Lyagoba v. MAYORKAS et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Joseph C Spero |
Case #: | 3:24-cv-03929 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 05:702 Administrative Procedure Act |
Case Filed: | Jul 01, 2024 |
Terminated: | Dec 27, 2024 |
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 12:30 AM PST |
Defendant
Danielle Lehman
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Ur Mendoza Jaddou
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Alejandro N. Mayorkas
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Eddie Ronald Lyagoba
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM PDT |
Monday, December 23, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Eddie Ronald Lyagoba (Rosche, Danielle) |
|
Wednesday, October 16, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice Setting Zoom Hearing
Wed 10/16 2:47 PM
CLERKS NOTICE SETTING ZOOM HEARING. Initial Case Management Conference set for 2/12/2025 02:00 PM in San Francisco, - Videoconference Only. This proceeding will be held via a Zoom webinar. Webinar Access: All counsel, members of the public, and media may access the webinar information at [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/jcs] General Order 58. Persons granted access to court proceedings held by telephone or videoconference are reminded that photographing, recording, and rebroadcasting of court proceedings, including screenshots or other visual copying of a hearing, is absolutely prohibited. Zoom Guidance and Setup: [LINK:https://www.cand.uscourts.gov/zoom/] . (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
13 | 13
![]() Order. Signed 10/16/2024 by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 12 Stipulation to Stay Proceedings. Status Report due by 2/3/2025.(klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, October 15, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER to Stay Proceedings filed by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Danielle Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() Order. Signed 9/17/2024 by Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero granting 10 Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint.(klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() STIPULATION WITH PROPOSED ORDER Stipulation to Extend Time for Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's Complaint; [Proposed] Order filed by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Danielle Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
9 | 9
![]() CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Danielle Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas.. (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Appearance/Substitution/Change/Withdrawal of Attorney
Fri 09/13 4:25 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by Elizabeth D. Kurlan on behalf of Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Danielle Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas (Kurlan, Elizabeth) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() CONSENT/DECLINATION to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge by Eddie Ronald Lyagoba.. (Rosche, Danielle) |
|
Monday, July 29, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
oth_evt
Clerk's Notice re: Consent or Declination
Mon 07/29 10:16 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE Re: Consent or Declination: Plaintiff Lyagoba shall file a consent or declination to proceed before a magistrate judge. Note that any party is free to withhold consent to proceed before a magistrate judge without adverse substantive consequences. The forms are available at:[LINK:http://cand.uscourts.gov/civilforms] . (Party/parties were also notified via telephone or email.) Consent/Declination due by 8/12/2024. (This is a text-only entry generated by the court. There is no document associated with this entry.) (klh, COURT STAFF) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Issued as to Ur Mendoza Jaddou, Danielle Lehman, Alejandro N. Mayorkas, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Immigration Mandamus Case Procedural Order. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
|
3 | 3
utility
~Util - Case Assigned by Intake
Tue 07/02 11:15 AM
Case assigned to Magistrate Judge Joseph C. Spero. Counsel for plaintiff or the removing party is responsible for serving the Complaint or Notice of Removal, Summons and the assigned judge's standing orders and all other new case documents upon the opposing parties. For information, visit E-Filing A New Civil Case at http://cand.uscourts.gov/ecf/caseopening. Standing orders can be downloaded from the court's web page at www.cand.uscourts.gov/judges. Upon receipt, the summons will be issued and returned electronically. A scheduling order will be sent by Notice of Electronic Filing (NEF) within two business days. Consent/Declination due by 7/16/2024. (ark, COURT STAFF) |
|
utility
Electronic Filing Error
Tue 07/02 1:03 PM
[LINK:Electronic filing error] . Filer is reminded NOT to enter parties' names in all capital letters. Corrected by Clerk's Office. No further action is necessary. Re:1 Complaint filed by Eddie Ronald Lyagoba. (mcl, COURT STAFF) |
||
Monday, July 01, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Proposed Summons. (Rosche, Danielle) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number ACANDC-19575442.). Filed by Eddie Ronald Lyagoba.(Rosche, Danielle) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |