Oklahoma Eastern District Court
Judge:Ronald A White
Case #: 6:24-cv-00226
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2024
Terminated:Nov 19, 2024
Case in other court:Muskogee County District Court, CJ-24-00225
Last checked: Sunday Dec 29, 2024 2:30 AM CST
Defendant
Melony Carey
Represented By
John J. Bowling
Aston Mathis Campbell Clarke & Tiger, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Neighbors Building Neighborhoods, Inc.
Represented By
John J. Bowling
Aston Mathis Campbell Clarke & Tiger, PLLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Charles Aaron Crawford
1315 West Okmulgee
Muskogee, OK 74401
Represented By
Roger Brent Blackstock
Brent Blackstock, PLC
contact info
Kelsey Harrison
Brent Blackstock, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/08/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
50 50 2 pgs notice Notice of Dismissal Tue 11/19 9:12 AM
NOTICE of Dismissal without Predjudice by Charles Aaron Crawford Related [+]. (jld, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-] State Court Petition/Complaint
Thursday, November 14, 2024
49 49 order Ruling on Motion to Reconsider Thu 11/14 2:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER by Magistrate Judge D. Edward Snow: In light of the47 Report and Recommendation entered, the Court finds the45 Motion to Reconsider moot. (tjm, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 13, 2024
48 48 2 pgs respm Response to Motion Wed 11/13 2:20 PM
RESPONSE to Motion Related [+] by Neighbors Building Neighborhoods, Inc., Melony Carey ;(Bowling, John)
Related: [-] 45 MOTION for Reconsideration