California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-02155
Case Filed:May 31, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 30, 2024 12:35 AM PDT
Defendant
Amanda Rachelle Miller (1)
Represented By
Samuel J. Pope
Federal Defenders Of San Diego, Inc.
contact info
Federal Defenders
Federal Defenders Of San Diego
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
U S Attorney CR
U S Attorneys Office Southern District Of California
contact info
Allison Rogge
Doj-Usao
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/21/2024 9:27 PM PDT
Thursday, May 30, 2024
Arrest of Amanda Rachelle Miller. (no document attached) (mef)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2024
1 1 OUT OF DISTRICT COMPLAINT as to Amanda Rachelle Miller.(mef)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet
2 2 Set/Reset Duty Hearings as to Amanda Rachelle Miller: Initial Appearance - ODC set for 5/31/2024 before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. (no document attached) (gac)
Related: [-]
3 3 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres: Initial Appearance - Out of District Complaint as to Amanda Rachelle Miller held on 5/31/2024. Oral proffer confirmed. Appointed Federal Defenders for Amanda Rachelle Miller. Government oral motion to detain(Flight/Danger). ( Detention Hearing - RF/DC set for 6/4/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres. Removal/ID Hearing set for 6/13/2024 01:30 PM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres.) Rule 5 advisement provided. (CD# 5/31/2024 VET 24-1:3:32-3:50). (Plaintiff Attorney Allison Rogge AUSA). (Defendant Attorney Ryan Mardock FD-S/A). (no document attached) (aje) Modified on 6/3/2024 (aje). Modified on 6/3/2024 (aje).
Related: [-]
4 4 ***English. No Interpreter needed as to Amanda Rachelle Miller (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
5 5 Oral MOTION to Detain (Flight/Danger) by USA as to Amanda Rachelle Miller. (no document attached) (aje)
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER as to Amanda Rachelle Miller: The Court orders the United States to comply with the continuing duty to disclose evidence which is favorable to the defendant as required by Brady v. Maryland, 373 U.S. 83 (1963), and its progeny. Upon finding that the government has failed to comply with this order, the Court may, as appropriate, order the production of such information, grant a continuance, impose evidentiary sanctions, or, in extreme cases, dismiss charges.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 5/31/24. (aje)
Related: [-]