Consolidated
Lead case: 2:18-mn-02873

South Carolina District Court
Judge:Richard M Gergel
Case #: 2:24-cv-03814
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 29, 2024 3:48 AM EST
Defendant
3M Company Inc
Plaintiff
Mervin Dale Gunnels
Represented By
John Benochi
Benochi Law Firm LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
2 2 misc MDL Member Case Opened Tue 07/02 4:07 PM
MDL MEMBER CASE OPENED: (Direct-Filed)(associated as of 07/02/2024), Mervin Dale Gunnels v. 3M Company Inc, as DSC case 2:24-cv-03814-RMG Plaintiff Home Venue: Northern Alabama (mbon)
Related: [-]
1 1 33 pgs cmp Complaint Tue 07/02 4:06 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ASCDC-11857043.), filed by Mervin Dale Gunnels. Service due by 9/30/2024 (mbon)
Related: [-]