New Jersey District Court
Judge:Renee Marie Bumb
Referred: Matthew J Skahill
Case #: 1:24-cv-07491
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2024
Terminated:Mar 26, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Dec 29, 2024 3:32 AM EST
Defendant
AGRE HOLDINGS LLC
701 S. CARSON ST, STE 200
CARSON CITY, NV 89701
Notice Only
ALEXANDRA H. BISTLINE
PIRKEY BARBER PLLC 1801 EAST 6TH STREET SUITE 300
AUSTIN, TX 78702
Plaintiff
PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY
2331 CITYWEST BLVD.
HOUSTON, TX 77042
Represented By
NEIL B. FRIEDMAN
Hodgson Russ, LLP
contact info
RYAN ANDREW MCGONIGLE
Hodgson Russ LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
utility Terminate Civil Case Wed 03/26 9:03 AM
***Civil Case Terminated. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 24, 2025
17 17 misc Letter Mon 03/24 5:08 PM
Letter from Neil B. Friedman.(FRIEDMAN, NEIL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Dismissal
Friday, December 20, 2024
16 16 motion Default Judgment Fri 12/20 11:33 AM
MOTION for Default Judgment as to AGRE HOLDINGS LLC by PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY. Responses due by 1/7/2025.(FRIEDMAN, NEIL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Brief,
Att: 2 Declaration,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Fri 12/20 2:32 PM
Set Deadlines as to16 MOTION for Default Judgment as to AGRE HOLDINGS LLC . Motion set for 1/21/2025 before Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (sms2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice counsel added Wed 10/02 2:48 PM
Pro Hac Vice counsel, ALEXANDRA H. BISTLINE, has been added to receive Notices of Electronic Filing. Pursuant to L.Civ.R. 101.1, only local counsel are entitled to sign and file papers, enter appearances and receive payments on judgments, decrees or orders. (dmw)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Pro Hac Vice to Receive NEF Mon 09/30 11:17 AM
Notice of Request by Pro Hac Vice ALEXANDRA H. BISTLINE to receive Notices of Electronic Filings. (FRIEDMAN, NEIL)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
misc Pro Hac Vice Fee Received Tue 09/17 9:47 AM
Pro Hac Vice fee: as to ALEXANDRA H. BISTLINE, ESQ. $ 250, receipt number CAM15162 (mag)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
14 14 3 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice Tue 09/10 9:57 AM
ORDER Granting11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice as to Alexandra H. Bistline, Esq. Signed by Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill on 9/9/2024. (mag)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
13 13 misc Exhibit (to Document) Tue 08/20 11:25 AM
Exhibit to11 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Corrected Certificate of Service by PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY. (FRIEDMAN, NEIL)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Exhibit (to Document) Tue 08/20 11:24 AM
Exhibit to10 Request for Clerk's Entry of Default, Corrected Certificate of Service by PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY. (FRIEDMAN, NEIL)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 19, 2024
11 11 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 08/19 5:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice by PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY.(FRIEDMAN, NEIL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certification CERTIFICATION OF NEIL B. FRIEDMAN,
Att: 2 Certification CERTIFICATION OF ALEXANDRA H. BISTLINE,
Att: 3 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
10 10 misc Request for Clerk's Entry of Default Mon 08/19 4:23 PM
Request for Clerk's Entry of Default by PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY against Agre Holdings LLC.(FRIEDMAN, NEIL)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Declaration Declaration of N Friedman,
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Text of Proposed Entry of Default,
Att: 3 Certificate of Service Certificate of Service
qc QC - Electronic Signature Does Not Match E-filer Tue 08/20 10:58 AM
CLERK'S OFFICE QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The Certificates of Service [10-3] and [11-4] submitted by NEIL B. FRIEDMAN, ESQ. on 8/19/2024 contain an improper signature. Only the filing user is permitted to sign electronically filed documents with an s/. PLEASE RESUBMIT THE CERTIFICATES WITH A PROPER ELECTRONIC SIGNATURE AND USE THE EVENT "Exhibit to Document" and link it to10 and11 . This submission will remain on the docket unless otherwise ordered by the court. (js)
Related: [-]
utility Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings Tue 08/20 11:00 AM
Set Deadlines as to11 MOTION for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Motion set for 9/16/2024 before Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill. Unless otherwise directed by the Court, this motion will be decided on the papers and no appearances are required. Note that this is an automatically generated message from the Clerk`s Office and does not supersede any previous or subsequent orders from the Court. (js)
Related: [-]
order Clerks Entry of Default Tue 08/20 11:28 AM
Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to AGRE HOLDINGS LLC for failure to plead or otherwise defend. (js)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2024
9 9 service Summons Returned Executed Thu 08/15 6:00 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY. (FRIEDMAN, NEIL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
8 8 service Summons Returned Executed Tue 07/30 12:39 PM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY. AGRE HOLDINGS LLC served on 7/18/2024, answer due 8/8/2024. (FRIEDMAN, NEIL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
7 7 misc Exhibit (to Document) Wed 07/03 4:39 PM
Exhibit to1 Complaint by PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY. (FRIEDMAN, NEIL)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Letter Wed 07/03 3:46 PM
Letter from N Friedman re Civil Cover Sheet re1 Complaint. (FRIEDMAN, NEIL)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Summons Issued Wed 07/03 3:34 PM
SUMMONS ISSUED as to AGRE HOLDINGS LLC. Attached is the official court Summons, please fill out Defendant and Plaintiffs attorney information and serve. (aji, )
Related: [-]
4 4 misc AO120 Patent/Trademark Form Wed 07/03 3:27 PM
AO120 Patent/Trademark Form filed. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit
qc QC - Civil Cover Sheet JS44 Wed 07/03 3:09 PM
CLERK'S QUALITY CONTROL MESSAGE - The case you electronically filed did not include a Civil Cover Sheet (JS-44), which is required to be submitted along with the initial pleading, as indicated in the Attorney Case Opening Guide. Please complete and file a[LINK:Civil Cover Sheet] using the event Exhibit (to Document) found under Civil/Other Filings/Other Documents. Please refer to the Attorney Case Opening Guide for processing electronically filed cases. (dmw, )
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Judicial Preferences Wed 07/03 3:34 PM
Notice of Judicial Preferences.[LINK:Click here] for the Judge's Individual Procedure Requirements. (aji, )
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
3 3 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement (aty) Tue 07/02 1:06 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY identifying N/A as Corporate Parent.. (FRIEDMAN, NEIL)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons - Request for Issue Tue 07/02 1:05 PM
Request for Summons to be Issued by PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY as to AGRE HOLDINGS LLC. (FRIEDMAN, NEIL)
Related: [-]
1 1 44 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 07/02 1:03 PM
COMPLAINT against AGRE HOLDINGS LLC ( Filing and Admin fee $ 405 receipt number ANJDC-15490435) with JURY DEMAND, filed by PHILLIPS 66 COMPANY.(FRIEDMAN, NEIL)
Related: [-]
utility Add and Terminate Judges Wed 07/03 3:13 PM
Chief Judge Renee Marie Bumb and Magistrate Judge Matthew J. Skahill added. (dmw )
Related: [-]