Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Michael J Truncale
Referred: Christine L Stetson
Case #: 1:24-cv-00256
Nature of Suit550 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2024
Terminated:Jul 02, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Monday, July 22, 2024
misc Docket Annotation Mon 07/22 3:54 PM
Case transferred to the Abilene Division of the US District Court for the Northern District of TX. (tkd)
Related: [-]
misc Docket Annotation Tue 07/23 10:07 AM
Case transferred from Texas Eastern has been opened in Northern District of Texas as case 1:24-cv-00118, filed 07/22/2024. (tkd)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
3 3 2 pgs order Memorandum & Opinion Wed 07/03 1:13 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION REGARDING VENUE. It is ordered that this civil rights action is TRANSFERRED to Abilene Division of the United States District Court for the Northern District of Texas. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 7/2/24. (kcv)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
2 2 cmp Complaint Fri 06/28 3:00 PM
COMPLAINT against Unknown Robertson Unit Defts (severed from Civil Action 1:24cv247 , filed by Francisco Javier Rivera.(tkd)
Related: [-]
1 1 2 pgs order Order Fri 06/28 2:57 PM
ORDER OF SEVERANCE. Pltf's claims which occurred at the Robertson Unit are severed from case 1:24cv247 and will proceed as a separate civil rights action. Signed by Magistrate Judge Christine L. Stetson on 6/28/24. (tkd)
Related: [-]
utility Case Referred to Magistrate Judge Fri 06/28 3:00 PM
CASE REFERRED to Magistrate Judge Christine Stetson pursuant to a Standing Order (tkd)
Related: [-]