Maine District Court
Judge:John A Woodcock, Jr
Referred: John C Nivison
Case #: 2:24-cv-00236
Nature of Suit290 Real Property - All Other Real Property
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Terminated:Sep 19, 2024
Case in other court:KNOX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, ROCSC-CV-00012
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 3:55 AM EST
Defendant
AUCTION.COM INC
Represented By
DONALD E. FRECHETTE
Locke Lord LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
JAN VAN ECK
102 MAIN STREET
ST GEORGE, ME 04860

GPO Sep 19 2024
ORDER ON MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE AND MOTION TO REMAND granting 9 Motion to Change Venue; denying 15 Motion to Remand to State Court By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)

Docket last updated: 86 minutes ago
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
service Acknowledgment of Receipt of Civil Transfer Tue 09/24 11:05 AM
ACKNOWLEDGEMENT OF RECEIPT of Electronic Civil Case Transfer. Case electronically transferred to District of Connecticut has been opened on 09/19/2024 as case 3:24-cv-01528. (mlm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
18 18 13 pgs order Order on Motion to Change Venue Order on Motion to Remand to State Court Thu 09/19 12:47 PM
ORDER ON MOTION TO CHANGE VENUE AND MOTION TO REMAND granting9 Motion to Change Venue; denying15 Motion to Remand to State Court By JUDGE JOHN A. WOODCOCK, JR. (CCS)
Related: [-]
misc Interdistrict Case Transfer OUT Thu 09/19 2:38 PM
Case electronically transferred to the United States District Court for the District of Connecticut. (jgd)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
17 17 respm Reply to Response to Motion Thu 09/05 3:00 PM
Plaintiff's Reply Memorandum to Defendant's Objection to Remand re15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by JAN VAN ECK.(jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Ex 1: Order,
Att: 2 envelope
Monday, August 26, 2024
16 16 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 08/26 4:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re15 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by AUCTION.COM INC. Reply due by 9/9/2024. (FRECHETTE, DONALD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
15 15 motion Remand to State Court Tue 08/06 2:29 PM
MOTION for Remand by JAN VAN ECK Responses due by 8/27/2024.(jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 envelope
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
14 14 misc Additional Attachments Wed 07/31 9:44 AM
ADDITIONAL ATTACHMENTS filed by AUCTION.COM INC re8 State Court Record .. (FRECHETTE, DONALD) Modified on 7/31/2024 to clarify linked document name (jam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
12 12 motion Stay Tue 07/30 10:02 AM
MOTION to Stay the Time for Defendant to Answer the Complaint until After a Decision on the Motion to Change Venue by AUCTION.COM INC Responses due by 8/20/2024. (FRECHETTE, DONALD)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 07/30 11:33 AM
ORDER granting12 Motion to Stay the Time for Defendant to File Response to Complaint. The time for Defendant to file a response to Plaintiff's complaint is stayed until after the Court rules on the pending motion to change venue, unless the Court establishes a different date upon notice to the parties. The Court issued this order upon the filing of the motion because of the limited time remaining for Defendant to respond to the complaint and for Plaintiff to respond to the motion to change venue. If Plaintiff believes the Court's order on the motion resulted in any prejudice to Plaintiff, Plaintiff may ask the Court to reconsider the order. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 07/29 8:45 AM
Reset Deadlines per directive of Magistrate Judge John C. Nivison: Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement due by 8/9/2024. (jam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Tue 07/16 1:04 PM
Reset Deadlines : Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Disclosure Statement due from JAN VAN ECK due by 7/23/2024. (jam)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
10 10 11 pgs misc Memorandum Tue 07/09 12:01 PM
MEMORANDUM by AUCTION.COM INC in support of9 MOTION to Change Venue .(FRECHETTE, DONALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
9 9 motion Change Venue Tue 07/09 11:56 AM
MOTION to Change Venue by AUCTION.COM INC Responses due by 7/30/2024. (FRECHETTE, DONALD)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Affidavit Tue 07/09 9:49 AM
STATE COURT RECORD filed by AUCTION.COM INC.(FRECHETTE, DONALD) Modified on 7/9/2024 to clarify filing description (jam)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit State Court Summons and Complaint
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Tue 07/09 2:30 PM
ORDER granting6 Motion to Extend Time to File Response to Complaint. Time is extended to August 5, 2024. By MAGISTRATE JUDGE JOHN C. NIVISON. (NIVISON, JOHN)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Tue 07/09 4:06 PM
Reset Answer Deadline for AUCTION.COM INC per Order No. 11: Answer due by 8/5/2024. (jam)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
7 7 misc Rule 7.1 Disclosure Statement Mon 07/01 2:31 PM
RULE 7.1 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by AUCTION.COM INC. (FRECHETTE, DONALD)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Extend Time to Answer Mon 07/01 2:30 PM
MOTION to Extend Time to File Answer by AUCTION.COM INC Responses due by 7/22/2024. (FRECHETTE, DONALD)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 07/01 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DONALD E. FRECHETTE on behalf of AUCTION.COM INC (FRECHETTE, DONALD)
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE: Recently JAN VAN ECK filed a pleading in this Court without representation of an attorney. Information regarding representing yourself is available on the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.med.uscourts.gov/handout-self-represented-parties] including a Handout for Self-Represented Parties. This handout is intended for informational and practical purposes only and in no way takes the place of an attorney's legal advice, but it may provide some answers to procedural and general questions. ALSO NOTE: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. (cc: pro se litigant) (cjd)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Procedural Order Re: Removal of Case Mon 07/01 2:01 PM
PROCEDURAL ORDER RE: REMOVAL: State Court Record due by 7/15/2024. By DEPUTY CLERK: Cheryl Derrah. (cjd)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Mon 07/01 1:58 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (cjd)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Mon 07/01 1:49 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from KNOX COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT, case number ROCSC-CV 24-00012 PAYMENT OF FILING FEE DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. IF FILING FEE IS BEING PAID WITH A CREDIT CARD COUNSEL ARE INSTRUCTED TO LOGIN TO CMECF AND DOCKET Case Opening Filing Fee Paid FOUND IN THE Complaints and Other Initiating Documents CATEGORY. CHECK PAYMENTS DUE WITHIN 48 HOURS. , filed by AUCTION.COM INC. (Service of Process Deadline 9/30/2024) Fee due by 7/3/2024.(cjd)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Complaint and Summons,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Weston's property card,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Stamped Summons,
Att: 4 Exhibit D - Notice to Adverse Party,
Att: 5 Exhibit E - Notice to State Court
utility Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 07/01 2:02 PM
Set Deadlines : Per Civil Rule 7.1 as Amended December 1, 2022 Disclosure Statement due by 7/8/2024. (cjd)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Answer Deadline Mon 07/01 2:04 PM
Set Answer Deadline : Answer due by 7/8/2024. (cjd)
Related: [-]
misc Case Opening Filing Fee Paid Mon 07/01 2:41 PM
Filing Fee Paid via Credit Card ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number AMEDC-2973955.), filed by AUCTION.COM INC.(FRECHETTE, DONALD)
Related: [-]
notice Notice to Pro Se Re First Filing & Address Updates Mon 07/01 2:04 PM
NOTICE: Recently JAN VAN ECK filed a pleading in this Court without representation of an attorney. Information regarding representing yourself is available on the Court's website at[LINK:https://www.med.uscourts.gov/handout-self-represented-parties] including a Handout for Self-Represented Parties. This handout is intended for informational and practical purposes only and in no way takes the place of an attorney's legal advice, but it may provide some answers to procedural and general questions. ALSO NOTE: You are responsible for notifying the Court in writing of any changes to your mailing address or telephone number and of any change in status regarding representation by an attorney. (cc: pro se litigant) (cjd)
Related: [-]