Hayle v. J.B. Hunt Transport Inc et al
Washington Western District Court | |
Judge: | Theresa L Fricke |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00956 |
Nature of Suit | 350 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle |
Cause | 28:1441 Petition for Removal- Personal Injury |
Case Filed: | Jun 28, 2024 |
Terminated: | Oct 16, 2024 |
Case in other court: | Hayle v. J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., 24-00002-11885-3 SEA |
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2024 3:07 AM PST |
Defendant
Jessy Tuttle
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
J.B. Hunt Transport Inc
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Jane Doe Tuttle
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Miliyon Hayle
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Tuesday, November 12, 2024 | ||
34 | 34
![]() RECEIPT from King County Superior Court re33 Remand Letter to State Court. (MW) |
|
Thursday, October 31, 2024 | ||
33 | 33
![]() LETTER to King County Superior Court Remanding Case to State Court. (Letter,32 Order, and docket sheet mailed to state court) (MW) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2024 | ||
32 | 32
![]() ORDER granting Plaintiff's11 Motion to Remand and denying plaintiff's motion for attorney's fees, signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. Per LCR 3(i), case will be remanded on the 15th day following the date of this Order, on 10/31/2024.(GMR) |
|
Tuesday, October 01, 2024 | ||
31 | 31
misc
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge
Tue 10/01 11:39 AM
CONSENT by Jane Doe Tuttle to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (GMR) |
|
Monday, September 30, 2024 | ||
30 | 30
![]() NOTICE TO JANE DOE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Defendant Jane Doe will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 10/7/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (GMR) |
|
Thursday, September 19, 2024 | ||
29 | 29
minutes
Motion Hearing
Thu 09/19 3:53 PM
MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Judge Theresa L Fricke- Dep Clerk: Gayle Riekena ; Pla Counsel: Alex Romero ; Def Counsel: Rossi Maddalena ; CR: Andrea Ramirez ; Time of Hearing: 10:00 am ; Zoom Motion Hearing held on 9/19/2024 re Plaintiff's11 Motion to Remand. Court hears from parties re status of Jane Doe defendant. Cout hears argument from parties re motion. Written decision to issue after Doe defendant issue addressed by parties. (GMR) |
|
Wednesday, September 18, 2024 | ||
28 | 28
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Alex Romero on behalf of Plaintiff Miliyon Hayle. (Romero, Alex) |
|
27 | 27
![]() ORDER re: Doe Defendant, signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
26 | 26
notice
Notice of Hearing on Motion
Thu 09/12 6:33 PM
NOTICE of Hearing on11 MOTION to Remand. Motion Hearing set for 9/19/2024 at 10:00 AM via Zoom before Judge Theresa L Fricke. The court will provide remote audio public access for this hearing. Access information can be found on the court's[LINK:Public Access to Hearings] page at least 24 hours prior to the hearing. (GMR) |
|
Wednesday, September 04, 2024 | ||
25 | 25
![]() JOINT STATUS REPORT signed by all parties. Estimated Trial Days: 5. (Maddalena, Rossi) |
|
Thursday, August 22, 2024 | ||
24 | 24
utility
Notice to Filer
Thu 08/22 9:05 AM
NOTICE TO FILER: Under Local Civil Rule 5(d), Rule 26 initial disclosures and discovery requests and responses must not be filed unless they are used in the proceedings or the court orders filing. Docket entry No.23 has been stricken from the docket. No further action is needed. (MW) |
|
Wednesday, August 21, 2024 | ||
23 | 23
![]() INITIAL DISCLOSURES Filed by All Plaintiffs.(Romero, Alex) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
22 | 22
![]() DECLARATION of Jessy Tuttle by Defendant Jessy Tuttle(Maddalena, Rossi) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
21 | 21
![]() ORDER granting20 Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines: FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/21/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/28/2024, Joint Status Report due by 9/4/2024, signed by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
20 | 20
![]() Stipulated MOTION to Extend Deadlines , filed by Defendants J.B. Hunt Transport Inc, Jane Doe Tuttle, Jessy Tuttle. Noting Date 8/9/2024, (Maddalena, Rossi) |
|
Thursday, August 08, 2024 | ||
19 | 19
![]() NOTICE ; filed by All Plaintiffs.(Romero, Alex) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() REPLY, filed by All Plaintiffs, TO RESPONSE to11 MOTION to Remand(Romero, Alex) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Friday, July 26, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() ERRATA re16 Response to Motion by All Defendants (Maddalena, Rossi) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() RESPONSE, by All Defendants, to11 MOTION to Remand .(Maddalena, Rossi) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
15 | 15
![]() AMENDMENT Notice of Removal by Defendants J.B. Hunt Transport Inc, Jane Doe Tuttle, Jessy Tuttle(Maddalena, Rossi) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, July 17, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER REGARDING DISCOVERY AND DEPOSITIONS by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR) |
|
13 | 13
![]() ORDER REGARDING INITIAL DISCLOSURES, JOINT STATUS REPORT AND EARLY SETTLEMENT. Joint Status Report due by 8/28/2024, FRCP 26(f) Conference Deadline is 8/7/2024, Initial Disclosure Deadline is 8/21/2024, by Judge Theresa L Fricke. (GMR) |
|
12 | 12
misc
Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge
Wed 07/17 9:33 PM
CONSENT by all parties to proceed before a Magistrate Judge. (GMR) |
|
11 | 11
![]() MOTION to Remand , filed by All Plaintiffs. Noting Date 8/16/2024, (Romero, Alex) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() Notice of Filing Deficiency re1 Notice of Removal,,. ***Action Required*** Attorney Admission. See attached letter for more information and instructions. cc Attorney Romero via ad hoc(CDA) |
|
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT TO A US MAGISTRATE JUDGE AND DECLINATION OF CONSENT FORM. Each party will be deemed to have knowingly and voluntarily consented to proceed before a Magistrate Judge if this form is not returned by 7/15/2024. Please Note: Forms must not be electronically filed with the Court. (GMR) |
|
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() ANSWER to Complaint; with JURY DEMAND by J.B. Hunt Transport Inc, Jessy Tuttle.(Maddalena, Rossi) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Christopher A. Campbell on behalf of Defendants J.B. Hunt Transport Inc, Jane Doe Tuttle, Jessy Tuttle. (Campbell, Christopher) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() **AMENDED** Notice of Filing Deficiency re5 Case/IFP Deficiency Letter,. ***Action Required*** **Improper Signature - Secondary Attorney(s), Notice of Removal - Certificate of Service Not Provided:. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MIH) (cc: Christopher Campbell via Ad Hoc) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Notice of Filing Deficiency ***Action Required*** Attorney Admission, Notice of Removal - Certificate of Service Not Provided:. See attached letter for more information and instructions. (MIH)(cc: Christopher A. Campbell via Ad Hoc) |
|
4 | 4
![]() LETTER from Clerk re receipt of case from King County Superior Court and advising of WAWD case number and judge assignment. (MIH) |
|
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Wed 07/03 12:45 PM
Judge Theresa L Fricke added. (MIH) |
||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT identifying Corporate Parent J.B. Hunt Transport Services, Inc. for J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., Jessy Tuttle. Filed pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P 7.1(a)(1). Filed by All Defendants. (Maddalena, Rossi) |
|
Friday, June 28, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE to Plaintiff of Removal ; filed by Defendants J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc., Jessy Tuttle. (Maddalena, Rossi) |
|
1 | 1
![]() NOTICE OF REMOVAL from King County Superior Court, case number 24 2-11885 3 SEA; Attorney Rossi F. Maddalena added to party J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc.(pty:dft) filed by J.B. Hunt Transport, Inc..(Maddalena, Rossi) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |