Texas Western District Court
Judge:Alan D Albright
Case #: 1:24-cv-00727
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:100 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2024 3:53 AM CST
Defendant
Kahoot! EDU, Inc.
Represented By
Paul R. Genender
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Rudolph Y. Kim
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Eric Lin
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kahoot! ASA
Represented By
Paul R. Genender
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Rudolph Y. Kim
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Eric Lin
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Interstellar Inc.
Represented By
Mishell B. Kneeland
Culhane Meadows PLLC
contact info
Anna Brook
Cm Law PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Thu 03/27 1:54 PM
ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Alan D Albright for all proceedings. Judge Robert Pitman no longer assigned to case. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (bot2)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Stay Case Tue 03/25 9:51 AM
Text Order GRANTING19 Motion to Stay Case entered by Judge Robert Pitman. In light of the lack of opposition and for good cause shown, IT IS ORDERED that this case is STAYED pending final resolution of the inter partes review of U.S. Patent No. 10,339,825. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall file quarterly status reports on the progress of the IPR and other relevant matters, with the first report due on June 25, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc)
Related: [-]
utility Case Stayed Tue 03/25 2:29 PM
Case Stayed (pg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
19 19 motion Stay Case Mon 03/24 6:10 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Stay Case Pending Inter Partes Review by Kahoot! ASA, Kahoot! EDU, Inc..(Genender, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
18 18 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Wed 02/12 5:12 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Kahoot! EDU, Inc., Kahoot! ASA identifying Other Affiliate Kangaroo HoldCo AS for Kahoot! ASA, Kahoot! EDU, Inc.. (Genender, Paul)
Related: [-]
17 17 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 02/12 5:09 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, by Kahoot! EDU, Inc., Kahoot! ASA.(Genender, Paul)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
16 16 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 4:20 PM
ORDER GRANTING12 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Eric Lin for Kahoot! ASA,Eric Lin for Kahoot! EDU, Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center, Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 11/25 4:19 PM
ORDER GRANTING11 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Rudolph Y. Kim for Kahoot! ASA,Rudolph Y. Kim for Kahoot! EDU, Inc. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
14 14 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/21 3:23 PM
ORDER GRANTING13 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Anna S. Brooks for Interstellar Inc.. Pursuant to our Administrative Policies and Procedures for Electronic Filing, the attorney hereby granted to practice pro hac vice in this case must register for electronic filing with our court within 10 days of this order. Registration is managed by the PACER Service Center. Signed by Judge Robert Pitman. (pg)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Thu 11/21 10:58 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Mishell B. Kneeland for Anna Brook ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19498094) by on behalf of Interstellar Inc.. (Kneeland, Mishell)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 11/21 10:53 AM
Text Order GRANTING10 Motion for Extension of Time to Answer entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Defendant Kahoot! EDU, Inc. shall answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's complaint on or before February 12, 2025. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Thu 11/21 4:59 PM
Reset Deadlines: Kahoot! EDU, Inc. answer due 2/12/2025. (pg)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
12 12 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/20 7:32 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul R. Genender on behalf of Eric W. Lin ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19495414) by on behalf of Kahoot! EDU, Inc., Kahoot! ASA. (Genender, Paul)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 11/20 7:30 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice by Paul R. Genender on behalf of Rudolph Y. Kim ( Filing fee $ 100 receipt number ATXWDC-19495408) by on behalf of Kahoot! EDU, Inc., Kahoot! ASA. (Genender, Paul)
Related: [-]
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 11/20 7:23 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, by Kahoot! EDU, Inc..(Genender, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11/19 8:49 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Interstellar Inc. as to Kahoot! EDU, Inc.. Waiver sent on 11/18/2024, answer due 1/17/2025. (Kneeland, Mishell)
Related: [-]
8 8 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 11/19 8:46 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Interstellar Inc. as to Kahoot! ASA. Waiver sent on 11/18/2024, answer due 2/18/2025. (Kneeland, Mishell)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 09/25 9:20 AM
Text Order GRANTING7 Motion for Extension of Time to File entered by Judge Robert Pitman. IT IS ORDERED that Plaintiff shall serve Defendants with the summons and complaint on or before November 25, 2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (tclc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
7 7 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 09/24 8:25 AM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Proof of Service and to Extend Time to Serve Summons and Complaint by Interstellar Inc..(Kneeland, Mishell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 01, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Mon 07/01 11:01 AM
Summons Issued as to Kahoot! ASA, Kahoot! EDU, Inc.. (kp)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
5 5 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 06/28 2:22 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Interstellar Inc.. to Kahoot! ASA (Kneeland, Mishell)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Request for Issuance of Summons Fri 06/28 2:21 PM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS by Interstellar Inc.. to Kahoot! EDU (Kneeland, Mishell)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Disclosure Statement (Rule 7) Fri 06/28 2:19 PM
RULE 7 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Interstellar Inc.. (Kneeland, Mishell)
Related: [-]
2 2 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Fri 06/28 2:17 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 forwarded to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Kneeland, Mishell)
Related: [-]
1 1 12 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/28 2:15 PM
COMPLAINT ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXWDC-18930953), filed by Interstellar Inc..(Kneeland, Mishell)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Mon 07/01 10:59 AM
Case assigned to Judge Robert Pitman. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc To be Referred to AU Mag Judge Mon 07/01 11:00 AM
If ordered by the court, all referrals and consents in this case will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Susan Hightower. (kp)
Related: [-]
misc Jury Demand Mon 07/01 11:00 AM
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Interstellar Inc.. (kp)
Related: [-]