Georgia Middle District Court
Judge:Leslie Abrams Gardner
Case #: 1:24-cv-00095
Nature of Suit350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Tort/Motor Vehicle (
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2024
Terminated:Feb 26, 2025
Case in other court:Dougherty County State Court, STSV2024000065
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2024 3:35 AM EST
Defendant
SERGIY GREBBINNYK
Represented By
MICHAEL DAVID HOSTETTER
contact info
Defendant
PVG TRUCKING INC
Represented By
MICHAEL DAVID HOSTETTER
contact info
Plaintiff
ALICIA SOILBERRY
Represented By
MICHAEL A MILLS
contact info
KYLE WILLIAM CHAPEL
contact info
JAMES ANDREW HOLCOMB
contact info
MICHAEL PIERCE
contact info


Docket last updated: 70 minutes ago
Monday, April 28, 2025
utility REMARK Mon 04/28 10:06 AM
REMARK : In light of26 Stipulation of Dismissal this case has been closed. (mdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
26 26 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 03/28 11:21 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by ALICIA SOILBERRY as to All Parties(CHAPEL, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
25 25 1 pgs order Order Wed 02/26 2:44 PM
ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk of Court to administratively close the case in order to allow the Parties to finalize the settlement agreement at issue re22 Notice of Settlement filed by ALICIA SOILBERRY Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 2/26/2025. (mdp)
Related: [-]
24 24 2 pgs order Order Wed 02/26 2:39 PM
ORDER DISMISSING ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re21 RESPONSE to Court Order filed by ALICIA SOILBERRY Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 2/26/2025. (mdp)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
23 23 notice Notice of Settlement Fri 02/07 10:58 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by ALICIA SOILBERRY(CHAPEL, KYLE)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Fri 02/07 9:48 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; The PACER login ID and password used to electronically file a document constitutes the Participants electronic signature for all purposes under the Federal Rules. Document must be re-filed using the user credentials of the name of the attorney in the signature block. See CM/ECF Administrative Procedures.(bcl)
Related: [-] 22 Notice of Settlement filed by ALICIA SOILBERRY
Thursday, February 06, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Settlement Thu 02/06 11:07 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by ALICIA SOILBERRY(CHAPEL, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
21 21 respoth Response to Court Order Fri 12/27 11:15 AM
RESPONSE to Court Order filed by ALICIA SOILBERRY re 18 Motion Hearing,, (MILLS, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 19, 2024
20 20 cmp Amended Complaint/Petition Thu 12/19 6:54 PM
AMENDED1 Notice of Removal (IFP),, against All Defendants by ALICIA SOILBERRY (CHAPEL, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
19 19 misc Transcript of Proceedings Tue 12/17 9:57 AM
TRANSCRIPT of Proceedings held on 12/11/2024, before Judge Leslie Abrams Gardner. Court Reporter/Transcriber Lisa Snyder. The transcript may be inspected at the court or purchased through the court reporter for a period of 90 days. After 90 days, the transcript may be obtained via PACER. REDACTION OF TRANSCRIPTS: Complete redaction policy available on the courts website. (Snyder, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
18 18 minutes Motion Hearing Mon 12/16 9:29 AM
TEXT ONLY Minute Entry (content for administrative purposes only) for proceedings held before CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER: Motion Hearing held on 12/11/2024 re9 MOTION to Remand filed by ALICIA SOILBERRY DENIED,15 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint filed by ALICIA SOILBERRY GRANTED, Plaintiff's counsel has 21 days from the day of this hearing to show cause as to why sanctions for bad faith should not apply. (Court Reporter Lisa Snyder.) Court Reporter: Lisa Snyder.Time in Court: 14 minutes. (mab)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
17 17 misc Stipulation Tue 11/19 5:55 PM
STIPULATION of Confidentiality and Protective Order by ALICIA SOILBERRY (CHAPEL, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing on Motion Thu 11/14 11:40 AM
Motion Hearing set for 12/11/2024 03:30 PM in Albany before CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER. NOTICE OF SETTING HEARING ON MOTION re9 MOTION to Remand ,15 MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint. (mab)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
notice Notice of Deficiency Mon 10/21 10:38 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Discovery is not filed in the Middle District of Georgia. Please do not file discovery in the future. Do not file notices or certificates regarding discovery. See Local Rule 5.1 and the CM/ECF Administrative Procedures.(mdm)
Related: [-] 16 Notice (Other) filed by ALICIA SOILBERRY
Friday, October 18, 2024
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Fri 10/18 8:28 PM
NOTICE Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena for Production of Documents by ALICIA SOILBERRY(CHAPEL, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summons Subpoena to FedEx,
Att: 2 Summons Subpoena to Mathis
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
notice Notice of Deficiency Tue 10/08 10:59 AM
Notice of Deficiency Related [+]; Notice to Counsel MICHAEL PIERCE . The email address on the document (michael@pstriallaw.com) does not match your email address in CM/ECF (michael@psbfirm.com). If necessary, please update your e mail address via PACER. Notice of Deficiency; Notice to Counsel KYLE CHAPEL The signature block does not include your email address as the filer. Please do not re-file, for future reference only . See Fed.R.Civ.P 11.(ggs)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Leave to File filed by ALICIA SOILBERRY 15 Motion for Leave to File filed by ALICIA SOILBERRY
Monday, October 07, 2024
15 15 motion Leave to File Mon 10/07 6:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to File First Amended Complaint by ALICIA SOILBERRY filed by KYLE WILLIAM CHAPEL.(CHAPEL, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit A-First Amended Complaint
Thursday, September 26, 2024
14 14 misc Letter Thu 09/26 6:54 PM
Letter regarding Pending Motion to Remand re9 MOTION to Remand ,10 Response to Motion (HOLCOMB, JAMES)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Attorney Admission Fee Met Thu 09/26 10:34 AM
Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by KYLE WILLIAM CHAPEL. (ksl)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice Thu 09/26 10:26 AM
PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of ALICIA SOILBERRY Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4758956, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Michael A. Mills Georgia Bar No. 509720.(CHAPEL, KYLE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing Southern District of Texas
Thursday, August 15, 2024
11 11 order Scheduling/Discovery Order Thu 08/15 3:00 PM
SCHEDULING/DISCOVERY ORDER :Discovery to be complete by 3/3/2025. Dispositive motions due by 3/31/2025. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 08/15/2024.(mdm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Scheduling & Discovery Order
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
10 10 respm Response to Motion Wed 08/14 4:33 PM
RESPONSE filed by SERGIY GREBBINNYK, PVG TRUCKING INC re9 MOTION to Remand(HOSTETTER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Police Report
Thursday, July 25, 2024
9 9 motion Remand Thu 07/25 12:52 PM
MOTION to Remand by ALICIA SOILBERRY filed by MICHAEL A MILLS.(MILLS, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
8 8 misc Attorney Admission Fee Met Tue 07/16 3:42 PM
Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by MICHAEL PIERCE (mdm)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/16 2:15 PM
PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # BGAMDC-4699831, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Michael A Mills GA Bar No. 509720.(PIERCE, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing Eastern District for Michael Pierce
Monday, July 15, 2024
6 6 misc Attorney Admission Fee Met Mon 07/15 12:28 PM
Order granting Petition for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Petition Attached); Attorney Admission Fee Met by JAMES ANDREW HOLCOMB. (ksl)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Petition to the Clerk for Admission to Plead and Practice Pro Hac Vice Mon 07/15 12:24 PM
PETITION TO THE CLERK FOR ADMISSION TO PLEAD AND PRACTICE PRO HAC VICE on behalf of All Plaintiffs Attorney Admission Fee (Pro Hac Vice) paid by Receipt # AGAMDC-4698367, $100. LOCAL COUNSEL Name and Georgia Bar #: Michael A Mills GA Bar No. 509720.(HOLCOMB, JAMES)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Good Standing Eastern District of Texas
Monday, July 08, 2024
4 4 6 pgs order Order - Rules 16/26 Mon 07/08 10:41 AM
RULES 16/26 ORDER :Proposed Scheduling/Discovery order due by 8/8/2024. Ordered by CHIEF DISTRICT JUDGE LESLIE ABRAMS GARDNER on 7/8/2024.(fad)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Required Form
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
3 3 misc Jurisdictional Statement Wed 07/03 1:34 PM
Jurisdictional Statement by PVG TRUCKING INC (HOSTETTER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/03 1:33 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by SERGIY GREBBINNYK, PVG TRUCKING INC (HOSTETTER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Deficiency Wed 07/03 10:13 AM
Notice of Deficiency PVG TRUCKING INC: All nongovernmental corporate parties must file a Corporate Disclosure Statement. Please file the required corporate disclosures immediately. See Local Rule 87.1 Notice of Deficiency PVG TRUCKING INC:In diversity cases, a Jurisdictional Statement must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties. Please file the required statement immediately. See Local Rule 87.2.(mdm)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
notice Notice to Attorney Re: Admissions Requirement Mon 07/01 9:23 AM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL - MICHAEL E. PIERCE: Counsel is notified that they do not show in the court records that they meet the required attorney admissions policies of this court. If within 14 days of this notice all requirements, including the payment of Pro Hac Vice or admissions fees, have not been met, a show cause hearing will be scheduled. PLEASE BE ADVISED you will not receive electronic notification of electronic filings until you comply with the admissions requirements .(mdm)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (IFP) Fri 06/28 12:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL (IFP) against All Plaintiffs All parties must refile pending motions from the court of origin in this new case. (HOSTETTER, MICHAEL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Complaint,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Defendants' Request for Admissions to Plaintiff,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - Plaintiff's Response to Defendants' Request for Admissions,
Att: 5 Exhibit D - Emails between Counsel