New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Louis A Scarcella
Case #: 8:24-bk-72586
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Single Asset Real Estate
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
The Gateway at Wynwood LLC
11 Sunrise Plz
Valley Stream, NY 11580-6170
Represented By
Kevin J Nash
Goldberg Weprin Finkel Goldstein LLP
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
88 88 notice Notice to Cure Tue 05/06 1:06 PM
Notice to Cure Filed by Kevin J Nash on behalf of 2830 Wynwood Properties LLC, The Gateway at Wynwood LLC Related [+] (Nash, Kevin)
Related: [-] 84 Order to Schedule Hearing (Generic)
87 87 notice Notice to Cure Tue 05/06 12:43 PM
PLEASE DISREGARD. ENTERED IN ERROR. Notice to Cure Filed by Kevin J Nash on behalf of 2830 Wynwood Properties LLC, The Gateway at Wynwood LLC Related [+] (Nash, Kevin)Modified on 5/6/2025 (dhc)
Related: [-] 84 Order to Schedule Hearing (Generic)
Sunday, May 04, 2025
86 86 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Mon 05/05 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Application/Notice/Order Notice Date 05/04/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 02, 2025
85 85 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (BK) Sat 05/03 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (BK) Notice Date 05/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
84 84 order Schedule Hearing (Generic) Fri 05/02 10:17 AM
Order Approving Bid Procedures for the Sale of the Debtors' Properties at 1916 and 2830 North Miami Avenue, Miami, Florida with Assumption and Assignment of Existing Leases and Otherwise Free and Clear of Liens, Claims, Interests and Non-Permitted Encumbrances, and Establishing Bar Date for the Filing of Objections to Proposed Cure Claims. The Revised Bid Procedures, a copy of which are attached hereto as Exhibit A, are approved for selling the Properties. The confirmation of auction results and final approval of the Sale shall be subject to a further order of the Bankruptcy Court following a hearing to be held on 7/8/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Any unresolved cure claim dispute will be scheduled for resolution at the Sale Hearing. Debtor shall serve this Order, together with the Revised Bid Procedures, and a notice of proposed cure amounts to be paid with respect to the unexpired leases on or before 5/6/2025 Related [+]. Signed on 5/2/2025 (dhc)
Related: [-] 71 Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens under 11 U.S.C 363(f) filed by Debtor The Gateway at Wynwood LLC, Interested Party 2830 Wynwood Properties LLC, Jointly Administered Debtor 2830 Wynwood Properties LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit
Thursday, May 01, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Thu 05/01 1:14 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; - Appearances: Stan Y Yang, Paul A Rubin, Kevin J Nash, David Goldwasser. Status hearing to be held on 07/08/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 4 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Thu 05/01 1:15 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; - Appearances: Stan Y Yang, Paul A Rubin, Kevin J Nash, David Goldwasser. 'Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 65 Motion for Relief From Stay Filed by Creditor A10 Capital, LLC (as Servicer and Special Servicer)
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Thu 05/01 1:15 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; - Appearances: Stan Y Yang, Paul A Rubin, Kevin J Nash, David Goldwasser. Hearing scheduled for 07/08/2025 at 09:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 71 Motion to Sell Property of the Estate Free and Clear of Liens under 11 U.S.C 363(f) Filed by Debtor The Gateway at Wynwood LLC, Interested Party 2830 Wynwood Properties LLC, Jointly Administered Debtor 2830 Wynwood Properties LLC
Wednesday, April 30, 2025
83 83 court Transcript (Attorney Ordered) Wed 04/30 10:50 AM
Transcript & Notice regarding the hearing held on 04/03/25. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the Office of the Clerk or may be purchased from the court transcriber. [Please see the court's website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency].. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Due By 05/7/2025. Redaction Request Due By 05/21/2025. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 06/2/2025. TRANSCRIPT ACCESS WILL BE ELECTRONICALLY RESTRICTED THROUGH 07/29/2025 AND MAY BE VIEWED AT THE OFFICE OF THE CLERK. (Veritext)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
82 82 misc Letter Tue 04/29 9:00 AM
Letter re: status Filed by J Ted Donovan on behalf of 2830 Wynwood Properties LLC, The Gateway at Wynwood LLC (Donovan, J)
Related: [-]