Virginia Eastern District Court
Judge:Anthony J Trenga
Referred: William E Fitzpatrick
Case #: 1:24-cv-01129
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Terminated:Aug 21, 2024
Case in other court:Fauquier County Circuit Court, CL23000487-00
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 4:10 AM EST
Defendant
Jeremy A. Falls
Represented By
William Francis Gogoel
Hudgins Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Debra Schneider Stafford
Hudgins Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Sean Healy
Represented By
William Francis Gogoel
Hudgins Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Debra Schneider Stafford
Hudgins Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Adam Simpson
Represented By
William Francis Gogoel
Hudgins Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Debra Schneider Stafford
Hudgins Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
Ben Young
Represented By
William Francis Gogoel
Hudgins Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Debra Schneider Stafford
Hudgins Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
William Rohwer
Plaintiff
Nicholas Ryan Murphy
Represented By
Thomas Kenneth Plofchan, Jr.
Westlake Legal Group
contact info
Jacqueline Audrey Kramer
Westlake Legal Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Monday, August 26, 2024
16 16 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/26 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by William Francis Gogoel on behalf of Jeremy A. Falls, Sean Healy, Adam Simpson, Ben Young (Gogoel, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Wed 08/21 2:11 PM
ORDERED that the Motion to Remand be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED, and the Clerk is directed to remand this case to the Circuit Court for Fauquier County; and it is further ORDERED that Defendants' Motion to Dismiss be, and the same hereby is, DENIED as moot. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 8/21/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
14 14 minutes Motion Hearing Wed 08/21 11:36 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before District Judge Anthony J Trenga:Motion Hearing held on 8/21/2024. Appearances of counsel for Plaintiff and Defendant. Plaintiff's7 MOTION to Remand to State Court is argued and GRANTED. (Order to follow) (Court Reporter R. Montgomery.)(yguy)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
13 13 respoth Opposition Mon 07/29 12:51 PM
Opposition to7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Jeremy A. Falls, Sean Healy, Adam Simpson, Ben Young. (Stafford, Debra)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Fri 07/26 4:55 PM
Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Initial Pretrial Conference reset for 8/28/2024 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (wgar, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
12 12 misc Notice of Hearing Date Wed 07/24 1:10 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for 8/21/2024 re7 MOTION to Remand to State Court ,8 Memorandum in Support (Kramer, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Wed 07/24 3:50 PM
Reset Deadlines as to7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing reset for 8/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga (per AJT chambers). (dzir)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/22 9:30 AM
Set Deadlines as to7 MOTION to Remand to State Court . Motion Hearing set for 8/14/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga (per AJT chambers). (dzir)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
11 11 misc Notice of Hearing Date Fri 07/19 2:54 PM
Notice of Hearing Date set for 08/07/2024 re7 MOTION to Remand to State Court ,8 Memorandum in Support (Kramer, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
10 10 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 07/18 7:32 AM
ORDERED that the Motion be, and the same hereby is, GRANTED, and the briefing deadlines for Defendant's motion to dismiss are hereby stayed. New response and reply deadlines will be set following the consideration and disposition of the Plaintiff's motion for remand in re9 Motion to Stay. Signed by District Judge Anthony J Trenga on 7/17/2024. (swil)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
misc Notice of Correction Tue 07/16 8:27 AM
Notice of Correction re7 MOTION to Remand to State Court,9 MOTION to Stay re2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. The filing user has been notified to file a Notice of Hearing or Notice of Waiver of Oral Argument. (swil)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
9 9 motion Stay Mon 07/15 5:02 PM
MOTION to Stay re2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Nicholas Ryan Murphy. (Kramer, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
8 8 11 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 07/15 5:00 PM
Memorandum in Support re7 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Nicholas Ryan Murphy. (Kramer, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Remand to State Court Mon 07/15 4:59 PM
MOTION to Remand to State Court by Nicholas Ryan Murphy. (Kramer, Jacqueline)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
6 6 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/08 11:12 AM
SCHEDULING ORDER: Initial Pretrial Conference set for 7/31/2024 at 11:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 500 before Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. Final Pretrial Conference set for 11/21/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Telephonically before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. Discovery due by 11/15/2024. Signed by District Judge Anthony J. Trenga on 7/8/2024.(dzir)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Magistrate Consent,
Att: 2 Pretrial Notice
utility Set Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Mon 07/08 10:21 AM
Set Deadline as to2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim. Motion Hearing set for 7/31/2024 at 10:00 AM in Alexandria Courtroom 900 before District Judge Anthony J. Trenga. (triv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Hearing Date Wed 07/03 12:54 PM
Notice of Hearing Date re2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim (Stafford, Debra)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
4 4 notice Notice (other) Mon 07/01 2:37 PM
NOTICE by Jeremy A. Falls, Sean Healy, Adam Simpson, Ben Young re2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim ,3 Memorandum in Support (Stafford, Debra)
Related: [-]
3 3 16 pgs respm Memorandum in Support Mon 07/01 12:21 PM
Memorandum in Support re2 MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim filed by Jeremy A. Falls, Sean Healy, Adam Simpson, Ben Young.(Stafford, Debra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
2 2 motion Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim Mon 07/01 12:13 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim by Jeremy A. Falls, Sean Healy, Adam Simpson, Ben Young.(Stafford, Debra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Mon 07/01 9:35 AM
Notice of Removal ( Filing fee $ 405, receipt number AVAEDC-9608170.), filed by Ben Young, Sean Healy, Jeremy A. Falls, Adam Simpson.(Stafford, Debra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit D
utility Initial Case Assignment Tue 07/02 10:17 PM
Initial Case Assignment to District Judge Anthony J Trenga and Magistrate Judge William E. Fitzpatrick. (Cwel)
Related: [-]