North Dakota District Court
Judge:Peter D Welte
Case #: 3:24-cv-00130
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 29, 2024 2:25 AM CST
Defendant
Officer Chad Engen
Represented By
Joseph E. Quinn
Pearson Christensen, Pllp
contact info
Daniel L. Gaustad
Pearson Christensen, Pllp
contact info
Marianne O. Knudson
Pearson Christensen, Pllp
contact info
Defendant
Former Detective Brandon Potts
Represented By
Howard D. Swanson
Swanson & Warcup, Ltd.
contact info
Defendant
Devils Lake, City of
Represented By
Joseph E. Quinn
Pearson Christensen, Pllp
contact info
Daniel L. Gaustad
Pearson Christensen, Pllp
contact info
Marianne O. Knudson
Pearson Christensen, Pllp
contact info
Plaintiff
Terry Fuller
Represented By
Bhavani K. Raveendran
Romanucci & Blandin LLC
contact info
Javier Rodriguez, Jr
Romanucci & Blandin LLC
contact info
Joshua Levin
Romanucci & Blandin, LLC
contact info
Timothy M. O'Keeffe
O'Keeffe O'Brien Lyson Ltd.
contact info
Tatum O'Brien
O'Keeffe O'Brien Lyson Ltd.
contact info
Antonio Romanucci
Romanucci & Blandin, LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 4 hours ago
Thursday, April 24, 2025
37 37 minutes Status Conference Thu 04/24 10:55 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Status Conference held on 4/24/2025. (DR #250424-000.mp3 (JS Chambers Recorder)) (sl)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
36 36 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Mon 03/10 10:46 AM
(Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting35 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Bhavani K. Raveendran is withdrawn from the case. (CT)
Related: [-]
Saturday, March 08, 2025
35 35 motion Withdraw as Attorney Sat 03/08 1:34 PM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Terrance Fuller. (Raveendran, Bhavani)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 20, 2025
34 34 notice Notice of Hearing Thu 02/20 10:55 AM
NOTICE of Hearing: Status Conference set for 4/24/2025 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (CT)
Related: [-]
33 33 minutes Mid-Discovery Status Conference Thu 02/20 10:20 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Mid-Discovery Status Conference held on 2/20/2025. (DR #250220-001.mp3 (JS Chambers Recorder)) (sl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
32 32 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Wed 02/05 2:44 PM
ANSWER to30 Amended Complaint by Brandon Potts.(Swanson, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
31 31 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Tue 02/04 4:52 PM
ANSWER to30 Amended Complaint by Devils Lake, City of, Chad Engen.(Gaustad, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
30 30 cmp Amended Complaint (Call Court if Complaint Adds Parties) Wed 01/22 10:28 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Devils Lake, City of, Chad Engen, Brandon Potts filed by Terrance Fuller. (bl)
Related: [-]
29 29 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Wed 01/22 9:49 AM
(Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed27 Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint. Counsel for defendant "Former Detective Brandon Potts" advised the court by email that he does not oppose the motion, and defendants City of Devils Lake and Officer Chad Engen took no position on the motion. The Clerk is directed to file the proposed amended complaint. (AS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
28 28 respm Response to Motion Tue 01/21 3:31 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re27 MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, Defendants City of Devils Lake and Officer Chad Engen's Response to Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File Amended Complaint filed by Devils Lake, City of, Chad Engen. (Gaustad, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 07, 2025
27 27 motion Leave to File Document Tue 01/07 7:01 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Amended Complaint, by Terry Fuller.(Levin, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1- proposed Amended Complaint
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
utility Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines Wed 12/18 11:58 AM
Set/Reset Scheduling Order Deadlines: Amended Pleadings due by 1/7/2025. See Order at 26 . (sl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
26 26 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Tue 12/17 10:31 AM
(Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting unopposed25 Motion for Extension of Time to File Motion to Amend Complaint. Motion to Amend Complaint due by 1/7/2025. (AS)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
25 25 motion Extension of Time to Amend Mon 12/16 12:01 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend Complaint by Terry Fuller. (Levin, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
24 24 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 12/11 2:26 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Antonio Romanucci on behalf of Terry Fuller (Romanucci, Antonio)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
23 23 notice Notice of Hearing Wed 11/20 4:08 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Mid-Discovery Status Conference RESET for 2/20/2025 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (Previously set for 2/14/2025). Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7070. (AS)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
22 22 notice Notice of Hearing Fri 10/18 12:05 PM
NOTICE of Hearing: Pretrial Conference set for 9/22/2026 at 09:00 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Jury Trial set for 9/22/2026 at 09:30 AM in Fargo Courtroom 1 before Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. (CT)
Related: [-]
21 21 5 pgs order Order for Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Deadlines Fri 10/18 12:05 PM
Order for Final Pretrial Conference and Trial Preparation Deadlines. Two business days prior to the Final Pretrial Conference, counsel must email the Exhibit List and Witness List for each party and Expert Reports to ndd_J-Senechal@ndd.uscourts.gov. Trial Memorandum due at least 7 days prior to trial. Deposition designations due at least 14 days prior to trial. Additional deposition designations by opposing parties due 7 days prior to trial. Objections to deposition designations due 4 days prior to trial. Jury Instructions due at least 7 days prior to trial. Motions in limine due 30 days prior to trial. Additional deadlines and details contained in the Order. by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/8/2026 at 10:00 AM in Chambers before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal.(CT)
Related: [-]
20 20 order Scheduling Order Fri 10/18 12:03 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Discovery due by 7/1/2025. Discovery Motions due by 8/1/2025. Plaintiff(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 9/15/2025. Defendant(s) Expert Witness Disclosures and Reports due by 11/3/2025. Any Rebuttal Expert Disclosures due by 11/24/2025. Discovery Depositions of Expert Witnesses due by 1/2/2026. Daubert motions due by 3/2/2026. Join Additional Parties due by 11/18/2024. Amended Pleadings due by 12/17/2024. Nondispositive Motions due by 12/17/2024. Dispositive Motions due by 3/2/2026. Mid-Discovery Status Conference set for 2/14/2025 at 10:00 AM by telephone before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Plaintiff shall initiate the call. The telephone number for chambers is 701-297-7000. (CT)
Related: [-]
19 19 minutes Scheduling Conference Fri 10/18 9:41 AM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal: Scheduling Conference held on 10/18/2024. (DR #241018-000.mp3 (JS Chambers Recorder)) (sl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 09/26 3:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Joshua Levin on behalf of Terry Fuller (Levin, Joshua)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
17 17 5 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Thu 09/19 9:45 AM
ORDER for Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting and Rule 16(b) Scheduling Conference, and ORDER regarding resolution of Discovery Disputes by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. Scheduling Conference set for 10/18/2024 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal. (AS)
Related: [-]
utility Docket Correction Thu 09/19 2:08 PM
DOCKET CORRECTION re:16 Answer. Clerk's office added link. (jb)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
16 16 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 09/18 4:12 PM
ANSWER to Complaint with Jury Demand by Brandon Potts.(Swanson, Howard)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Tue 09/17 3:47 PM
ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by Devils Lake, City of, Chad Engen.(Gaustad, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
14 14 order Order on Motion to Withdraw as Attorney Tue 08/13 10:32 AM
(Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting13 Motion to Withdraw as Attorney. Attorney Javier Rodriguez, Jr. is withdrawn from the case as to plaintiff Terry Fuller. (CT)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 12, 2024
13 13 motion Withdraw as Attorney Mon 08/12 11:38 AM
MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Terry Fuller. (Rodriguez, Javier)
Related: [-]
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 08/12 11:33 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Bhavani K. Raveendran on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Raveendran, Bhavani)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
11 11 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 08/01 3:59 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Brandon Potts. Brandon Potts waiver sent on 8/1/2024, answer due 9/30/2024. (Swanson, Howard)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
10 10 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 07/19 12:22 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Chad Engen. Chad Engen waiver sent on 7/19/2024, answer due 9/17/2024. (Gaustad, Daniel)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Waiver of Service Executed Fri 07/19 12:21 PM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Devils Lake, City of. Devils Lake, City of waiver sent on 7/19/2024, answer due 9/17/2024. (Gaustad, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 18, 2024
8 8 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 07/18 12:28 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel L. Gaustad on behalf of Devils Lake, City of, Chad Engen (Gaustad, Daniel)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
6 6 misc Consent/Reassignment Form Tue 07/16 1:18 PM
CONSENT/REASSIGNMENT FORM by Terry Fuller. (sc)
Related: [-]
order Order Reassigning Case Tue 07/16 1:20 PM
(Text Only) ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Peter D. Welte. Case reassigned to Chief Judge Peter D. Welte, as presiding judge, and Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal, as referral judge, for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal no longer assigned to the case as presiding judge. (sc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
4 4 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/03 10:42 AM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Attorney Javier Rodriguez, Jr. (Filing fee $150, receipt number ANDDC-2938690) by Terry Fuller. (Rodriguez, Javier) (Main Document 4 replaced with non-fillable PDF on 7/3/2024) (sc). Modified to replace document and add receipt number on 7/3/2024. NEF regenerated (sc)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Wed 07/03 12:43 PM
(Text Only) ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alice R. Senechal granting4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Javier Rodriguez, Jr. (sc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
3 3 notice Notice of Direct Assignment Tue 07/02 2:42 PM
NOTICE of Direct Assignment as to Terry Fuller. Consent/Reassignment Form due by 7/16/2024. (sj)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued Tue 07/02 2:41 PM
Summons Issued as to City of Devils Lake, Chad Engen, Brandon Potts. (sj)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/02 2:35 PM
COMPLAINT against City of Devils Lake, Chad Engen, Brandon Potts (Filing fee $405, receipt number 300000917) filed by Terry Fuller.(sj)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet