Pennsylvania Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Patricia M Mayer
Case #: 2:24-bk-12256
Case Filed:Jun 30, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Nov 06, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$1,000,001 to $10 million
Est. Liabilities $500,001 to $1 million
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business
Small BusinessYes

Debtor
Smile Krafters, PC
401 Commerce Dr Ste 108
Fort Washington, PA 19034-2724
Represented By
JEFFREY KURTZMAN
Kurtzman Steady LLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Office of United States Trustee Robert N.C. Nix Federal Building 900 Market Street Suite 320
Philadelphia, PA 19107


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 6:07 PM EDT
Friday, May 16, 2025
95 95 notice Notice of Motion Fri 05/16 1:40 PM
Amended Notice of Related [+] Filed by Smile Krafters, PC. Hearing scheduled 6/4/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom #3. (KURTZMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-] 93 Motion for Final Decree
94 94 notice Notice of Motion Fri 05/16 1:31 PM
Notice of Related [+] Filed by Smile Krafters, PC. Hearing scheduled 6/4/2025 at 09:30 AM at Courtroom #3. (KURTZMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-] 93 Motion for Final Decree
93 93 motion Final Decree Fri 05/16 1:29 PM
Motion for Final Decree Filed by Smile Krafters, PC Represented by JEFFREY KURTZMAN (Counsel). (KURTZMAN, JEFFREY)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Certification of Service