New Jersey Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Stacey L Meisel
Case #: 2:24-bk-16654
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Dismissed:Jul 31, 2024
Terminated:Aug 15, 2024

Debtor
80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC
80 Cottontail Ln
Somerset, NJ 08873-1100
Represented By
Eric Horn
A.Y. Strauss
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
US Dept of Justice Office of the US Trustee One Newark Center Ste 2100
Newark, NJ 07102


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, August 15, 2024
36 36 order Final Decree Thu 08/15 10:48 AM
Final Decree; The following parties were served: Trustee and US Trustee. (ntp)
Related: [-]
utility Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 08/15 10:49 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed. (ntp)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
35 35 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Sat 08/03 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Dismissing Case Sat 08/03 12:13 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Dismissing Case. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 08/02/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 08/02 12:14 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 08/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2024
32 32 order Dismissing Case Wed 07/31 11:52 AM
CONSENT ORDER DISMISSING BANKRUPTCY PETITION OF 80 COTTONTAIL RE HOLDINGS LLC. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/31/2024. (ntp)
Related: [-]
utility Reopen AP Case Wed 07/31 8:53 AM
Adversary Case Reopened (dlr)
Related: [-]
utility Close Adversary Case Wed 07/31 8:55 AM
Adversary Case (2:24-ap-1497) Closed. (dlr)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
31 31 order Motion (Generic) Tue 07/30 2:51 PM
ORDER DETERMINING AUTOMATIC STAY DOES NOT APPLY TO ACTS AGAINST NON-DEBTOR, OWNER OF THE DEBTOR AND THE OWNERS MEMBERSHIP INTEREST IN THE DEBTOR AND DENYING DEBTORS MOTION FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF Related [+]. Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/30/2024. (ntp)
Related: [-] 24
Monday, July 29, 2024
court Hearing Held Wed 07/31 11:36 AM
Minute of Hearing Held, OUTCOME: Denied; Order to be Submitted Related [+] (omf)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 10/29/2024. Filed by Debtor 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC
Friday, July 26, 2024
30 30 answer Objection Fri 07/26 3:42 PM
Objection to Debtor's Motion Seeking To Stay the Sale of the Debtor's Membership Interest. filed by Melissa A. Pena on behalf of IOF III Trust 7B. (Pena, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Jonathan Cuticelli
29 29 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 07/26 10:09 AM
Application for Attorney Robert E. Richards to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filed by Melissa A. Pena on behalf of IOF III Trust 7B. Objection deadline is 8/2/2024. (Pena, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, July 25, 2024
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Notice (generic) Fri 07/26 12:17 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/25/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
27 27 answer Opposition Wed 07/24 2:45 PM
Brief in Opposition to Debtor's Assertion that the Automatic Stay Protects Non-Debtor Owner, Pledgor and Guarantor Related [+]
Related: [-] 16 Additional Emergency Hearing re: Pending UCC Sale. (related document: Emergency Hearing Scheduled re: Pending UCC Sale. (related document:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Eric Horn on behalf of Debtor 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)) filed by Melissa A. Pena on behalf of IOF III Trust 7B. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pena, Melissa
Tuesday, July 23, 2024
26 26 court Clerk's Office Quality Control Message - Certification of Service Tue 07/23 2:42 PM
Clerk's Office Quality Control Message: Please note that Local Form Certification of Service must be filed in accordance with the appropriate service provisions. This local form can be found in the Forms section of the Courts website www.njb.uscourts.gov. Related [+] (ntp)
Related: [-] 6 Application For Retention of Professional A.Y. Strauss LLC as Counsel to the Debtor and Debtor in Possession Filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. Objections due by 7/22/2024. (Attachments: # 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Eric H. Horn in Support of Retention # 2 Proposed Order) filed by Debtor 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC
Monday, July 22, 2024
utility Remark re: Missing Documents Filed Mon 07/22 9:41 AM
Remar Related [+]. No Documents Missing - All Required Documents Filed (mlc)
Related: [-] 22 Missing Document(s) Filed filed by Debtor 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC
court Hearing Withdrawn (Document) Mon 07/22 3:59 PM
Hearing Withdrawn. Order to Show Cause Vacated - All Missing Documents Filed Related [+] (ntp)
Related: [-] 10 Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of All Creditors, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/2/2024. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.
Sunday, July 21, 2024
25 25 court BNC Hrg to Dismiss Case Mon 07/22 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Notice of Hearing to Dismiss Case. No. of Notices: 3. Notice Date 07/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
24 24 motion Motion (Generic) - Only use if no other event is applicable Fri 07/19 3:50 PM
Motion re: Extension of Stay and Injuction Filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. Hearing scheduled for 7/29/2024 at 02:30 PM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Horn, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Tzvi Rivkin in Support of Motion and Complaint
Att: 2 Proposed Order
23 23 cmp Complaint Fri 07/19 3:35 PM
Adversary case 24-01497 Complaint by 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC, IOF Trust III 7B against IOF Trust III 7B. Fee Amount $ 350.. (72 (Injunctive relief - other)) (Horn, Eric)
Related: [-]
22 22 misc Missing Document(s) Filed Fri 07/19 3:19 PM
Missing Document(s): Declaration Under Penalty For Non Individual Debtors, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of All Creditors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G, filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. (Horn, Eric)
Related: [-]
21 21 utility Notice General Fri 07/19 12:01 PM
General Notice. Event docketed: To Sent Out BNC Notice of Dismissal. Related [+]
Related: [-] 19 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Bad Faith Filing Filed by Melissa A. Pena on behalf of IOF III Trust 7B. Hearing scheduled for 9/12/2024 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp
Thursday, July 18, 2024
20 20 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/18 12:06 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] filed by Melissa A. Pena on behalf of IOF III Trust 7B. (Pena, Melissa)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor IOF III Trust 7B
court Hearing Rescheduled (Document) Thu 07/18 12:24 PM
Hearing Rescheduled from 8/20/2024 Related [+]Hearing scheduled for 09/12/2024 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Bad Faith Filing Filed by Melissa A. Pena on behalf of IOF III Trust 7B. Hearing scheduled for 8/20/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Bill Wang #2 Exhibit A Promissory Note #3 Exhibit B Mortgage and Security Agreement #4 Exhibit C Assignment of Rents and Leases #5 Exhibit D Guaranty #6 Exhibit E Pledge Agreement #7 Exhibit F Assignment Documents to Assignee #8 Exhibit G Assignment Documents to Lender #9 Exhibit H Extension and Amendment to Note and Other Loan Documents #10 Exhibit I Default Letter and Tenant Demand Letter #11 Declaration of Melissa A. Pena #12 Exhibit A to Pena Declaration #13 Memorandum of Law #14 Proposed Order) Filed by Creditor IOF III Trust 7B
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
19 19 motion Dismiss Case Wed 07/17 4:45 PM
Motion to dismiss case for other reasons re:Bad Faith Filing Filed by Melissa A. Pena on behalf of IOF III Trust 7B. Hearing scheduled for 8/20/2024 at 11:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (Pena, Melissa)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration of Bill Wang
Att: 2 Exhibit A Promissory Note
Att: 3 Exhibit B Mortgage and Security Agreement
Att: 4 Exhibit C Assignment of Rents and Leases
Att: 5 Exhibit D Guaranty
Att: 6 Exhibit E Pledge Agreement
Att: 7 Exhibit F Assignment Documents to Assignee
Att: 8 Exhibit G Assignment Documents to Lender
Att: 9 Exhibit H Extension and Amendment to Note and Other Loan Documents
Att: 10 Exhibit I Default Letter and Tenant Demand Letter
Att: 11 Declaration of Melissa A. Pena
Att: 12 Exhibit A to Pena Declaration
Att: 13 Memorandum of Law
Att: 14 Proposed Order
court Hearing Withdrawn (Document) Wed 07/17 3:30 PM
Hearing Withdrawn Related [+]
Related: [-] 16 Additional Emergency Hearing re: Pending UCC Sale. (related document: Emergency Hearing Scheduled re: Pending UCC Sale. (related document:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Eric Horn on behalf of Debtor 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark.) (omf
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
court Hearing Held and Continued Tue 07/16 4:21 PM
Minute of Hearing Held. OUTCOME: Continued Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/29/2024 at 02:30 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (omf)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 10/29/2024. Filed by Debtor 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC
Friday, July 12, 2024
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Notice (generic) Sat 07/13 12:20 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice. No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
17 17 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Wed 07/10 3:48 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Melissa A. Pena on behalf of IOF III Trust 7B. (Pena, Melissa)
Related: [-]
16 16 court Notice of Hearing - (No Upload) Wed 07/10 3:25 PM
Additional Emergency Hearing re: Pending UCC Sale. Related [+]
Related: [-] Emergency Hearing Scheduled re: Pending UCC Sale. (related document:1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Eric Horn on behalf of Debtor 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC). The following parties were served: Debtor, Debtor's Attorney, Trustee, and US Trustee. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp
15 15 court Document Wed 07/10 3:20 PM
Request to Extend Briefing Schedule is granted. Briefing shall be filed by July 17, 2024. Responses, if any, shall be filed by July 22, 2024. Initial hearing scheduled for July 16, 2024 at 2:30 PM will remain. Additional hearing is scheduled for 07/23/2024 at 10:00 AM Related [+] (ntp)
Related: [-] 14 Document re: Letter to Court (related document: Hearing Held and Continued) filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. filed by Debtor 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC
14 14 misc Document Wed 07/10 2:22 PM
Document re: Letter to Court Related [+] filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. (Horn, Eric)
Related: [-] Hearing Held and Continued
Monday, July 08, 2024
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance and Request Mon 07/08 8:20 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notice filed by Fran B. Steele on behalf of U.S. Trustee. (Steele, Fran)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 04, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Order Fri 07/05 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Order No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 07/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors Fri 07/05 12:15 AM
BNC Certificate of Notice - Meeting of Creditors. No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 07/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
10 10 order Show Cause Tue 07/02 2:54 PM
Order to Show Cause Why Case Should Not be Dismissed for re: Failure to File Missing Documents. Missing Documents: Summary of Assets and Liabilities for Non-Individuals, Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors, Statement of Financial Affairs For Non-Individuals, 20 Largest Unsecured Creditors, List of All Creditors, Schedules A/B,D,E/F,G, Service of notice of the entry of this order pursuant to Rule 9022 was made on the appropriate parties. See BNC Certificate of Notice. Signed on 7/2/2024. Hearing scheduled for 7/23/2024 at 10:00 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (dlr)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Tue 07/02 10:06 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership filed. Filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. (Horn, Eric)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Missing Document(s) Filed Tue 07/02 10:05 AM
Missing Document(s): List of Equity Security Holders filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. (Horn, Eric)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Missing Document(s) Filed Tue 07/02 10:03 AM
Missing Document(s): Schedules H, filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. (Horn, Eric)
Related: [-]
6 6 7 pgs motion Retention (Do Not Use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner) Tue 07/02 9:44 AM
Application For Retention of Professional A.Y. Strauss LLC as Counsel to the Debtor and Debtor in Possession Filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. Objections due by 7/22/2024. (Horn, Eric)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Declaration of Eric H. Horn in Support of Retention
Att: 2 Proposed Order
5 5 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Tue 07/02 9:35 AM
Meeting of Creditors - Chapter 11. 341(a) meeting to be held on 8/7/2024 at 09:00 AM at Telephonic. Proofs of Claim due by 9/9/2024. Government Proof of Claim due by 12/30/2024. (rah)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Missing Document(s) Filed Tue 07/02 9:20 AM
Missing Document(s): Atty Disclosure Statement filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. (Horn, Eric)
Related: [-]
court Hearing Scheduled (Document) Tue 07/02 10:51 AM
Emergency Hearing Scheduled re: Pending UCC Sale. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 7/2/2024 at 10:45 AM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (rah)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Eric Horn on behalf of Debtor 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC
court Clerk's Office Quality Control Message - Certification of Service Tue 07/02 1:25 PM
Clerk's Office Quality Control Message: Please note that Local Form Certification of Service must be filed in accordance with the appropriate service provisions. This local form can be found in the Forms section of the Courts website www.njb.uscourts.gov. Related [+] (rah)
Related: [-] 6 Application For Retention of Professional A.Y. Strauss LLC as Counsel to the Debtor and Debtor in Possession Filed by Eric Horn on behalf of Debtor 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC
court Hearing Held and Continued Tue 07/02 4:59 PM
Minute of Emergency Hearing re: Pending UCC Sale. OUTCOME: Held and Continued. Briefing shall be filed by July 10, 2024. Responses, if any, shall be filed by July 15, 2024. Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 07/16/2024 at 02:30 PM at SLM - Courtroom 3A, Newark. (ntp)
Related: [-] 1 Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 10/29/2024. Filed by Debtor 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC
Monday, July 01, 2024
3 3 5 pgs misc Document Mon 07/01 4:02 PM
Document re: Amended Chapter 11 Petition Related [+] filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. (Horn, Eric)
Related: [-] 1 Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) filed by Debtor 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC
2 2 misc Document Mon 07/01 3:24 PM
Document re: Corporate Authorization re Commencement of Chapter 11 Case filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. (Horn, Eric)
Related: [-]
1 1 3 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 07/01 3:21 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Filed by Eric Horn on behalf of 80 Cottontail RE Holdings LLC. Chapter 11 Debtors Exclusive Right to File a Plan Expires on 10/29/2024. (Horn, Eric)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Credit Card/Debit Card Receipt Mon 07/01 3:23 PM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-16654 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A46946446, fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1