New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Brian M Cogan
Case #: 1:24-cv-04635
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Terminated:Jan 10, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 3:22 AM EST
Defendant
Jewelry Designer Showcase, Inc.
4366A Victory Blvd.
Staten Islabd, NY 10314
Represented By
Steven J. Miller
The Miller Law Offices, PLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Scott Richter
3 Greenview Drive
Chesterfield, NJ 08515
Represented By
Bernard Mitchell Alter
Alter & Barbaro
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/05/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Friday, January 10, 2025
order Order(Other) Fri 01/10 10:04 AM
ORDER re:15 . Because of defendant's Chapter 11 filing, this case is automatically stayed and shall be marked as administratively closed pending further Order of the Bankruptcy Court. Unless plaintiff files a notice of voluntary dismissal, the parties shall jointly notify the Court within 10 days of any Order of the Bankruptcy Court (1) lifting the automatic stay as applied to this case, or (2) dismissing the bankruptcy case; or (3) confirming a plan of reorganization for the debtor/defendant's estate, whichever occurs earlier. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 1/10/2025. (PW)
Related: [-]
utility Incomplete ACO Case Termination/Statistical/Non Reportable Closing Fri 01/10 10:06 AM
Incomplete ACO Case Termination/Statistical/Non Reportable Closing. (PW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
15 15 notice Notice(Other) Wed 01/08 10:56 PM
NOTICE by Jewelry Designer Showcase, Inc. Ch 11 Bankruptcy Petition 11 USC 362 Automatic Stay (Miller, Steven)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit NYEB Notice 1:25-bk-40076
Monday, December 16, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Mon 12/16 1:21 PM
ORDER granting14 . Fact discovery to be completed by 2/14/2025. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 12/16/2024. (PW)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to Complete Discovery Fri 12/13 5:24 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to Complete Discovery by Scott Richter. (Alter, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 16, 2024
13 13 misc Filing Fee Received Tue 09/17 11:47 AM
FILING FEE: $ 150.00, receipt number 100016788 re: Sanctions pd. by Alter & Barbaro. (RG)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
minutes Initial Conference Hearing Fri 09/13 12:43 PM
Minute Entry and Order for Initial Status Conference held on 9/13/2024 before Judge Brian M. Cogan. Counsel for defendant appeared telephonically; plaintiff's counsel did not appear and is therefore sanctioned pursuant to Rule 16(f) in the amount of $150, payable to the Clerk of Court within 7 days. The deadline for amended pleadings and joinder of additional parties is 10/1/2024. The parties shall serve interrogatories and written discovery requests by 11/13/2024. Fact discovery to close on 12/16/2024. (PW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
notice Notice of Hearing Wed 09/11 1:49 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Initial Status Conference is reset to 11:00 am on 9/13/2024. The parties are directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 020454116#. (PW)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
12 12 misc Case Management Statement Mon 09/09 4:53 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT STATEMENT (Alter, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
11 11 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 08/30 2:50 PM
Defendant Jewelry Designer Showcase, Inc. ANSWER to1 Complaint, with Affirmative Defenses by Jewelry Designer Showcase, Inc.. (Miller, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Wed 08/14 2:54 PM
ORDER granting in part10 . Defendant's time to file its answer is extended to 8/30/2024. Initial Status Conference is adjourned to 9/13/2024 at 10:30 am. The parties are directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 020454116# and are reminded to comply with the mandatory requirements for the conference at6 . Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 8/14/2024. (PW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 08/08 5:31 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re1 Complaint, and reschedule initial status conference by Jewelry Designer Showcase, Inc.. (Miller, Steven)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Thu 08/08 3:16 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Jewelry Designer Showcase, Inc. (Miller, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 08/07 3:02 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Steven J. Miller on behalf of Jewelry Designer Showcase, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Miller, Steven)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2024
7 7 service Summons Returned Executed Wed 07/24 11:53 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by Scott Richter. Jewelry Designer Showcase, Inc. served on 7/9/2024, answer due 7/30/2024. (Alter, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
6 6 order Scheduling Order Mon 07/08 1:32 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER: A telephonic Initial Status Conference is set for 8/19/2024 at 10:30 am. The parties are directed to call 571-353-2301 and enter Meeting ID 020454116#. See attached mandatory requirements for the conference. Ordered by Judge Brian M. Cogan on 7/8/2024. (PW)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Mon 07/08 12:11 PM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (SDM)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Clerks Notice of Rule 73 Mon 07/08 12:09 PM
Clerk's Notice Re: Consent. A United States Magistrate Judge has been assigned to this case and is available to conduct all proceedings. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent.The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:https://img.nyed.uscourts.gov/files/forms/MJConsentForm.pdf] (SDM)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 07/08 12:08 PM
Summons Issued as to Jewelry Designer Showcase, Inc.. (SDM)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
2 2 misc Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet Tue 07/02 12:45 PM
Civil Cover Sheet.. Re Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet, by Scott Richter (Alter, Bernard)
Related: [-]
notice Notice: Re: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet Tue 07/02 8:21 AM
NOTICE: Incomplete Civil Cover Sheet. The Civil Cover Sheet was not filled out correctly - The Clerk's Office cannot assign this case without a completed 2 Page Form Civil Cover Sheet. Please resubmit a COMPLETED Civil Cover Sheet including the SECOND PAGE (Not the Instruction Page). This event can be found under the event Other Documents - Proposed Summons/Civil Cover Sheet (SDM)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 07/01 10:01 PM
COMPLAINT against Scott Richter filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18031759 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -YES,, filed by Scott Richter. (Alter, Bernard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Summons,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Corporate Disclosure