Member Case
Lead case is: 3:24-bk-02447

Tennessee Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Charles M Walker
Case #: 3:24-bk-02449
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $10,000,001 to $50 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Midland Platinum II, LLC
111 Broadway Ste 300
Nashville, TN 37201-2117
Represented By
Henry E. Hildebrand
Dunham Hildebrand Payne Waldron, PLLC
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
US TRUSTEE
OFFICE OF THE UNITED STATES TRUSTEE 701 BROADWAY STE 318
NASHVILLE, TN 37203


Docket last updated: 05/14/2025 12:03 PM CDT
Monday, August 12, 2024
30 30 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice Mon 08/12 12:29 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002. Filed on the behalf of: Creditor LBC2 Trust. (ANTHONY, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
29 29 court Meeting of Creditors Held Fri 08/02 10:46 AM
Meeting of Creditors Held as scheduled on 8/2/24 for Amarillo Platinum LLC, Midland Platinum LLC and Midland Platinum II LLC Related [+]. (SELIBER, MEGAN)
Related: [-] 13
Friday, July 26, 2024
28 28 misc 1 - Statement of Financial Affairs Fri 07/26 3:06 PM
Original Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individual . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc 2 - Original Schedules Fri 07/26 3:05 PM
Original Schedule(s) Schedule A/B Schedule C Schedule D Schedule E/F Schedule G Schedule H. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 07/11 11:44 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 07/11/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order on Motion for Joint Administration under FRBP 1015 - BK Order
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
25 25 court BNC Certificate of Notice Wed 07/10 11:46 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 07/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
24 24 order Joint Administration under FRBP 1015 - BK Order Tue 07/09 4:18 PM
Expedited Order Granting Debtor's Motion for Joint Administration on Lead Case 3:24-bk-2447 with Member on Case 3:24-bk-2449 and 324-2448 . Related [+], BY THE COURT: Judge Charles M. Walker. (rww)
Related: [-] Ref Doc # 5
23 23 misc Submitted Order Tue 07/09 1:54 PM
Expedited Submitted Order Authorizing Debtors to Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Benefits . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC Related [+]. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-] 10
22 22 misc Submitted Order Tue 07/09 1:33 PM
Expedited Submitted Order Granting Motion for Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC Related [+]. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-] 5
Monday, July 08, 2024
21 21 misc Agenda Mon 07/08 4:37 PM
Hearing Set for Tuesday, July 9, 2024 at 10:00 A.M. in Courtroom 2 Agenda . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC Related [+]. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-] 5 ,6 ,8 ,10
20 20 misc Exhibit and Witness List Mon 07/08 11:34 AM
Debtors' Exhibit and Witness List for Hearing on Matters Set for July 9, 2024 . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC Related [+]. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-] 8 ,14
Friday, July 05, 2024
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 07/05 11:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 07/05/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14 Order Setting Expedited Hearing
18 18 motion Employ - BK Motion Fri 07/05 1:05 PM
Application and Notice to Employ National Hospitality Consulting Group as Professional. Related [+] If timely response hearing will be held on 8/7/2024 at 11:00 AM, Courtroom 2 (Virtual hearing if allowed; see website for details); 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Responses due by 7/26/2024. Certificate of Service mailed on 7/5/2024. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-] structuring and General Business Advisors
Thursday, July 04, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Notice Thu 07/04 11:43 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice. Related [+] Notice Date 07/04/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Order Setting Expedited Hearing
16 16 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/04 4:56 PM
Certificate of Service mailed on 7/3/2024 Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC Related [+]. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-] 14
15 15 misc Certificate of Service Thu 07/04 4:29 PM
Certificate of Service mailed on 7/2/2024 Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC Related [+]. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-] 8
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
14 14 order Expedite Hearing Wed 07/03 4:19 PM
Expedited Order Setting Expedited Hearing for Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Benefits . Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 7/9/2024 at 10:00 AM, Courtroom 2 (Virtual hearing if allowed; see website for details); 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Objections due by 4:00 p.m. on 7/8/2024. Signed on 7/3/2024. (lwj)
Related: [-] Related Doc#:10
13 13 court Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 Wed 07/03 1:55 PM
Meeting of Creditors to be held on 8/2/2024 at 10:00 AM via Meeting held telephonically. Please call 877-934-2472 and enter code 8613356# to attend. Last day to File Complaint to Determine Dischargeability of Certain Debts is 10/1/2024. (SELIBER, MEGAN)
Related: [-]
12 12 trustee Notice - Chapter 11 DIP Initial UST Conf Wed 07/03 1:52 PM
Notice - Debtor(s) Initial Conference will be held on 7/9/24 at 10:30 A.M. (SELIBER, MEGAN)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Submitted Order Wed 07/03 11:34 AM
Expedited Submitted Order Setting Hearing on Expedited Motion for Authorization to Pay Pre-Petition Wages and Benefits . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC Related [+]. (Waldron, Denis)
Related: [-] 10
10 10 motion Pay Prepetition Wages - BK Motion Wed 07/03 11:34 AM
Expedited Motion to Pay Prepetition Wages, Benefits and Taxes. Certificate of Service mailed on 7/3/2024. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC. (Waldron, Denis)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
9 9 motion Employ - BK Motion Tue 07/02 7:42 PM
Application and Notice to Employ Dunham Hildebrand Payne Waldron, PLLC as Attorney. If timely response hearing will be held on 8/7/2024 at 11:00 AM, Courtroom 2 (Virtual hearing if allowed; see website for details); 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Responses due by 7/23/2024. Certificate of Service mailed on 7/2/2024. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Expedite Hearing Tue 07/02 2:53 PM
Expedited Order Setting Expedited Hearing on Expedited First Day Motions . Related [+]. Hearing scheduled 7/9/2024 at 10:00 AM, Courtroom 2 (Virtual hearing if allowed; see website for details); 701 Broadway, Nashville, TN 37203. Objections due by 4:00 p.m. on 7/8/2024. Counsel should review material changes made to the entered order Signed on 7/2/2024. (lwj)
Related: [-] Related Doc#:5 ,6
7 7 misc Submitted Order Tue 07/02 10:54 AM
Expedited Submitted Order Setting Hearing on Expedited First Day Motions . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC Related [+]. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-] 5 ,6
6 6 motion Use Cash Collateral - BK Motion Tue 07/02 10:43 AM
Expedited Motion for Authority to Use Cash Collateral (Interim) and Granting Final Use of Cash Collateral Absent Timely Objection . Certificate of Service mailed on 7/2/2024. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Joint Administration under FRBP 1015 - BK Motion Tue 07/02 10:35 AM
Expedited Motion for Joint Administration under FRBP 1015 . Certificate of Service mailed on 7/2/2024. Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Generic Notice - BK Notice Tue 07/02 10:28 AM
Notice of Filing Consolidated Company Profile . Filed on the behalf of: Debtor Midland Platinum II, LLC. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Service - BK Notice Tue 07/02 7:42 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service pursuant to Rule 2002. Filed on the behalf of: U.S. Trustee US TRUSTEE. (SELIBER, MEGAN)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
2 2 crditcrd Auto-Docket of Payment Mon 07/01 6:36 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:3:24-bk-02449] ) [misc,volp11] (1738.00). Receipt number A18699925. Fee amount $ 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
1 1 14 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 07/01 6:35 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount is $1738.00. Incomplete Filings due by 07/15/2024. Chapter 11 Plan due by 10/29/2024. Disclosure Statement due by 10/29/2024. (Hildebrand, Henry)
Related: [-]