California Central District Court
Judge:Michael W Fitzgerald
Referred: Jean P Rosenbluth
Case #: 2:24-cv-05518
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Conversion
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2024
Terminated:Nov 27, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2024 12:49 AM PST
Defendant
Aidah Binti Abdullah
Defendant
Abdul Mukti Bin Jantan
Plaintiff
MTD Investments, Inc.
Represented By
Matthew S Kenefick
Jeffer Mangels Butler And Mitchell LLP
contact info
Sebastien B Nguyen
Jeffer Mangels Butler And Mitchell LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 60 minutes ago
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
18 18 motion Dismiss Case Wed 11/27 2:15 PM
REQUEST to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiff MTD Investments, Inc. MTD Investments, Inc.. (Kenefick, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
17 17 1 pgs order Order to Show Cause Tue 10/29 10:11 AM
COURT ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. Show Cause Hearing set for 12/2/2024 at 11:30 AM before Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. (rs)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 25, 2024
16 16 misc Response Fri 10/25 2:04 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff MTD Investments, Inc.to Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Set/Reset Deadlines,15 Plaintiff MTD Investments, Inc.'s Response to Minute Order Re Transfer of Case; Order Extending Deadline to Respond to Order to Show Cause (Kenefick, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
15 15 order Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Fri 10/11 12:00 PM
MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER RE TRANSFER OF CASE; ORDER EXTENDING DEADLINE TO RESPOND TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. For good cause shown in the Response, the Court now EXTENDS the deadline to respond to the OSC to OCTOBER 25, 2024. (iv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
14 14 notice Notice of Reassignment (CV-87) of Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Wed 10/09 3:55 PM
NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver to Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:24-cv-05518 MWF(JPRx). (rn)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
13 13 misc Response Tue 10/08 12:34 PM
RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff MTD Investments, Inc.to Generic Text Only Entry,, 12 Plaintiff MTD Investments, Inc.'s Response to Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution (Kenefick, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
12 12 textonly Generic Text Only Entry Tue 10/01 11:22 AM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION by Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. Plaintiff is ordered to show cause in writing no later than October 8, 2024 why this action should not be dismissed for lack of prosecution. The Court will consider the filing of a Proof of service of summons and complaint as an appropriate response to this OSC. Failure to respond to the Court's Order may result in the dismissal of the action. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (edr)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
11 11 misc Consent to Proceed (CV-11C) before US Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program Non-Final Fri 09/27 10:53 AM
STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge (Kenefick, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
10 10 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-14) Reminder re MJ Civil Consent Pilot Project-optional html form Fri 08/02 11:26 AM
REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. (jm)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Affidavit Fri 08/02 7:58 AM
AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Aidah Binti Abdullah re Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)5 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Affidavit of Due Dilgence filed by Plaintiff MTD Investments, Inc. (Kenefick, Matthew)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Affidavit Fri 08/02 7:56 AM
AFFIDAVIT by affiant: Abdul Mukti Bin Jantan re Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening)5 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 Affidavit of Due Diligence filed by Plaintiff MTD Investments, Inc. (Kenefick, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
7 7 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Wed 07/03 10:57 AM
NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff MTD Investments, Inc., identifying MTD Equity Sdn. Bhd. and MTD Capital Bhd.. (Kenefick, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
6 6 notice Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening Mon 07/01 2:52 PM
NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (sh)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Mon 07/01 2:51 PM
21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 as to Defendants Aidah Binti Abdullah, Abdul Mukti Bin Jantan. (sh)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice to Counsel (CV-20a) Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program - optional html form Mon 07/01 2:49 PM
NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (sh)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 CV-11C
Friday, June 28, 2024
3 3 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 06/28 2:32 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MTD Investments, Inc.. (Kenefick, Matthew)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Summons Request Fri 06/28 2:31 PM
Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 filed by Plaintiff MTD Investments, Inc.. (Kenefick, Matthew)
Related: [-]
1 1 4 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 06/28 2:28 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-37744354 - Fee: $405, filed by plaintiff MTD Investments, Inc.. (Attorney Matthew S Kenefick added to party MTD Investments, Inc.(pty:pla))(Kenefick, Matthew)
Related: [-]