California Southern District Court
Case #: 3:24-mj-02147
Case Filed:May 31, 2024
Terminated:May 31, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Jun 30, 2024 12:36 AM PDT
Plaintiff
USA
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Alexander Bennet Grindley (1)
Terminated: 05/31/2024


Docket last updated: 06/30/2024 1:23 AM PDT
Friday, May 31, 2024
1 1 Application and Affidavit for Search and Seizure Warrant entered as to Alexander Bennet Grindley (cc: AUSA P. Kevin Mokhtari) (alns) (alns).
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (6/5/2024) Redacted Application and Affidavit for Search and Seizure Warrant
3 3 Motion and Order to Seal Application, Affidavit and Search and Seizure Warrant as to Alexander Bennet Grindley. Signed by Magistrate Judge Allison H. Goddard on 5/31/2024. (cc: AUSA P. Kevin Mokhtari) (alns)
Related: [-]