Florida Southern District Court
Judge:William P Dimitrouleas
Referred: Patrick M Hunt
Case #: 0:24-cv-61140
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Terminated:Mar 25, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 3:32 AM EST
Defendant
Walmart Stores East, LP
Represented By
Angelique Groza Lyons
Constangy, Brooks, Smith & Prophete, LLP
contact info
Mediator
Marlene Quintana
Gray Robinson 333 S.E. 2ND AVENUE Suite 3200 MIAMI
MIAMI, FL 33131
Plaintiff
Alberto Dorantes
Represented By
Sharon M Caserta
Morgan And Morgan
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Tuesday, March 25, 2025
34 34 2 pgs order Order Dismissing/Closing Case or Party Wed 03/26 8:49 AM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. The Clerk shall CLOSE this case and DENY any pending motions as moot. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 3/25/2025. See attached document for full details. (ebz)
Related: [-]
33 33 misc Stipulation of Dismissal - aty Tue 03/25 10:09 AM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by Alberto Dorantes (Caserta, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
32 32 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Tue 02/18 11:47 AM
NOTICE of Settlement Pending Settlement by Alberto Dorantes (Caserta, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
31 31 minutes Discovery Hearing Wed 02/05 4:11 PM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt: Discovery Hearing held on 2/3/2025. Total time in court: 0 hour(s) : 45 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Sharon M Caserta, Angelique Groza Lyons. (Digital Recorded via Zoom 2/3/25) (hhr)
Related: [-]
30 30 notice Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF Wed 02/05 11:35 AM
Notice of Entry of Parties Listed on 27 Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney, into CM/ECF. NOTE: New Filer(s) will appear twice, since they are also a new party in the case. New Filer(s)/Party(s): Karen Evans-Putney. (Caserta, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
29 29 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Wed 02/05 9:22 AM
ORDER OF CHANGE IN MEDIATOR SELECTION, LOCATION AND DATE Scheduling Mediation before Mediator Karen Evans-Putney. Mediation Hearing set for 2/14/2025 10:00 AM Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
28 28 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Tue 02/04 6:03 PM
ORDER granting in part and denying in part18 Motion to Compel. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 2/4/2025. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
Related: [-]
27 27 notice Clerk's Notice of Docket Correction and Instruction to Filer - Attorney Tue 02/04 1:25 PM
Clerk's Notice to Filer re26 Notice (Other). Parties/Mediator Not Added ; ERROR - The Filer failed to add all parties from the complaint/petition/removal, etc. or the mediator. Filer is instructed to file a Notice of Entry of Parties Listed into CM/ECF and add the additional parties/mediator. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
26 26 notice Notice (Other) Mon 02/03 8:10 PM
NOTICE of Change in Selection of Mediator and Date of Mediation by Alberto Dorantes re12 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, (Caserta, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
25 25 order Order Setting Hearing on Motion Wed 01/29 2:47 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER Setting Hearing on18 Motion to Compel. Motion Hearing set for 2/3/2025 at 2 p.m. in the Fort Lauderdale Division before Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt. The hearing shall take place via Zoom, https://www.zoomgov.com. The Meeting ID is 160 0169 1761 and the Passcode is 334775. The Parties should contact Chambers immediately, at (954) 769-5470, if they experience any difficulties accessing the conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 1/29/2025. (hhr)
Related: [-]
24 24 respm Reply in Support of Motion Wed 01/29 2:36 PM
Plaintiff's REPLY in Support of Motion re18 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses . filed by Alberto Dorantes.(Caserta, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A- Email confer/meet re RFP No. 22,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B- Dorantes Perfomance Review Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex C- Email re meet /confer Rog No 11
Friday, January 24, 2025
23 23 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 01/24 4:43 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re18 MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses filed by Walmart Stores East, LP. Replies due by 1/31/2025. (Lyons, Angelique)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
22 22 notice Clerk's Notice - Attorney Admissions Tue 01/21 2:28 PM
CLERK'S NOTICE - Attorney Admissions has not updated address and/or email information for attorney Sharon M Caserta re20 Notice of Change of Address, Email or Law Firm Name. Attorney Sharon M Caserta has not completed the required procedures for updating their information with the Court. After filing something in any pending cases, Attorney is instructed to go to their PACER account, Manage My Account, to complete the process of updating their information. The Court is NOT responsible for updating secondary email addresses. See the Courts website for detailed instructions.[LINK:www.flsd.uscourts.gov/updating-your-information] (pt)
Related: [-]
21 21 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 01/21 11:05 AM
ORDER GRANTING PLAINTIFFS UNOPPOSED MOTION TO MODIFY CERTAIN DISCOVERY DEADLINES re19 Motion for Extension of Time. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/21/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
20 20 notice Notice of CHANGE OF ADDRESS, Email or Law Firm Name Mon 01/20 9:54 AM
NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information; by Sharon M Caserta (Caserta, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
19 19 motion Extension of Time Fri 01/17 5:51 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time To Disclose and Depose VRI Experts re12 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, by Alberto Dorantes. Responses due by 1/31/2025. (Caserta, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
18 18 motion Compel Thu 01/16 7:36 PM
MOTION to Compel Discovery Responses by Alberto Dorantes. Responses due by 1/30/2025.(Caserta, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex A- Def Resp to First RFP,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex B- Plaintiff's Third Def. Letter,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex C- Def Response to Third Def. Letter,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex D- Def Resp to First Rogs,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex E- Plaintiff's First Def Letter re Rogs,
Att: 6 Deposition Dep Transcript Arian Rivera
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Wed 01/15 8:21 AM
ORDER ON CHANGE IN LOCATION OF MEDIATION before Mediator Marlene Quintana, B.C.S. Mediation Hearing before Magistrate-Mediator set for 2/11/2025 10:00 AM before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 1/14/2025. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
16 16 notice Notice (Other) Mon 01/13 3:00 PM
Unopposed NOTICE Change in Location of Mediation by Alberto Dorantes re14 Notice (Other) (Caserta, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Tue 09/24 9:48 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Marlene Quintana, B.C.S. Mediation Hearing set for 2/11/2025 10:00 AM Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/24/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2024
14 14 notice Notice (Other) Mon 09/23 4:33 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection by Alberto Dorantes re12 Scheduling Order,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,, (Caserta, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, September 16, 2024
13 13 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Mon 09/16 4:15 PM
GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt on 9/16/2024. See attached document for full details. (hhr)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
12 12 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 09/09 9:08 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL DATE & DISCOVERY DEADLINES, REFERRING CASE TO MEDIATION & REFERRING DISCOVERY MOTIONS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGE: (Jury Trial set for 10/27/2025 in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas., Calendar Call set for 10/24/2025 10:00 AM in Fort Lauderdale Division before Judge William P. Dimitrouleas.) ORDER REFERRING CASE to Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt for Discovery Matters. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 9/9/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 28, 2024
11 11 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 08/28 2:49 PM
ORDER: re10 SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 26(f)/16.1 filed by Walmart Stores East, LP Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED as follows: The Report [DE 10] is DENIED as to the request for a date certain for trial; The Court DEFERS ruling on entering a Scheduling Order setting this case for trial on a two-week trial period (whereby the Court determines at the calendar call three days before the beginning of a trial period whether the case will commence during the following week or be pushed to the next trial period) until September 6, 2024, to allow the parties time to consider whether to consent to magistrate jurisdiction. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 8/28/2024. See attached document for full details. (pc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
10 10 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Tue 08/27 11:59 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Walmart Stores East, LP (Lyons, Angelique)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
9 9 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/22 12:34 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Walmart Stores East, LP identifying Corporate Parent Walmart Inc. for Walmart Stores East, LP (Lyons, Angelique)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
8 8 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Fri 08/09 3:29 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Amended Complaint by Walmart Stores East, LP. Attorney Angelique Groza Lyons added to party Walmart Stores East, LP(pty:dft). (Lyons, Angelique)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
7 7 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Fri 07/19 3:51 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on5 Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Alberto Dorantes. Walmart Stores East, LP served on 7/19/2024, response/answer due 8/9/2024. (Caserta, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
6 6 service Summons Issued Thu 07/11 10:56 AM
Summons Issued as to Walmart Stores East, LP. (amb)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint/Amended Notice of Removal Thu 07/11 10:49 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Walmart Stores East, LP, filed by Alberto Dorantes.(Caserta, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Summon(s)
Monday, July 08, 2024
4 4 3 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Mon 07/08 9:20 AM
ORDER Requiring Counsel To Meet, File Joint Scheduling Report And Joint Discovery Report. Signed by Judge William P. Dimitrouleas on 7/3/2024. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
3 3 notice Notice (Other) Mon 07/01 4:13 PM
NOTICE of Filing Corrected Civil Cover Sheet by Alberto Dorantes re1 Complaint (Caserta, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Mon 07/01 12:12 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge William P. Dimitrouleas. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Patrick M. Hunt is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. (pc)
Related: [-]
1 1 15 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 07/01 10:58 AM
COMPLAINT against Walmart Stores East, LP. Filing fees $ 405.00 receipt number AFLSDC-17645071, filed by Alberto Dorantes.(Caserta, Sharon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet