New York Western District Court
Judge:John L Sinatra, Jr
Case #: 1:24-cv-00619
Nature of Suit480 Other Statutes - Consumer Credit
Cause15:1692 Fair Debt Collection Act
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Terminated:Sep 06, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 3:26 AM EST
Defendant
Nickel City Group LLC
Defendant
Gregory Cipressi
Defendant
Alicia Hintz
Defendant
Steve Lewinski
Defendant
Nickel City Acquisitions LLC
Plaintiff
Ajaye Royal
Represented By
Michael R. Bertucci
Agruss Law Firm
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, September 06, 2024
7 7 order Text Order Fri 09/06 9:35 AM
TEXT ORDER acknowledging6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. This action is dismissed without prejudice. The Clerk of Court is directed to close this case. SO ORDERED. Issued by Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. on 9/6/2024. (KLH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/05 9:30 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Ajaye Royal (Bertucci, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Thu 07/25 12:42 PM
Summons Issued as to Gregory Cipressi, Alicia Hintz, Steve Lewinski, Nickel City Acquisitions LLC. (DDS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 07/16 8:18 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by Ajaye Royal.(Bertucci, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summonses
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
3 3 service Summons Issued Tue 07/02 2:50 PM
Summons Issued as to Nickel City Group LLC. (LB)
Related: [-]
utility E-Filing Notification Tue 07/02 2:45 PM
E-Filing Notification regarding1 COMPLAINT: email address and law firm name for filing attorney Michael Bertucci listed on the complaint does not match the information listed on the docket. Please correct information in PACER and/or submit a change of address form to the Clerk of Court (form on our website at https://www.nywd.uscourts.gov/cmecf-information-0). (LB)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Tue 07/02 2:48 PM
Case assigned to Hon. John L. Sinatra, Jr. Notification to chambers of online civil opening. (LB)
Related: [-]
adr Automatic Referral to Mediation Tue 07/02 2:50 PM
AUTOMATIC REFERRAL TO MEDIATION Pursuant to Section 2.1(A) of the Plan for Alternative Dispute Resolution in the United States District Court for the Western District of New York (the ADR Plan), this case is automatically referred to ADR. To access the ADR Plan and for inquiries regarding the Court's ADR Program please review the Court's[LINK:ADR webpage] and/or contact the Court's ADR Administrator at[LINK:adrprogram@nywd.uscourts.gov] . Prior to the Local Rule 16 scheduling conference, counsel and unrepresented parties shall review the [LINK:ADR Plan] and confer with each other regarding ADR for this case. Unless the parties agree to a different intervention, it is presumed they will participate in mediation. The parties shall be prepared to report on the outcome of their ADR discussion at the scheduling conference, as the initial Scheduling Order for this case will establish ADR deadlines in accordance with the ADR Plan.(LB)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge Tue 07/02 2:50 PM
Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge: A United States Magistrate of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form (AO-85) is available for download at[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/services-forms/forms] . (LB)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 07/01 4:38 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Ajaye Royal. (Bertucci, Michael)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/01 4:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Nickel City Group LLC $ 405 receipt number ANYWDC-5221445, filed by Ajaye Royal.(Bertucci, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons