New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Lois Bloom
Case #: 1:24-cv-04637
Nature of Suit446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Terminated:Feb 19, 2025
Last checked: Saturday Dec 28, 2024 3:22 AM EST
Defendant
162-170 Flatbush Associates LLC
Represented By
Scott R. Green
Goldberg Segalla LLP
contact info
Charles Albert Lazo
Goldberg Segalla LLP
contact info
Defendant
Chick-Fil-A, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Friel Fleming
Morgan, Lewis & Bockius, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Julia Yepez
Represented By
Glen Parker
The Parker Law Group P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
order Stipulation and Order Wed 02/19 11:39 AM
ORDER: In light of the parties' stipulation of voluntarily dismissal pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(ii), ECF No.17 , the Clerk of Court is respectfully directed to close the case. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 2/19/2025. (GKD)
Related: [-]
order ~Util - Terminate Civil Case Fri 02/21 12:04 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (See Order dated 2/19/25) (SG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
17 17 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Tue 02/18 12:01 PM
STIPULATION of Dismissal by 162-170 Flatbush Associates LLC, Chick-Fil-A, Inc. (Fleming, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 10, 2025
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Mon 02/10 11:12 AM
ORDER: The parties' request for an extension of time to file a stipulation discontinuing this case, ECF No.16 , is granted. The parties shall file a stipulation discontinuing this case by February 25, 2025. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 2/10/2025. (GKD)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 07, 2025
16 16 motion Extension of Time to File Document Fri 02/07 10:40 AM
First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Stipulation of Dismissal by Chick-Fil-A, Inc.. (Fleming, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
order Order on Motion to Stay Thu 12/12 2:26 PM
ORDER: The parties report reaching an agreement in principle to resolve this matter. ECF No.15 . The Court commends the parties for their efforts to resolve this matter. The parties shall file a stipulation discontinuing this case by February 11, 2025. All deadlines are stayed. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 12/12/2024. (GKD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
15 15 motion Stay Wed 12/11 5:17 PM
Joint MOTION to Stay All Deadlines Pending Submission of Stipulation of Dismissal by Chick-Fil-A, Inc.. (Fleming, Michael)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Wed 10/30 5:31 PM
ORDER: Defendants, with plaintiff's consent, request a fourth extension of time to respond to the complaint, as the parties are participating in continuing mediation sessions in an effort to resolve the matter. ECF No.14 . The parties held a mediation session on October 21, 2024 and scheduled a second mediation session for December 2, 2024, the next available date where all parties can participate. Id. The request is granted. Unless the case is resolved, defendants shall respond to the complaint by December 16, 2024. The parties shall exchange their initial disclosures and file both a 26(f) Meeting Report and joint status letter by the same date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 10/30/2024. (GKD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
14 14 motion Extension of Time to File Document Tue 10/29 5:06 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint, Serve Initial Disclosures, and file Rule 26(f) meeting report and joint status letter by Chick-Fil-A, Inc.. (Fleming, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 09/27 1:54 PM
ORDER: Defendants request, with plaintiff's consent, a third extension of time to respond to the complaint, in addition to a joint request to adjourn the conference scheduled on October 15, 2024, and to extend the related 26(a) deadlines. ECF No.13 . The parties report they are scheduled to participate in a mediation with a private mediator on October 21, 2024. ECF No.13 . In light of the parties' scheduled mediation, the requests are granted. Defendants shall respond to the complaint by November 6, 2024, exchange their initial disclosures and file both a 26(f) Meeting Report and a joint status letter by the same date. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 9/27/2024. (GKD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
13 13 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 09/26 10:31 AM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer and 26(f) Meeting Report and Serve Initial Disclosures and to Adjourn Initial Conference by Chick-Fil-A, Inc.. (Fleming, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 09/05 3:38 PM
ORDER: Defendants request, with plaintiff's consent, to adjourn the initial conference scheduled for September 11, 2024. ECF No.12 . The parties report that they are engaged in active discussions about resolving the action and have agreed to mediate the matter with a private mediator. ECF No.12 . The request is granted. Defendants shall respond to the complaint by October 3, 2024. The Court shall hold an initial conference on October 15, 2024 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by October 8, 2024. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 9/5/2024. (GKD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
12 12 motion Extension of Time to File Document Wed 09/04 4:30 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint and to Adjourn Initial Conference by Chick-Fil-A, Inc.. (Fleming, Michael)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 29, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Scheduling Order Thu 08/29 3:35 PM
ORDER: Defendants Chick-Fil-A, Inc. and 162-170 Flatbush Associates LLC request a second extension of time to respond to the complaint. ECF Nos.10 ,11 . Defendant Chick-Fil-A, Inc does not state whether plaintiff consents to the request. As a courtesy, the request is granted in part and denied in part. Defendants shall respond to plaintiff's complaint by September 9, 2024. The Court shall hold a conference on September 11, 2024 at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 11A South of the United States Courthouse, 225 Cadman Plaza East, Brooklyn, New York. The parties shall exchange their Rule 26(a)(1) initial disclosures and file a 26(f) Meeting Report by September 9, 2024. Parties are advised that they must contact each other before making any request for an adjournment to the Court. Any request for an adjournment must be electronically filed with the Court at least seventy-two (72) hours before the scheduled conference. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 8/29/2024. (GKD)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
11 11 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Tue 08/27 3:40 PM
Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by 162-170 Flatbush Associates LLC. (Lazo, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2024
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Document Mon 08/26 11:57 AM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint by Chick-Fil-A, Inc.. (Fleming, Michael)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Fri 08/09 12:33 PM
ORDER: Defendant 162-170 Flatbush Associates LLC requests, with plaintiff's consent, a first extension of time to respond to the complaint. ECF No.9 . The request is granted. Defendant 162-170 Flatbush Associates LLC shall respond to the complaint by September 3, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 8/9/2024. (GKD)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Thu 08/08 11:54 AM
Letter MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by 162-170 Flatbush Associates LLC. (Green, Scott)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/30 10:19 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Charles Albert Lazo on behalf of 162-170 Flatbush Associates LLC (aty to be noticed) (Lazo, Charles)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 07/30 10:16 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Scott R. Green on behalf of 162-170 Flatbush Associates LLC (aty to be noticed) (Green, Scott)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Fri 07/26 10:40 AM
ORDER: Defendant requests, with plaintiffs consent, a first extension of time to respond to the complaint. ECF No.6 . The request is granted. Defendant shall respond to the complaint by September 3, 2024. Ordered by Magistrate Judge Lois Bloom on 7/26/2024. (NL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Document Thu 07/25 5:40 PM
Consent MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response to the Complaint by Chick-Fil-A, Inc.. (Fleming, Michael)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/25 5:38 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Michael Friel Fleming on behalf of Chick-Fil-A, Inc. (aty to be noticed) (Fleming, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
4 4 misc Quality Control Check - Attorney Case Opening Tue 07/02 9:25 AM
This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (CV)
Related: [-]
3 3 2 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 07/02 9:23 AM
Summons Issued as to 162-170 Flatbush Associates LLC, Chick-Fil-A, Inc.. (CV)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Opportunity to Consent Tue 07/02 9:22 AM
Clerks Notice Re: Consent. A magistrate judge has been assigned as the presiding judge in this case as part of a Pilot Program, governed by EDNY Administrative Order 2023-23. In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent, the assigned Magistrate Judge is available to conduct all proceedings in this action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to this Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form is also available here:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] Any party may withhold its consent without adverse substantive consequences. Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. Unless all parties consent to the Magistrate Judge jurisdiction by the deadline set forth in the Administrative Order 2023-23, a District Judge will be assigned to the case. The parties are directed to review the terms of Administrative Order 2023-23 and other materials related to the Pilot Program on the Courts website:[LINK:https://www.nyed.uscourts.gov/edny-direct-assignment-pilot-program.] (CV)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
1 1 22 pgs cmp Complaint Mon 07/01 10:03 PM
COMPLAINT against 162-170 Flatbush Associates LLC, Chick-Fil-A, Inc. filing fee $ 405, receipt number ANYEDC-18031770 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -Yes,, filed by Julia Yepez. (Parker, Glen)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Proposed Summons 162-170 Flatbush Associates LLC,
Att: 3 Proposed Summons Chick-Fil-A, Inc.