Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:J Campbell Barker
Referred: K Nicole Mitchell
Case #: 6:24-cv-00234
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1330 Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 28, 2024
Terminated:Mar 28, 2025
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 25, 2024 2:55 AM CST
Defendant
G M Financial
4001 Embarcadero Drive
Arlington, TX 76014
Plaintiff
Kristeen Brooke Adams
9791 Union Gove Rd.
Gladewater, TX 75647


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
16 16 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Wed 04/09 3:48 PM
Acknowledgment of Receipt by Kristeen Brooke Adams on 4/7/2025 as to14 Order,15 Judgment. (ndc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 28, 2025
15 15 order Judgment Fri 03/28 3:27 PM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Plaintiffs lawsuit is dismissed without prejudice. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 3/28/2025. (ndc)
Related: [-]
14 14 2 pgs order Order Adopting Report and Recommendations Fri 03/28 3:27 PM
ORDER accepting8 Report and Recommendations. The court dismisses plaintiff's lawsuit without prejudice for lack of subject-matter jurisdiction. Any pending motions are denied as moot. Signed by District Judge J. Campbell Barker on 3/28/2025. (ndc)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
13 13 1 pgs order Order Fri 03/07 2:57 PM
ORDER denying11 Request for Entry of Default by Clerk filed by Kristeen Brooke Adams. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 3/7/2025. (wea)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice (Other) Fri 03/07 8:00 AM
NOTICE of Clerk's default not entered re11 Request for Entry of Default by Clerk (gsm)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
11 11 misc Request for Entry of Default by Clerk Fri 03/07 7:45 AM
Request by Kristeen Brooke Adams for Clerk's Entry of Default against All Defendants. (gsm)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
10 10 motion Reconsideration Tue 09/03 2:36 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration and Amended Complaint by Kristeen Brooke Adams.(wea)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibits A1-B8
Thursday, August 29, 2024
9 9 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Thu 08/29 4:17 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Kristeen Brooke Adams as to8 Report and Recommendations. Received 8/26/2024. (ndc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
8 8 misc Report and Recommendations Wed 08/21 11:11 AM
REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION that the complaint be dismissed without prejudice for lack of subject matter jurisdiction. Objections due within 14 days of receipt. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 8/21/2024. (wea)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
7 7 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Fri 07/19 9:42 AM
ORDER denying6 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/19/2024. (wea)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 17, 2024
5 5 service Acknowledgment of Receipt Wed 07/17 1:49 PM
ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF RECEIPT by Kristeen Brooke Adams as to4 Order. Delivered 7/13/2024. (wea)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
6 6 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 07/17 3:51 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by Kristeen Brooke Adams. (NKL)
Related: [-]
Sunday, July 07, 2024
4 4 2 pgs order Order Mon 07/08 11:24 AM
ORDER TO AMEND. Plaintiff shall have thirty (30) days from receipt of this Order to file an Amended Complaint showing a basis for federal court subject matter jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/7/2024. (wea)
Related: [-]
3 3 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 07/08 11:22 AM
ORDER granting2 Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Signed by Magistrate Judge K. Nicole Mitchell on 7/7/2024. (wea)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2024
2 2 motion Proceed In Forma Pauperis Mon 07/01 11:11 AM
MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Kristeen Brooke Adams.(gsm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 IFP Information
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 07/01 11:09 AM
COMPLAINT against G M Financial, filed by Kristeen Brooke Adams.(gsm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet