Arizona District Court
Judge:Michael T Liburdi
Case #: 2:24-cv-01597
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2024
Terminated:Sep 03, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2024 3:34 AM MST
Defendant
Unknown Ramirez
Defendant
Treasure Island LV LLC
Represented By
Christopher J Feasel
Resnick & Louis Pc - Scottsdale
contact info
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Plaintiff
Kimberly Alexander
Represented By
Wesley Michael Cox
Tiffany & Bosco PA
contact info
Richard Cameron Gramlich
Tiffany & Bosco PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Gary D Carter
Represented By
Wesley Michael Cox
Tiffany & Bosco PA
contact info
Richard Cameron Gramlich
Tiffany & Bosco PA
contact info

GPO Sep 03 2024
ORDER that Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue 6 is GRANTED. IT IS FURHTER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada and administratively close this case. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 9/3/2024. (KLG)

Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM MST
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
misc Remark (Public) Thu 09/05 6:46 AM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer in District of Nevada. New Case Number: 2:24-cv-1631. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (MAP)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
9 9 3 pgs order Order on Motion to Change Venue Tue 09/03 3:51 PM
ORDER that Defendant's Motion for Change of Venue6 is GRANTED. IT IS FURHTER ORDERED that the Clerk of Court must transfer this action to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada and administratively close this case. Signed by Judge Michael T Liburdi on 9/3/2024. (KLG)
Related: [-]
8 8 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 09/03 8:21 AM
REPLY to Response to Motion re:6 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to Nevada filed by Treasure Island LV LLC. (Feasel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
misc Remark (Public) Tue 09/03 3:55 PM
Remark: Case transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Nevada by electronic transfer. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (KLG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
7 7 respm Response to Motion Tue 08/27 11:31 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re:6 MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to Nevada filed by Kimberly Alexander, Gary D Carter. (Gramlich, Richard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
6 6 motion Change Venue Tue 08/13 3:42 PM
MOTION to Change Venue/Transfer Case to Nevada by Treasure Island LV LLC.(Feasel, Christopher)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Friday, June 28, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Fri 06/28 4:55 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Gary D Carter, Kimberly Alexander. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Attorney must update PACER account to match law firm information on pleading: Wesley Michael Cox . Law firm name listed on pleading: Tiffany & Bosco PA . Law firm in CM-ECF Account: Koeller Nebeker Carlson & Haluck LLP . Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
4 4 service Summons Issued Fri 06/28 4:36 PM
Summons Issued as to Treasure Island LV LLC. (REK)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc New Case Opened Fri 06/28 4:34 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23196641. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Michael T Liburdi. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-01597 PHX-MTL. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Submitted Fri 06/28 4:33 PM
SUMMONS Submitted by Kimberly Alexander, Gary D Carter. (submitted by Richard Gramlich) (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 10 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/28 4:29 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23196641 filed by Gary D Carter, Kimberly Alexander. (submitted by Richard Gramlich)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet