:07 AM
VERIFIED MOTION TO VACATE20 DEFAULT by Christopher Walsh, and Karen Corcoran Walsh. Responses due by 10/11/2024. (wce)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
20 20 motion Default Judgment Tue 09/24 6:35 PM
MOTION for Default Judgment against Karen Corcoran Walsh by United States Of America.(Merino, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Merino Declaration,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order
19 19 motion Extension of Time Tue 09/24 6:30 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to file Motion for Default Judgment re 18 Order, by United States Of America. Responses due by 10/8/2024.(Merino, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, September 13, 2024
18 18 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Fri 09/13 3:31 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER vacating the Clerk of the Court's non-entry of default at docket entry 17. Because Defendant Karen Walsh has not filed a responsive motion or pleading to the Complaint, the Court enters a default against Defendant Karen Walsh. This case remains pending against Defendant Christopher Walsh. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
17 17 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Fri 09/13 3:19 PM
Clerk's Non-Entry of Default as to Karen Corcoran Walsh. DENYING16 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Reason: Responsive pleading (i.e. Motion for Extension of Time to File Answer to Complaint, Motion to Dismiss Complaint, etc) has been filed/ Extension of Time Granted at DE 15 Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 9/13/2024. (wce)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT Fri 09/13 2:17 PM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Karen Corcoran Walsh by United States Of America. (Merino, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
15 15 order Order on Motion to Vacate Mon 09/09 9:27 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER denying as moot14 Motion to Vacate Default as there is no default for this Court to vacate. To the extent Defendant Christopher Walsh seeks an extension of time to answer the Plaintiff's Complaint, that request is granted. The deadline is extended to September 30, 2024. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
14 14 motion Vacate Mon 09/09 8:41 AM
Verified MOTION to Vacate11 Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default by Christopher Walsh (Address Updated). Responses due by 9/20/2024. (pcs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
13 13 order Order on Motion to Vacate Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 08/29 5:11 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting12 Motion to Vacate. The Clerk's entry of default is hereby VACATED. Defendant Karen Walsh shall file a responsive pleading or motion by September 9, 2024. In the event the Defendant does not do so, the Plaintiff shall again file a motion for default. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
12 12 motion Vacate Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Thu 08/29 4:30 PM
Verified Motion to Vacate11 Clerk's Entry of Default and MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Petition (Complaint) by Karen Corcoran Walsh. Responses due by 9/12/2024. (wce)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Clerk's Entry/Non-Entry of Default - FORM Thu 08/29 10:17 AM
Clerk's Entry of Default as to Karen Corcoran Walsh. Granting10 Motion for Clerks Entry of Default. Signed by DEPUTY CLERK on 8/29/2024. (wce)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT Thu 08/29 9:45 AM
MOTION for Clerk's Entry of Default as to Karen Corcoran Walsh by United States Of America.(Merino, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
Thursday, August 15, 2024
9 9 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Thu 08/15 7:36 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Petition (Complaint) RE: Government Agency, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States Of America. Christopher Walsh served on 8/14/2024, response/answer due 9/4/2024. (Merino, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
8 8 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 08/09 8:49 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Answer to a Complaint or Other Case Initiating Document. Karen Corcoran Walsh Response/Answer due 8/23/2024. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg (bkd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer Fri 08/09 8:25 AM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply/Answer as to1 Petition (Complaint) RE: Government Agency, by Karen Corcoran Walsh. (ls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
6 6 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Wed 07/31 11:39 AM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Petition (Complaint) RE: Government Agency, with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by United States Of America. Karen Corcoran Walsh served on 7/19/2024, response/answer due 8/9/2024. (Merino, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
5 5 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 07/29 3:35 PM
STANDING DISCOVERY ORDER FOR MAGISTRATE JUDGE BRUCE REINHART. Signed by Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart on 7/29/2024. See attached document for full details. (wce)
Related: [-]
4 4 3 pgs order Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 07/29 11:21 AM
ORDER Of Reference To Magistrate Judge And Order Of Court-Mandated Requirements On Service, Defaults, And Joint Scheduling Reports. Signed by Judge Robin L. Rosenberg on 7/29/2024. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 06/28 2:24 PM
Summons Issued as to Christopher Walsh, and Karen Corcoran Walsh.(wce)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 06/28 2:18 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Robin L. Rosenberg and Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Bruce E. Reinhart is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (wce)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition (Complaint) RE: Government Agency Fri 06/28 12:02 PM
PETITION (Complaint) for Judicial Approval of a Levy Upon a Principal Residence RE: Government Agency . Filing fee $ 52.00. USA Filer - No Filing Fee Required, filed by United States Of America.(Merino, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit RO Lee Declaration,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Summon(s) Karen Corcoran Walsh Summons,
Att: 4 Summon(s) Christopher Walsh Summons