Kentucky Western District Court
Judge:Benjamin Beaton
Referred: Colin H Lindsay
Case #: 3:24-cv-00388
Nature of Suit355 Torts - Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity Action
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2024 4:26 AM EST
Defendant
Mazda Motor of America, Inc.
Represented By
Melissa G. Foster Bird
Nelson Mullins Riley & Scarborough, Llp- Huntington
contact info
Plaintiff
Catherine Duffy
Represented By
Samantha E. Holbrook
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
Troy M. Frederick
Frederick Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Benjamin F. Johns
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
Andrew W. Knox
Timoney Knox LLP
contact info
Keith T. Vernon
Timoney Knox, LLP
contact info
Andrew W. Ferich
Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC
contact info
Robert Ahdoot
Ahdoot And Wolfson PC
contact info
Beth A. Frederick
Frederick Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Randall S. Strause
Strause Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Robert R Ahdoot
Ahdoot And Wolfson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Edlin
Represented By
Samantha E. Holbrook
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
Troy M. Frederick
Frederick Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Benjamin F. Johns
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
Andrew W. Knox
Timoney Knox LLP
contact info
Keith T. Vernon
Timoney Knox, LLP
contact info
Andrew W. Ferich
Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC
contact info
Robert Ahdoot
Ahdoot And Wolfson PC
contact info
Beth A. Frederick
Frederick Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Randall S. Strause
Strause Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Robert R Ahdoot
Ahdoot And Wolfson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Paula Hall
Represented By
Samantha E. Holbrook
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
Troy M. Frederick
Frederick Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Benjamin F. Johns
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
Andrew W. Knox
Timoney Knox LLP
contact info
Keith T. Vernon
Timoney Knox, LLP
contact info
Andrew W. Ferich
Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC
contact info
Robert Ahdoot
Ahdoot And Wolfson PC
contact info
Beth A. Frederick
Frederick Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Randall S. Strause
Strause Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Robert R Ahdoot
Ahdoot And Wolfson PC
contact info
Plaintiff
Lawrence Mulcahy
Represented By
Samantha E. Holbrook
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
Troy M. Frederick
Frederick Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Benjamin F. Johns
Shub & Johns LLC
contact info
Andrew W. Knox
Timoney Knox LLP
contact info
Keith T. Vernon
Timoney Knox, LLP
contact info
Andrew W. Ferich
Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC
contact info
Robert Ahdoot
Ahdoot And Wolfson PC
contact info
Beth A. Frederick
Frederick Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Randall S. Strause
Strause Law Group, PLLC
contact info
Robert R Ahdoot
Ahdoot And Wolfson PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, March 10, 2025
44 44 order Order on Motion to Continue Mon 03/10 3:05 PM
TEXT ORDER: The Court grants the unopposed motion to continue the final fairness hearing (DN42 ) and reschedules the hearing from 8/1/25 to 7/28/25 at 9:30 a.m. ET in the Louisville courthouse. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel (HMC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
43 43 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 02/19 1:15 PM
ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 02/18/2025 granting37 Motion for Robert L. Wise to Appear Pro Hac Vice. cc: Counsel (via USPS with ECF Notice) (HMC)
Related: [-]
42 42 motion Continue Wed 02/19 1:06 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Continue Final Approval Hearing by Plaintiffs Catherine Duffy, Matthew Edlin, Paula Hall, Lawrence Mulcahy (Ferich, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
41 41 3 pgs notice Notice of Filing Official Transcript Tue 02/18 4:36 PM
Notice of Filing Official Transcript re40 Transcript - Court Official. Please review the complete Notice for instructions. (TH)
Related: [-]
40 40 misc Transcript - Court Official Tue 02/18 4:33 PM
FILING OF OFFICIAL TRANSCRIPT of Motion Hearing held on 2/10/2025, before Judge Benjamin Beaton. Court Reporter Terri Horton, Telephone number 270-415-6417. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Redaction Request due 3/11/2025. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 3/21/2025. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 5/19/2025. (TH)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 17, 2025
39 39 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Mon 02/17 4:33 PM
OPINION & ORDER: The Court grants Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for preliminary approval of the class-action settlement (DN18 ). Solely for the purposes of the proposed settlement, the Court provisionally certifies the proposed settlement class, preliminarily approves and appoints Benjamin F. Johns of Shub & Johns LLC and Andrew W. Ferich of Ahdoot & Wolfson P.C. as class counsel, and preliminarily approves Catherine Duffy, Matthew Edlin, Lawrence Mulcahy, and Paula Hall as the class representatives. The Court appoints JND Legal Administration LLC as the claims administrator. The Court approves the form and content of the proposed claim form and notice and directs distribution of the notice packet to class members as set forth in the settlement agreement. The Court sets a final fairness hearing for August 1, 2025, at 9:30 a.m. at the Gene Snyder United States Courthouse in Louisville, Kentucky. The Plaintiffs shall file a motion for attorney fees and costs and class representative service awards no later than June 11, 2025, and a motion for final approval no later than July 16, 2025. cc: Counsel (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 11, 2025
38 38 minutes Motion Hearing Tue 02/11 8:33 AM
TEXT ORDER: Judge Beaton held a remote hearing on February 10, 2025, regarding Plaintiffs' unopposed motion for preliminary approval of the class-action settlement (DN18 ). The Court will rule on the motion in a subsequent order. (Court Reporter: Terri Horton) (time in court: 36 minutes) cc: Counsel (HMC)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
37 37 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 02/07 5:11 PM
MOTION for Robert L. Wise to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Defendant Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4188337. by Defendant Mazda Motor of America, Inc. (Foster Bird, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Addendum Addendum A - Explanation for Question No. 3
Monday, January 27, 2025
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/27 1:51 PM
NOTICE of Firm Name Change by Matthew Edlin, Catherine Duffy, Lawrence Mulcahy, Paula Hall (Johns, Benjamin)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
35 35 order Order - TEXT ONLY Wed 01/08 11:18 AM
TEXT ORDER: Judge Beaton would like to schedule a remote hearing for 2/10/2025 at 4:45 p.m. ET regarding the motion for preliminary approval of class action settlement (DN18 ). The parties may connect to the Zoom hearing by audio only (cameras turned off) at https://www.zoomgov.com/j/1603244566?pwd=UPuviu6U3lUq8fHiw08qFsI885zjij.1 The meeting ID is 160 324 4566 and the passcode is 113451. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
34 34 notice Notice (Other) Mon 12/02 4:44 PM
NOTICE OF SUPPLEMENTAL AUTHORITY by Matthew Edlin, Catherine Duffy, Lawrence Mulcahy, Paula Hall (Ferich, Andrew)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Steinhardt final approval order
Monday, September 16, 2024
33 33 notice Certificate of Counsel Mon 09/16 4:04 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 30 Notice of Deficiency, by Beth A. Frederick on behalf of Catherine Duffy, Matthew Edlin, Paula Hall, Lawrence Mulcahy (Frederick, Beth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
32 32 notice Certificate of Counsel Mon 09/16 3:05 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re 31 Notice of Deficiency, by Troy M. Frederick on behalf of Catherine Duffy, Matthew Edlin, Paula Hall, Lawrence Mulcahy (Frederick, Troy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
31 31 notice Deficiency Tue 09/03 2:20 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Troy M. Frederick re26 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Reason for Deficiency: failure to register to file electronically pursuant to GO 2008-03. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/20/2024. (KJA)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Deficiency Tue 09/03 2:18 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Beth A. Frederick re26 Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice.Reason for Deficiency: failure to register to file electronically pursuant to GO 2008-03. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 9/20/2024. (KJA)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
29 29 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 08/30 12:16 PM
TEXT ORDER: In response to the parties' joint motion for an extension of time for the Defendant to file its answer (DN28 ), the Court extends the deadline until after its ruling on the pending motion for preliminary approval of the class action settlement (DN18 ). Following resolution of that motion, the parties must file a joint status report within 30 days to address the scheduling of any necessary responsive pleadings or other filings. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: Counsel(JM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
28 28 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 08/28 6:59 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Mazda Motor of America, Inc. (Foster Bird, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Extend
Friday, August 02, 2024
27 27 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 08/02 9:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Melissa G. Foster Bird on behalf of Mazda Motor of America, Inc. (Foster Bird, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
26 26 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/26 4:02 PM
ORDER Signed by Magistrate Judge Colin H. Lindsay on 7/25/2024: The14 MOTION for Benjamin F. Johns to Appear Pro Hac Vice,15 MOTION for Samantha E. Holbrook to Appear Pro Hac Vice,16 MOTION for Andrew W. Ferich to Appear Pro Hac Vice,17 MOTION for Robert Ahdoot to Appear Pro Hac Vice,21 MOTION for Andrew W. Knox to Appear Pro Hac Vice,22 MOTION for Keith T. Vernon to Appear Pro Hac Vice,23 MOTION for Troy M. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice,24 MOTION for Beth A. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice are GRANTED. cc: Counsel (DLW) Modified on 7/26/2024 to add Attorney names (DLW)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
25 25 order Order - TEXT ONLY Tue 07/23 2:24 PM
TEXT ORDER: Under 28 U.S.C. § 636(b)(1)(A), the Court refers this matter to Magistrate Judge Lindsay for hearing and determining all pretrial matters, including non-dispositive motions. Judge Lindsay may conduct a settlement conference in this matter at any time. This Notice of Electronic Filing is the Official ORDER for this entry. No document is attached. cc: counsel (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
24 24 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/16 1:54 PM
MOTION for Beth A. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4068504. by Plaintiffs Catherine Duffy, Matthew Edlin, Paula Hall, Lawrence Mulcahy (Strause, Randall) (KDY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/16/2024) Proposed Order
23 23 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/16 1:52 PM
MOTION for Troy M. Frederick to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4068502. by Plaintiffs Catherine Duffy, Matthew Edlin, Paula Hall, Lawrence Mulcahy (Strause, Randall) (KDY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/16/2024) Proposed Order
22 22 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/16 1:50 PM
MOTION for Keith T. Vernon to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4068501. by Plaintiffs Catherine Duffy, Matthew Edlin, Paula Hall, Lawrence Mulcahy (Strause, Randall) (KDY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/16/2024) Proposed Order
21 21 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/16 1:48 PM
MOTION for Andrew W. Knox to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4068500. by Plaintiffs Catherine Duffy, Matthew Edlin, Paula Hall, Lawrence Mulcahy (Strause, Randall) (KDY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (7/16/2024) Proposed Order
Monday, July 15, 2024
20 20 misc Mail Returned Mon 07/15 12:40 PM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable re12 . Mail sent to Robert Ahdoot (JM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
19 19 misc Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) Tue 07/02 4:48 PM
Diversity Case Disclosure Statement (pursuant to Rule 7.1(a)(2)) by Catherine Duffy, Matthew Edlin, Paula Hall, Lawrence Mulcahy. (Strause, Randall)
Related: [-]
18 18 2 pgs motion Settlement Tue 07/02 4:46 PM
MOTION for Settlement by Plaintiffs Catherine Duffy, Matthew Edlin, Paula Hall, Lawrence Mulcahy (Strause, Randall)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 73 pgs Exhibit Mazda Settlement Agreement (with exhibits),
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Benjamin F. Johns ISO MPA,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Andrew W. Ferich ISO MPA,
Att: 4 Exhibit JND Settlement and Administrator Declaration,
Att: 5 Exhibit Preliminary Approval (Proposed) Order,
Att: 6 Memorandum in Support Memo in Support,
Att: 7 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement
17 17 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/02 4:36 PM
MOTION for Robert Ahdoot to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4061463. by Plaintiffs Catherine Duffy, Matthew Edlin, Paula Hall, Lawrence Mulcahy (Strause, Randall)
Related: [-]
16 16 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/02 4:34 PM
MOTION for Andrew W. Ferich to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4061460. by Plaintiffs Catherine Duffy, Matthew Edlin, Paula Hall, Lawrence Mulcahy (Strause, Randall)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/02 4:32 PM
MOTION for Samantha E. Holbrook to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4061456. by Plaintiffs Catherine Duffy, Matthew Edlin, Paula Hall, Lawrence Mulcahy (Strause, Randall)
Related: [-]
14 14 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 07/02 4:31 PM
MOTION for Benjamin F. Johns to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number AKYWDC-4061449. by Plaintiffs Catherine Duffy, Matthew Edlin, Paula Hall, Lawrence Mulcahy (Strause, Randall)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 07/02 4:24 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Catherine Duffy. Mazda Motor of America, Inc. waiver sent on 7/1/2024, answer due 8/30/2024. (Strause, Randall)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Deficiency Tue 07/02 12:25 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Robert Ahdoot re1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/19/2024. (KJA)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Deficiency Tue 07/02 12:23 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Andrew W. Ferichre1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/19/2024. (KJA)
Related: [-]
10 10 notice Deficiency Tue 07/02 12:22 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Troy M. Frederick re1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/19/2024. (KJA)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Deficiency Tue 07/02 12:17 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Beth A. Frederick re1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/19/2024. (KJA)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Deficiency Tue 07/02 12:15 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Keith T. Vernon re1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/19/2024. (KJA)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Deficiency Tue 07/02 12:13 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Andrew W. Knox re1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/19/2024. (KJA)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Deficiency Tue 07/02 12:11 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Samantha E. Holbrook re1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/19/2024. (KJA)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Deficiency Tue 07/02 12:09 PM
ATTORNEY NOTICE of Deficiency to Benjamin F. Johns re1 Complaint.Reason for Deficiency: motion to appear pro hac vice. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/19/2024. (KJA)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
4 4 notice Deficiency Fri 06/28 5:12 PM
NOTICE of Deficiency re1 Complaint. Reason for Deficiency: Rule 7.1(a)(2) Diversity Disclosure Statement. Failure to comply will be brought to the attention of the Court. Response due by 7/5/2024. (MNM)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 06/28 5:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Mazda Motor of America, Inc. Counsel for Plaintiff is responsible for printing and serving the attached issued summons(es). (MNM)
Related: [-]
2 2 utility Case Assignment Fri 06/28 5:08 PM
Case Assignment (Random Selection): Case Assigned to Judge Benjamin Beaton. (MNM)
Related: [-]
1 1 47 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 06/28 5:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Mazda Motor of America, Inc. Filing fee $405, receipt number AKYWDC-4059569, filed by Matthew Edlin, Catherine Duffy, Lawrence Mulcahy, and Paula Hall. (MNM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons Tendered