Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Eduardo C Robreno
Case #: 2:11-cv-31839
Nature of Suit368 Torts - Personal Injury - Asbestos Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause46:0688 Jones Act
Case Filed:Feb 07, 2011
Re-opened:Sep 14, 2012
Terminated:Jun 19, 2013
Last checked: Thursday Nov 23, 2017 12:29 PM EST
Defendant
A-C PRODUCT LIABILITY TRUST
Defendant
A.B. BOYD CO.
Defendant
A.P. GREEN INDUSTRIES, INC.
Defendant
A.W. CHESTERTON CO.
Represented By
JOHN PATTERSON
Tucker Ellis LLP
contact info
Defendant
ACANDS, INC.
Defendant
ACMC
Defendant
ACORN IRON & SUPPLY CO.
Defendant
ALFRED CONHAGEN, INC.
Defendant
AMER FOREIGN SS CORP
Defendant
AMERICAN FOREIGN S.S. CORP
Defendant
AMERICAN SOUTH AFRICAN LINES
Represented By
HAROLD W. HENDERSON
Thompson, Hine LLP
contact info
Defendant
ANCHOR PACKING CO.
Defendant
APEX MARINE CORP.
Represented By
HAROLD W. HENDERSON
Thompson, Hine LLP
contact info
Defendant
ARGO INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Defendant
ARMSTRONG WORLD INDUSTRIES, INC.
Defendant
AUBURN MFG. CO.
Defendant
AURORA PUMP DIVISION OF GENERAL SIGNAL CORP.
Defendant
B.F. GOODRICH
Defendant
BETHLEHEM STEEL CORP.
Defendant
BLACK & DECKER CORPORATION
Defendant
BLIDBERG ROTHCHILD CO. INC.
Defendant
BLOOMFIELD STEAMSHIP CO.
Defendant
BRYAN STEAM CORP.
Defendant
CARGO SHIPS TANKER INC.
Defendant
CENTRAL GULF LINES, INC.
Represented By
HAROLD W. HENDERSON
Thompson, Hine LLP
contact info
Defendant
CENTRAL GULF STEAMSHIP CORPORATION
Represented By
HAROLD W. HENDERSON
Thompson, Hine LLP
contact info
Defendant
CERTAINTEED CORPORATION
Defendant
CHAMPION INTERNATIONAL CORPORATION
Defendant
COLTEC INDUSTRIES, INC.
Defendant
COMBUSTION ENGINEERING, INC.
Defendant
CRANE COMPANY
Represented By
MICHAEL J. ZUKOWSKI
K&l Gates
contact info
Defendant
DANA CORP.
Defendant
DELTA STEAMSHIP LINES INC.
Represented By
HAROLD W. HENDERSON
Thompson, Hine LLP
contact info
Defendant
DICKMAN WRIGHT & PUGH
Defendant
DOVER RESOURCES, INC.
Defendant
DURABLA MANUFACTURING CO.
Defendant
DURAMETALLIC CORPORATION
Defendant
EG&G SEALOL, INC.
Defendant
ELLICOTT MACHINE CORP.
Defendant
EVERLASTING VALVE CO.
Defendant
EXCELSIOR, INC.
Defendant
FEDERAL-MOGUL CORPORATION
Defendant
FEL-PRO INCORPORATED
Defendant
FELT PRODUCTS INCORPORATED
Defendant
FIBREBOARD CORPORATION
Represented By
ERIC LARSON ZALUD
Benesich Friedlander Coplan & Aronoff
contact info
DONA L. ARNOLD
Benesch Friedlander Coplan Aronoff
contact info
Defendant
FKI INDUSTRIES, INC.
Defendant
FLEXITALLIC INC.
Defendant
FLINTKOTE CO.
Defendant
FOSTER WHEELER COMPANY
Defendant
GAF CORPORATION
Defendant
GARLOCK, INC.
Defendant
GATKE CORPORATION
Represented By
JOHN M. HERKE
Spyridon Palermo & Dornan
contact info
Defendant
GENERAL CABLE COMPANY
Defendant
GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY
Defendant
GENERAL REFRACTORIES CO.
Defendant
GOODALL RUBBER CO.
Defendant
GOODYEAR TIRE AND RUBBER COMPANY
Defendant
GOULDS PUMPS, INC.
Defendant
GREEN TWEED & CO.
Defendant
GULF ENGINEERING COMPANY, INC.
Defendant
HAJOCA CORP.
Defendant
HARBISON-WALKER REFRACTORIES GROUP
Defendant
HENDY INTERNATIONAL CO.
Defendant
HENRY VOGT MACHINE CO.
Defendant
HOME RUBBER COMPANY
Defendant
IMO INDUSTRIES, INC.
Represented By
KEVIN C. ALEXANDERSEN
Gallagher Sharp
contact info
STEPHEN M. BEAUDRY
Gallagher Sharp
contact info
COLLEEN A. MOUNTCASTLE
Gallagher Sharp
contact info
Defendant
INGERSOLL-DRESSER PUMP
Defendant
INGERSOLL-RAND CORPORATION
Defendant
ISBRANDTSEN CO., INC.
Defendant
ISBRANDTSEN LINES
Defendant
JAMES WALKER MFG. CO.
Defendant
JANOS INDUSTRIAL INSULATION CORP.
Defendant
JOHN CRANE PACKING CO.
Defendant
LA FAVORITE INDUSTRIES, INC.
Defendant
LUNKENHEIMER CO.
Defendant
MARINE TRANSPORT LINES INC.
Represented By
HAROLD W. HENDERSON
Thompson, Hine LLP
contact info
Defendant
MELRATH GASKET, INC.
Defendant
MORTELL COMPANY
Defendant
NOLAND COMPANY
Defendant
NORTH AMERICAN REFRACTORIES CO.
Defendant
NORTH ATLANTIC & GULF S.S. CO.
Defendant
NORTON CO.
Defendant
OKONITE CO.
Defendant
OWENS-CORNING FIBERGLAS CORP.
Defendant
OWENS-ILLINOIS, INC.
Defendant
PANAMA CANAL COMPANY
Defendant
PECORA CORP.
Defendant
PHOENIX SPECIALTY MANUFACTURING CO., INC.
Defendant
PILOT PACKING CO.
Defendant
PITTSBURGH CORNING CORPORATION
Defendant
PLIBRICO COMPANY
Defendant
PPG INDUSTRIES, INC.
ONE PPG PLACE
PITTSBURGH, PA 15272
Defendant
PREFERRED UTILITIES MFG. CORP.
Defendant
QUAKER RUBBER COMPANY
Defendant
QUIGLEY CO., INC.
Defendant
RHOPAC INC.
Defendant
ROBERT A. KEASBEY COMPANY
Defendant
ROCKBESTOS COMPANY
Defendant
SEA-RO PACKING CO., INC.
Defendant
SELBY BATTERSBY AND CO.
Defendant
SHERWIN-WILLIAMS CO.
101 PROSPECT AVENUE, N.W.
CLEVELAND, OH 44115
Defendant
SHOOK & FLETCHER INSULATION CO.
Defendant
SIKA CORPORATION
Defendant
SKINNER ENGINE COMPANY, INC.
Defendant
STATES MARINE CORPORATION
Defendant
STATES MARINE LINES
Defendant
STEAMSHIP SERVICE CORPORATION
Defendant
T & N INDUSTRIES, INC.
Defendant
TRINIDAD CORPORATION
Represented By
HAROLD W. HENDERSON
Thompson, Hine LLP
contact info
Defendant
UNION CARBIDE CORP.
39 OLD RIDGE BURY ROAD
DANBURY, CT 06817
Defendant
UNIROYAL CHEMICAL CO.
Defendant
UNITED FRUIT COMPANY
Represented By
HAROLD W. HENDERSON
Thompson, Hine LLP
contact info
Defendant
UNITED STATES GYPSUM COMPANY
Defendant
VELLUMOID, INC.
Defendant
VIKING PUMP, INC.
Defendant
WALWORTH CO.
Defendant
WARREN PUMPS, INC.
Defendant
WATERMAN STEAMSHIP CORPORATION
Represented By
HAROLD W. HENDERSON
Thompson, Hine LLP
contact info
Defendant
WESSEL DUVAL & CO., INC.
Defendant
WESSEL, DUVAL & CO., INC.
Defendant
WESTCHESTER MARINE SHIPPING CO., INC.
Represented By
HAROLD W. HENDERSON
Thompson, Hine LLP
contact info
Defendant
WESTINGHOUSE ELECTRIC CORP.
Defendant
WORTHINGTON PUMP, INC.
Defendant
ZIMMERMAN PACKING & MFG., INC.
Plaintiff
WILLARD E. BARTEL
Represented By
DUANE C. MARSDEN
Jaques Admiralty Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
ROBERT E. SWICKLE
The Jaques Admiralty Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
JOHN E. HERRICK
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
DONALD A. KRISPIN
The Jaques Admiralty Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
DAVID C. PEEBLES
Represented By
DUANE C. MARSDEN
Jaques Admiralty Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
ROBERT E. SWICKLE
The Jaques Admiralty Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
JOHN E. HERRICK
Motley Rice LLC
contact info
DONALD A. KRISPIN
The Jaques Admiralty Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CROSBY STEAM AND VALVE COMPANY
Terminated: 02/28/2012
Defendant
CROWN CORK & SEAL CO., INC.
Terminated: 04/17/2014
Represented By
BETH A. SEBAUGH
Bonezzi Switzer Murphy Polito Hupp Co Lpa
contact info
PETER V. MARKS, SR.
contact info
Defendant
ELLIOTT TURBOMACHINERY CO., INC.
Terminated: 01/08/2013
Defendant
ERNST GAGE CO.
Terminated: 03/26/2012
Defendant
INDIAN HEAD INDUSTRIES, INC.
Terminated: 05/02/2012
Defendant
LUCKENBACH OVERSEAS CORP.
Terminated: 05/16/2016
Defendant
USX CORPORATION
Terminated: 07/26/2012
Plaintiff
JOSEPH ADAMS, JR.
Terminated: 02/07/2011
Represented By
DUANE C. MARSDEN
Jaques Admiralty Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
ROBERT E. SWICKLE
The Jaques Admiralty Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
LEONARD C. JAQUES
The Maritime Asbestosis Legal Clinic
contact info
DONALD A. KRISPIN
The Jaques Admiralty Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
SELECT A PARTY
COFFIN PUMP, INC.
Terminated: 02/28/2012
Special Master
BRUCE LASSMAN, ESQ.
Terminated: 09/29/2011



Create an account to get the full docket for this case.