Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:Byron B Conway
Case #: 1:24-cv-00812
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 3:13 AM CST
Defendant
Bug Tussel Wireless LLC
Represented By
Sarah K. Keebler
Godfrey & Kahn Sc
contact info
John A Haase
Godfrey & Kahn Sc
contact info
Plaintiff
Tomika Tolar
Represented By
Scott S Luzi
Walcheske & Luzi LLC
contact info
James A Walcheske
Walcheske & Luzi LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
notice 1 - BBC Reassignment Notice Wed 01/08 7:21 AM
This case has been reassigned to newly appointed District Judge Byron B Conway. Absent further order of the court, all deadlines and hearings currently scheduled remain in effect. (lh)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
17 17 10 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 12/13 11:58 AM
PROTECTIVE ORDER signed by Judge William C Griesbach on 12/13/2024. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
16 16 motion Protective Order Thu 12/12 10:37 AM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order by Bug Tussel Wireless LLC.(Keebler, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, October 11, 2024
15 15 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 10/11 9:43 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge William C Griesbach: Scheduling Conference held on 10/11/2024. Motion for Court Authorized Notice of Collective Action is due on or before 4/18/2025. Further scheduling will be addressed pending outcome of the motion. (Tape #101124) (lh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
14 14 misc Report of Rule 26(f) Plan Wed 10/02 1:26 PM
Joint REPORT of Rule 26(f) Plan by Tomika Tolar. (Walcheske, James)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/26 10:30 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by James A Walcheske on behalf of Tomika Tolar. Attorney(s) appearing: James A. Walcheske (Walcheske, James)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 09/09 10:44 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Sarah K Mueller on behalf of Bug Tussel Wireless LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Sarah K. Mueller (Mueller, Sarah)
Related: [-]
11 11 notice Notice of Hearing Mon 09/09 10:04 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Telephone Scheduling Conference set for 10/11/2024 at 9:30 AM before Judge William C Griesbach. Rule 26 Discovery Plan due by 10/4/2024. The parties shall call the court Zoom conference line at 669-254-5252 , use Meeting ID: 161 5758 9308 , press # to bypass Participant ID, and enter Passcode: 519855 to join the call. To ensure a clear record of the hearing, participants should not use a speaker phone. Participants shall call in prior to the time that the hearing is scheduled to begin so that there is no disruption to the court proceeding. If you have any questions, please contact the Clerk's Office at 920-884-3720. (cc: all counsel) (kwf)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Electronic Filing Error Mon 09/09 9:56 AM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re7 Notice of Appearance. Sarah K. Mueller has not been added to the docket. A separate notice of appearance is required for each attorney who is appearing in the case, and all documents should contain the s/signature of the attorney who files the document. This document must be re-filed. Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov for further guidance. (kwf)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
10 10 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Fri 09/06 10:09 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Bug Tussel Wireless LLC. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Haase, John)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 09/06 10:07 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Bug Tussel Wireless LLC. (Haase, John)
Related: [-]
8 8 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/06 10:05 AM
ANSWER to1 Complaint, and Affirmative Defenses by Bug Tussel Wireless LLC.(Haase, John)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/06 10:02 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John A Haase on behalf of Bug Tussel Wireless LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: Sarah K. Mueller (Haase, John)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 09/06 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by John A Haase on behalf of Bug Tussel Wireless LLC. Attorney(s) appearing: John A. Haase (Haase, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
5 5 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 07/18 10:55 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Bug Tussel Wireless LLC - Waiver sent on 7/8/2024. (Luzi, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
service Summons Issued Tue 07/02 9:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Bug Tussel Wireless LLC. (kwf)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
4 4 misc Consent/Refusal to Jurisdiction by US Magistrate Judge Mon 07/01 9:44 AM
Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction Form filed by Tomika Tolar. (NOTICE: Pursuant to Fed.R.Civ.P. 73 this document is not viewable by the judge.) (Luzi, Scott)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/01 9:26 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott S Luzi on behalf of Tomika Tolar. Attorney(s) appearing: Scott S. Luzi (Luzi, Scott)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Disclosure Statement Mon 07/01 9:25 AM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Tomika Tolar. (Luzi, Scott)
Related: [-]
1 1 30+ pgs cmp Complaint Mon 07/01 9:24 AM
COMPLAINT with Jury Demand; against Bug Tussel Wireless LLC by Tomika Tolar. ( Filing Fee PAID $405 receipt number AWIEDC-4711518)(Luzi, Scott)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Tomika Tolar Consent To Join Form
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Mon 07/01 9:39 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Judge William C Griesbach. Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Stephen Dries to be filed within 21 days; the consent/refusal form is available[LINK:here.] (mew)
Related: [-]