Arizona District Court
Judge:Diane J Humetewa
Case #: 2:24-cv-01606
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Terminated:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 1:26 AM MST
Defendant
Unknown Parties
Plaintiff
45Footwear LLC
Represented By
Shelton L Freeman
Rose Law Group PC
contact info
Jonathan Adam Dessaules
Dessaules Law Group
contact info
Caroline Devereux
Aegis Law LLC
contact info
Douglas M Imperi, II
Dessaules Law Group
contact info
Charles Pullium, III
Aegis Law LLC
contact info
Patrick M Jones
Aegis Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM MST
Friday, October 04, 2024
29 29 misc Remark (Patent Trademark Copyright) Fri 10/04 7:58 AM
Copy of AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or Trademark emailed to Patent and Trademark OfficeAO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright emailed to Copyright Office on this date.(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 AO 121 Form/Order
Thursday, October 03, 2024
28 28 5 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Thu 10/03 4:14 PM
ORDER: The Motion to Seal Schedule A Attached to the Notice of Appearance as Co- Counsel26 is DENIED. The Motion to Dismiss the Matter without Prejudice is GRANTED this action is DISMISSED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED directing the Clerk of Court to terminate this action in its entirety. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/03/2024. (REK)
Related: [-]
27 27 respoth Sealed Lodged Proposed Document (NEF) Thu 10/03 9:51 AM
*Denied per28 Order* SEALED LODGED Proposed Schedule A re:26 MOTION to Seal Document19 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Motion to Seal Schedule A Attached to the Notice of Appearance as Co-Counsel and to Dismiss Matter Without Prejudice . Document to be filed by Clerk if Motion or Stipulation to Seal is granted. Filed by 45Footwear LLC. (Dessaules, Jonathan) Modified on 10/3/2024 (REK)
Related: [-]
26 26 motion Seal Document Thu 10/03 9:47 AM
MOTION to Seal Document19 Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Motion to Seal Schedule A Attached to the Notice of Appearance as Co-Counsel and to Dismiss Matter Without Prejudice by 45Footwear LLC.(Dessaules, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
25 25 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 10/02 10:29 AM
ORDER approving the Application for Substitution of Counsel (Doc.24 ). FURTHER ORDERED Plaintiff shall have until October 3, 2024, to file the requisite proofs of service on Defendants. On October 4, 2024, the Clerk of Court is directed to terminate any Defendant that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure without further order from the Court. See document for details. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 10/1/24. (EJA)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
24 24 motion Substitute Attorney Mon 09/30 11:21 AM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney Application for Substitution of Counsel Pursuant to LRCiv 83.3(b) (With Client Consent) by 45Footwear LLC.(Dessaules, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 12, 2024
23 23 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information Thu 09/12 9:19 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Supplemental Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. An answer, amended complaint, or other pleading22 has been filed that may include additional trademarks, patents, or copyrights allegedly violated that were not previously included. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that may need to be completed by the party who filed the above document. If your recently filed pleading adds or changes information related to the original patents, trademarks, or copyright allegations, please complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, you must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information , found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If there are no changes to the copyright, trademark, or patent information previously submitted for this case, then the party who filed the above document must file a Notice, within seven (7) days, indicating such using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information , found under the Other Filings header. (REK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
22 22 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 09/10 3:19 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by 45Footwear LLC.(Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
21 21 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Thu 08/22 8:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M Jones on behalf of 45Footwear LLC. (Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
misc Remark (Public) Wed 08/07 1:57 PM
Remark: Out of state attorney Caroline Devereux terminated as counsel of record for noncompliance with admission procedures; party or parties represented by other admitted counsel. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
20 20 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Fri 08/02 12:12 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Pullium, III on behalf of 45Footwear LLC. (Pullium, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
misc Remark re Pro Hac Vice Motion Mon 07/29 9:32 AM
Remark: Pro hac vice motion(s) granted for Charles Pullium, III on behalf of Plaintiff 45Footwear LLC. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Thu 07/18 4:57 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Shelton L Freeman on behalf of 45Footwear LLC.(Freeman, Shelton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Schedule A
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
18 18 misc Application Wed 07/17 4:54 PM
APPLICATION re: Motion for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Charles Pullium by Plaintiff 45Footwear LLC.(Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Attachment Certificate of Good Standing
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
17 17 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Wed 07/03 10:42 AM
ORDER that the Telephonic Status Conference set for July 3, 2024, is VACATED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff's Ex Parte Motion for Entry of a Temporary Restraining Order ("TRO"), Asset Restraining Order, to Allow Alternative Service and Expedited Discovery (Doc.11 ) is DENIED without prejudice. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiff shall have until July 18, 2024, for authorized counsel to file a Notice of Appearance or this case will be dismissed in its entirety. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/3/2024. (LFIG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
16 16 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set/Reset Hearings ~Util - Terminate Motions Tue 07/02 3:22 PM
ORDER that Plaintiff's Motion to Seal (Doc.10 ) is DENIED without prejudice to renew. A Telephonic Status Conference re: Plaintiff's TRO is set for 7/3/2024 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 605, 401 West Washington Street, Phoenix, AZ 85003 before Judge Diane J Humetewa. Participating counsel shall dial in five minutes prior to the hearing start time by dialing 1-855-244-8681 and entering access code 2314 067 9831 when prompted. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/2/2024. (See Order for details.) (LFIG)
Related: [-]
15 15 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Tue 07/02 1:52 PM
ORDER - Plaintiff(s) must file proof of service of the summons and complaint or of waiver of service with the Clerk of Court no later than 9/28/24. The Clerk shall terminate any Defendant in this action that has not been served pursuant to Rule 4(m) on 9/29/24. Signed by Judge Diane J Humetewa on 7/2/24. (DXD)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Tue 07/02 9:30 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Complaint Ex B - Registrations by Plaintiff 45Footwear LLC. (Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
13 13 service Summons Submitted Tue 07/02 9:22 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by 45Footwear LLC. (Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
12 12 18 pgs misc Memorandum Tue 07/02 9:04 AM
MEMORANDUM in Support of 11 MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by Plaintiff 45Footwear LLC. (Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Temporary Restraining Order Tue 07/02 9:01 AM
EX PARTE MOTION for Temporary Restraining Order by 45Footwear LLC.(Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
10 10 motion Seal Document Tue 07/02 8:12 AM
EX PARTE MOTION to Seal Document by 45Footwear LLC.(Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
9 9 2 pgs notice Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information Tue 07/02 7:54 AM
NOTICE of Filing - AO 120 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action or Appeal Regarding a Patent or TrademarkAO 121 Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Copyright filed by 45Footwear LLC.(Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Forms AO 120 - TM,
Att: 2 Forms AO 121 - copyright
8 8 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Tue 07/02 7:30 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by 45Footwear LLC. (Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance/Association of Counsel Tue 07/02 7:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Patrick M Jones on behalf of 45Footwear LLC. (Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Tue 07/02 7:15 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Complaint Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff 45Footwear LLC. (Jones, Patrick)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Deficiency re Disclosure Statement Mon 07/01 4:49 PM
NOTICE TO PARTY RE: DISCLOSURE STATEMENT: Pursuant to FRCiv 7.1 and LRCiv 7.1.1 the attached Disclosure Statement form must be filed by all nongovernmental corporate parties with their first appearance. A supplemental statement must be filed upon any change in the information. In addition, if not already filed, the Disclosure Statement should be filed within 14 days. Disclosure Statement Deadline set as to 45Footwear LLC. (REK)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Mon 07/01 3:56 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by 45Footwear LLC. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit the Automated JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet using the following: Civil, Other Filings, Other Documents, Additional Attachment to Main Document and link to the Complaint. Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
3 3 minute_ord Minute Order ~Util - Initial Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information Mon 07/01 3:55 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Request for Copyright, Trademark, or Patent Information. This case has been designated as a copyright, trademark, or patent case. The Clerk's Office is required to provide information to the Patent and Trademark Office and/or Copyright Office regarding this case. Attached to this docket entry are the required form(s) that must be completed. Plaintiff shall complete the form that is applicable to this particular case. In some cases, you may need to complete both forms. Within seven (7) days, Plaintiff must submit the required form(s) to the Clerk's Office. Please complete the form and file it with the Court using the specific event: Notice of Filing - Copyright, Trademark or Patent Information , found under the Other Filings header. Please DO NOT mail the form directly to the Patent or Copyright Office. The Clerk's Office will submit the form. If neither form is required for this case, please file a notice indicating the reason the form is not necessary and use the event listed above. This form must be updated if additional patents, copyrights, or trademarks are alleged in a responsive pleading. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc New Case Opened Mon 07/01 3:54 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23199335. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Diane J Humetewa. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-01606 PHX-DJH. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 14 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 07/01 3:52 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23199335 filed by 45Footwear LLC. (submitted by Patrick Jones)(REK)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit