Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Stephanie M Rose
Case #: 4:24-cv-00218
Nature of Suit530 Prisoner Petitions - Habeas Corpus - General
Cause28:2241 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus (federa
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Terminated:Jul 26, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
6 6 misc Mail Returned Wed 08/14 9:35 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to James Edward Hawkins which included4 Judgment. (sml)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Mail Returned Wed 08/14 9:33 AM
Mail Returned as Undeliverable. Mail sent to James Edward Hawkins which included3 Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, dismissing Petition. (sml)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
4 4 order Judgment Sat 07/27 1:37 PM
JUDGMENT in favor of Muscatine County Jail against James Edward Hawkins, Jr. Signed by Clerk John S. Courter on 7/26/2024. (sml)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
3 3 order Proceed In Forma Pauperis Thu 07/25 4:48 PM
ORDER dismissing1 Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, granting2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Chief Judge Stephanie M. Rose on 7/25/2024. (nan)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 07/01 3:08 PM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by James Edward Hawkins, Jr. (btg)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus Mon 07/01 3:06 PM
PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus, filed by James Edward Hawkins, Jr. (btg)
Related: [-]