Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:24-bk-00869

Iowa Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Lee M Jackwig
Case #: 4:24-ap-30018
Nature of Suit11 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §542 turnover of property
Case Filed:Jun 27, 2024
Terminated:Jul 29, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Montezuma State Bank
PO Box 128
Montezuma, IA 50171
Represented By
Montezuma State Bank
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Dean Widmer
4353 Highway 63
Malcolm, IA 50157
Represented By
Jeffrey Douglas Goetz
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Monday, July 29, 2024
court Corrective Entry Mon 07/29 9:13 AM
Corrective Entry Incorrect docket event Related [+] (tls)
Related: [-] 15 Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss of Adversary Proceeding filed by Plaintiff Kevin Dean Widmer
court Close Case - Adversary Mon 07/29 9:38 AM
Adversary Case Closed 24-30018 tls)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
16 16 court Notice of Dismissal Mon 07/29 9:34 AM
Notice of Dismissal With Prejudice. (tls)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Dismiss - Motion to (filed by Plaintiff) Fri 07/26 4:58 PM
Error: Incorrect docket event. See #16. Plaintiff's Motion to Dismiss of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Kevin Dean Widmer (Goetz, Jeffrey)Modified on 7/29/2024 (tls)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 20, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 07/20 11:10 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/20/2024. Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, July 19, 2024
13 13 order Order Fri 07/19 7:53 AM
Limited Docket Text Notice Regarding Notice of August 8, 2024 Hearing. Paragraph 5 in Docket Number 12 is hereby amended to read as follows: If the parties intend to rely upon exhibits at the time of the hearing, at least one full week before the hearing date they must (a) exchange marked exhibits, (b) submit copies of those exhibits directly to the assigned judge's chambers in disc or USB drive format, and (c) file only their respective list of exhibits and witnesses with the Clerk of Court. Plaintiff shall use consecutive numbers. Defendant shall use consecutive letters. If an exhibit consists of more than one page, the party offering the exhibit shall number the pages. Beyond notice of electronic filing service of this notice is waived. This notice has been entered on the docket as directed by Judge Jackwig. Related [+] (tls)
Related: [-] 12 Hearing Set
Thursday, July 18, 2024
12 12 court Judge Jackwig Hearing Thu 07/18 4:18 PM
Hearing Scheduled Related [+] Hearing scheduled 8/8/2024 at 09:30 AM at Historic U.S. Courthouse - Des Moines. (tls)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kevin Dean Widmer
11 11 order Order Thu 07/18 2:52 PM
Minute Order < none; instead: Docket Text Order Regarding July 18, 2024 Hearing on Contested Motion to Extend the Automatic Stay, Contested Motion for Relief from Stay, and Emergency Complaint for Turnover under Adversary Proceeding 24-30018 lmj. The Court hereby Orders that: The Clerk of Court shall schedule these three matters for an evidentiary hearing commencing at 9:30 a.m. on Thursday August 8, 2024 and shall serve the hearing notice and order electronically. Upon receipt, the attorneys of record shall convey the information about the hearing to their clients. Beyond notice of electronic filing, service of this order is waived. Audio Track 5; Appearances: Mr. Goetz and Ms. Eddie for Debtor, and Mr. Carls for Montezuma State Bank. This order has been entered on the docket as directed by Judge Jackwig. Related [+] (tls)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,7 Motion
Friday, July 12, 2024
10 10 court Hearing Continued or Rescheduled Fri 07/12 10:45 AM
DOCKET TEXT ORDER ON UNCONTESTED MOTION TO CONTINUE HEARING AND DOCKET TEXT NOTICE OF RESCHEDULED HEARING DATE. (1) The motion to continue the July 15, 2024 hearing is granted. (2) The rescheduled hearing will commence on July 18, 2024 at 10:00 a.m. (No separate notice and order regarding hearing will be entered. The parties shall abide by the directives in the prior notice and order.) (3) Beyond notice of electronic filing, service of this order and notice is waived. This order and notice has been entered on the docket as directed by the Judge assigned to the case Related [+] Hearing scheduled 7/18/2024 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Hrg with Judge Jackwig. (tls)
Related: [-] 7 Motion For Expedited Hearing filed by Plaintiff Kevin Dean Widmer
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
9 9 court Judge Jackwig Hearing Wed 07/03 2:45 PM
Docket Text Notice of Hearing (Telephonic, No Testimony) Regarding "Debtor's Motion for Expedited Hearing on Debtors First Amended Emergency Complaint to Require Montezuma State Bank to Turnover Property of the Bankruptcy Estate" filed yesterday at Docket Number 7 in Adversary Proceeding Number 24-30018 lmj. The Court will take the amended complaint into account at least preliminarily in conjunction with the previously scheduled preliminary hearing on the contested motion for relief from stay during the 2:00 p.m. session on July 15, 2024--after concluding the hearings in the other cases scheduled during the same time frame. (No separate formal notice of hearing will be entered. The parties shall abide by the directives in the prior notice.) Beyond notice of electronic filing, service of this notice of hearing is waived. This notice has been entered on the docket as directed by Judge Jackwig. Related [+] Hearing scheduled 7/15/2024 at 02:00 PM at Telephonic Hrg with Judge Jackwig.(acw)
Related: [-] 7 Motion For Expedited Hearing filed by Plaintiff Kevin Dean Widmer
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate Of Service Tue 07/02 2:01 PM
Certificate Of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kevin Dean Widmer Related [+]. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 6 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kevin Dean Widmer,7 Motion filed by Plaintiff Kevin Dean Widmer
7 7 motion motion Tue 07/02 12:07 PM
Motion For Expedited Hearing Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Kevin Dean Widmer (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 07/02 10:53 AM
Amended Complaint by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Kevin Dean Widmer against Montezuma State Bank Related [+]. (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kevin Dean Widmer
Monday, July 01, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Mon 07/01 12:05 PM
Summons Service Executed On Montezuma State Bank 6/28/2024 (ccc)
Related: [-]
4 4 order Refund - Order Mon 07/01 10:08 AM
Order Granting Motion for Refund Related [+]. (Megan Weiss)
Related: [-] 3
3 3 motion Refund Mon 07/01 10:06 AM
Motion for Refund Related [+]. Filed by Jeffrey Douglas Goetz on behalf of Kevin Dean Widmer. (ccc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Kevin Dean Widmer
Friday, June 28, 2024
2 2 court Summons and Notice Issued Fri 06/28 11:56 AM
Summons and Notice Issued on Montezuma State Bank Answer Due 07/28/2024. (ajmk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 27, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Thu 06/27 5:16 PM
Adversary case 24-30018 Complaint by Kevin Dean Widmer against Montezuma State Bank. Fee Amount $350 (11 (Recovery of money/property - 542 turnover of property)) Lead Case No. 4:24-bk-869 (Goetz, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]