Nevada District Court
Judge:Craig S Denney
Case #: 3:24-cv-00280
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights (Employment Discrimination)
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 12:57 AM PST
Defendant
Washoe County
Represented By
Michael W. Large, Govt
Washoe County District Attorney
contact info
Plaintiff
Amber Howell
Represented By
Kendra J. Jepsen
Jepsen Law, PLLC
contact info
Silvia U. Villanueva
Black & Wadhams
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
45 45 appeal USCA Order Wed 05/14 11:14 AM
ORDER of USCA, Ninth Circuit, as to35 Notice of Appeal. This case is dismissed. This order serves as the mandate of the court. USCA Case Number 25-2636 (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
44 44 2 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 05/13 3:35 PM
ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FOR DEFENDANT (ECF No.43 ) : Deputy District Attorneys Lindsay L. Liddell and Brandon R. Price substituted in as legal counsel in place stead of Chief Deputy District Attorney Michael W.Large. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 5/13/2025., (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
43 43 notice Notice Appearance of Counsel Tue 05/13 12:32 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by attorney Brandon R. Price on behalf of Defendant Washoe County. Substitution of Counsel for Defendant (Price, Brandon)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
42 42 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Mon 05/12 11:52 AM
ORDER granting 41 Stipulation to Withdraw Motion to Stay Pending Appeal. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 5/12/2025.(Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
41 41 motion Stipulation Fri 05/09 10:25 AM
STIPULATION and Order to Withdraw Motion to Stay Pending Appeal re34 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery by Plaintiff Amber Howell. (Jepsen, Kendra) (other) (dispositive)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
40 40 cmp Complaint Amended Wed 05/07 3:08 PM
Second AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against All Plaintiffs by Amber Howell. No changes to parties. (Jepsen, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Right to Sue Letter
Friday, May 02, 2025
39 39 respm Response Fri 05/02 11:16 AM
RESPONSE to34 Motion to Stay Case or Discovery by Defendant Washoe County. Replies due by 5/9/2025. (Large, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, April 24, 2025
38 38 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Fri 04/25 12:02 PM
ORDER granting36 STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME. Second Amended Complaint deadline: 5/7/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 4/24/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
37 37 appeal USCA Order Time Schedule Fri 04/25 7:15 AM
USCA TIME SCHEDULE ORDER and Docketing Notice as to35 Notice of Appeal. USCA Case Number 25-2636 . (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DRM)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
36 36 motion Stipulation Wed 04/23 10:36 AM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) for filing the Second Amended Complaint by Plaintiff Amber Howell. (Jepsen, Kendra) (extend) (amend)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 22, 2025
35 35 appeal Notice Appeal Tue 04/22 9:36 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to28 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, Order on Motion to Strike,,,,, by Plaintiff Amber Howell. Filing fee $ 605, receipt number ANVDC-8027284. E-mail notice (NEF) sent to the US Court of Appeals, Ninth Circuit. Designation of Transcripts and Transcript Order forms and instructions for appeal can be found on the Court's website at [LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . (Villanueva, Silvia)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 21, 2025
34 34 motion Motion Stay Case or Discovery Mon 04/21 5:41 PM
MOTION to Stay Case by Plaintiff Amber Howell. Responses due by 5/5/2025.(Villanueva, Silvia)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavits iso Motion
Wednesday, April 16, 2025
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1 Thu 04/17 12:32 PM
ORDER denying31 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 4/16/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
32 32 respm Response to Objection/Appeal of Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling Wed 04/16 10:57 AM
RESPONSE to31 Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1, by Defendant Washoe County. (Large, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 07, 2025
31 31 motion Objection/Appeal Magistrate Judge Order/Ruling LR IB 3-1 Mon 04/07 8:17 PM
OBJECTION/APPEAL Magistrate Judge order or ruling under LR IB 3-1 by Plaintiff Amber Howell. Responses due by 4/21/2025. (Jepsen, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Friday, April 04, 2025
30 30 7 pgs order Order on Stipulation Protective Order Fri 04/04 1:51 PM
PROTECTIVE ORDER granting 29 Stipulated Protective Order. Note: Paragraph 9 is modified to reflect that although the parties may agree to be bound by the confidentiality terms of this Order beyond the conclusion of this lawsuit, the dismissal of this action will terminate the jurisdiction of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 4/4/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Related: [-]
29 29 motion Stipulation Fri 04/04 9:19 AM
STIPULATION Protective Order by Plaintiff Amber Howell. (Jepsen, Kendra) (other) (protective)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
28 28 18 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Order on Motion to Strike Mon 03/24 11:01 AM
ORDER - IT IS THEREFORE ORDERED that Defendant's motion to dismiss Plaintiff's FAC (ECF No.11 ) is GRANTED. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs FAC (ECF No.8 ) is DISMISSED in its entirety. Plaintiff is granted leave to file a Second Amended Complaint (SAC) on her first, second, third, fourth, and fifth claims as explained herein. Should Plaintiff choose to file a SAC, the deadline is April 23, 2025. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that Plaintiffs motion to strike exhibits to Defendant's motion to dismiss (ECF No.18 ) is DENIED as moot. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 3/24/2025. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - GA)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
27 27 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Wed 12/11 1:57 PM
MINUTES OF PROCEEDINGS - Early Neutral Evaluation session held on 12/11/2024 before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr. Crtrm Administrator: M. Brown ; Pla Counsel: Kendra Jepsen, Silvia Villanueva witth Amber Howell ; Def Counsel: Michael Large with Washoe County Comptroller Cathy Hill and Washoe County Board of Commissioners chair Alexis Hill ; Court Reporter: Liberty ; Time of Hearing: 9:00 AM ; Recording start and end times: 9:01 am - 9:02 am; 10:14 am - 10:16 am ; Courtroom: 6 ; ENE held on 12/11/2024. No settlement reached at this time. The case returns to the normal litigation track. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - MB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
26 26 notice Notice AO 85 Consent to Mag Judge Wed 11/27 9:23 AM
NOTICE PURSUANT TO LOCAL RULE IB 2-2: In accordance with 28 USC § 636(c) and FRCP 73, the parties in this action are provided with a link to the "AO 85 Notice of Availability, Consent, and Order of Reference - Exercise of Jurisdiction by a U.S. Magistrate Judge" form on the Court's website -[LINK:www.nvd.uscourts.gov] . AO 85 Consent forms should NOT be electronically filed. Upon consent of all parties, counsel are advised to manually file the form with the Clerk's Office. (A copy of form AO 85 has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (GA)
Related: [-]
25 25 4 pgs order Order on Stipulation Scheduling Order Tue 11/26 3:39 PM
ORDER granting24 Stipulated Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. Discovery due by 7/7/2025. Dispositive Motions due by 8/6/2025. Proposed Joint Pretrial Order due by 9/5/2025. Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 11/26/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - DLS)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 25, 2024
24 24 motion Stipulation Mon 11/25 6:08 PM
Proposed STIPULATION Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order [Special Scheduling Review Requested] by Defendant Washoe County. (Large, Michael) (other) (discovery)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
23 23 respm Reply Thu 11/21 12:15 PM
REPLY to Response to18 Motion to Strike by Plaintiff Amber Howell. (Jepsen, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
22 22 respm Response Thu 11/14 9:49 AM
RESPONSE to18 Motion to Strike by Defendant Washoe County. Replies due by 11/21/2024. (Large, Michael)
Related: [-]
21 21 respm Reply Thu 11/14 9:48 AM
REPLY to Response to11 Motion to Dismiss,, by Defendant Washoe County. (Large, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
20 20 minord Minute Order Wed 11/13 11:01 AM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 11/13/2024. By Deputy Clerk: LGM. The Early Neutral Evaluation set before this Court on 12/11/2024 at 9:00 AM shall be conducted utilizing Zoom video conferencing technology. Counsel shall provide the Courtroom Deputy at lisa_mann@nvd.uscourts.gov with the email addresses of all those required to participate in the Early Neutral Evaluation. IT IS SO ORDERED. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
Related: [-]
19 19 6 pgs order Order Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Session Wed 11/13 10:48 AM
ORDER SCHEDULING EARLY NEUTRAL EVALUATION: An Early Neutral Evaluation is set for 12/11/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid Jr. The written evaluation statements shall be received by the Clerk's Office, Suite 301, no later than 4:00 p.m. , on Wednesday, December 4, 2024 . See the attached order for specifications. Signed by Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr on 11/13/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - LGM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
18 18 motion Motion Strike Tue 11/05 4:54 PM
MOTION to Strike by Plaintiff Amber Howell. Responses due by 11/19/2024. (Jepsen, Kendra) (answer)
Related: [-]
17 17 respm Response Tue 11/05 4:52 PM
RESPONSE to11 Motion to Dismiss,, by Plaintiff Amber Howell. Replies due by 11/12/2024. (Jepsen, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
16 16 2 pgs order Order on Stipulation Tue 10/15 2:26 PM
ORDER granting 15 Stipulation to Extend Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule. Responses due by 11/5/2024 . Replies due by 11/14/2024 . Signed by Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney on 10/15/2024. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Related: [-]
15 15 motion Stipulation Tue 10/15 1:47 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME (First Request) Stipulation and Proposed Order to Extend Motion to Dismiss Briefing Schedule by Defendant Washoe County. (Large, Michael) (extend) (sumjgm)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2024
notice Clerks Notice Reassign Judge Fri 10/11 9:46 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: This case is reassigned to Magistrate Judge Robert A. McQuaid, Jr for ENE. (no image attached) (WJ)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
12 12 order Standing Order Thu 10/10 12:05 PM
CIVIL STANDING ORDER OF U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE CRAIG S. DENNEY. (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HJ)
Related: [-]
11 11 26 pgs motion Motion Dismiss Thu 10/10 11:26 AM
MOTION to Dismiss by Defendant Washoe County. Responses due by 10/24/2024. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 10/20/2024. Discovery Plan/Scheduling Order due by 11/24/2024.(Large, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 14 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 2 18 pgs Exhibit,
Att: 3 6 pgs Exhibit
minord Minute Order Recusal Thu 10/10 2:17 PM
MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS of the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin on 10/10/2024. With good cause appearing, the Honorable Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin recuses herself in this action. IT IS ORDERED that this action is referred to the Clerk for random reassignment of this case for all further proceedings. (no image attached) (Copies have been distributed pursuant to the NEF - HL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
10 10 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 09/25 4:57 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Amber Howell. Washoe County served on 9/24/2024. (Jepsen, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 09/20 8:51 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Washoe County. (DLS)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
8 8 cmp Complaint Amended Thu 09/19 4:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Washoe County by Amber Howell. No changes to parties. (Jepsen, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Summons
Thursday, July 18, 2024
7 7 misc Certificate Interested Parties Thu 07/18 10:07 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties by Amber Howell. There are no known interested parties other than those participating in the case (Jepsen, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
misc QC Notice Fri 07/12 7:41 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE. To date, a Certificate of Interested Parties has not been filed, pursuant to LR 7.1-1, by Amber Howell. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/19/2024. (no image attached) (KMB)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Tue 07/02 8:28 AM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to Washoe County. (DRM)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Option to Decline MJ - FORM Tue 07/02 8:25 AM
OPTION TO DECLINE MAGISTRATE JUDGE OVERSEEING YOUR CASE. The attached form must be filed in the docket or received by the Clerk within 21 days of your first appearance in the case should you choose to decline consent. (A copy of the form has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DRM)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc General Orders regarding MJ assignment Tue 07/02 8:24 AM
GENERAL ORDER 2023-11 IN RE: CONSENT AND REFERRALS TO UNITED STATES MAGISTRATE JUDGES UNDER 28 U.S.C. § 636. (A copy of the General Order has been mailed to parties not receiving electronic service.) (DRM)
Related: [-]
utility Assign Judges in Civil Case Tue 07/02 8:23 AM
Case randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Craig S. Denney. (DRM)
Related: [-]
notice ENE Notice Tue 07/02 8:26 AM
CLERK'S NOTICE: Pursuant to Local Rule 16-6 this case has been assigned to the Early Neutral Evaluation Program. Magistrate Judge Carla Baldwin will be the evaluating judge in this case. No ENE will be conducted in cases subject to arbitration. Parties to cases subject to mandatory arbitration, as well as parties who agree to arbitrate, must notify the Court of the same no later than 14 days after the date of this Notice. Failure to do so may result in sanctions. (no image attached) (DRM)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/01 6:07 PM
COMPLAINT against Amber Howell (Filing fee $405 receipt number ANVDC-7734684) by Amber Howell. Certificate of Interested Parties due by 7/11/2024. Proof of service due by 9/29/2024. (Jepsen, Kendra)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summons,
Att: 3 Exhibit