New York Southern District Court
Judge:Ronnie Abrams
Referred: Katharine H Parker
Case #: 1:24-cv-05055
Nature of Suit470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations
Cause18:1964 Civil Remedies: Racketeering (RICO) Act
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 29, 2024 3:31 AM EST
Counter Claimant
Xiaona Zhou
Represented By
Aleksander Boleslaw Milch
The Kasen And Liu Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Nan Zheng
Represented By
Aleksander Boleslaw Milch
The Kasen And Liu Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Wenling Wang
Represented By
Aleksander Boleslaw Milch
The Kasen And Liu Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Qilong Liu
Represented By
Aleksander Boleslaw Milch
The Kasen And Liu Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Counter Claimant
Yurong Hu
Represented By
Aleksander Boleslaw Milch
The Kasen And Liu Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Counter Defendant
Xin Yang
Represented By
Times Wang
Farra & Wang PLLC
contact info
Alexander Heckscher
contact info
Counter Defendant
Ting Chen
Represented By
Times Wang
Farra & Wang PLLC
contact info
Alexander Heckscher
contact info
Defendant
Wenling Wang
Represented By
Aleksander Boleslaw Milch
The Kasen And Liu Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Lei Zhu
Defendant
Xiaona Zhou
Represented By
Aleksander Boleslaw Milch
The Kasen And Liu Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Nan Zheng
Represented By
Aleksander Boleslaw Milch
The Kasen And Liu Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Yun Ye
Represented By
Aleksander Boleslaw Milch
The Kasen And Liu Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Jingyi Shen
Defendant
Lijun Ouyang
Defendant
Qilong Liu
Represented By
Aleksander Boleslaw Milch
The Kasen And Liu Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
Xue Lin
Defendant
Yuxia Hu
Defendant
Yurong Hu
Represented By
Aleksander Boleslaw Milch
The Kasen And Liu Law Firm, PLLC
contact info
Defendant
A Fei
Defendant
Yuezhu Du
Defendant
Doe Defendants 1-100
Defendant
Yu Chen
Defendant
Shuyun Chen
Defendant
ASZ Supply Inc.
Plaintiff
Xin Yang
Represented By
Times Wang
Farra & Wang PLLC
contact info
Alexander Heckscher
contact info
Plaintiff
Ting Chen
Represented By
Times Wang
Farra & Wang PLLC
contact info
Alexander Heckscher
contact info


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Monday, May 19, 2025
103 103 order Order on Motion for Conference Mon 05/19 12:42 PM
ORDER granting102 Letter Motion for Conference. APPLICATION GRANTED: The case management conference in this matter scheduled for Thursday, May 22, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. is hereby converted to a telephonic proceeding. At the scheduled time, the parties shall dial (646)-453-4442, conference ID: 626 186 19#. Telephone Conference set for 5/22/2025 at 02:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/19/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
102 102 motion Conference Mon 05/19 12:33 AM
LETTER MOTION for Conference re:98 Scheduling Order, Requesting Leave for the Appearing Defendants' Attorney to Appear Virtually at the time of the Case Management Conference on May 22, 2025, 2 p.m. addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Aleksander B. Milch, Esq. dated May 19, 2025. Document filed by Yurong Hu, Qilong Liu, Wenling Wang, Yun Ye, Nan Zheng, Xiaona Zhou..(Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 16, 2025
101 101 respm Declaration in Support of Motion Fri 05/16 6:47 PM
DECLARATION of Alexander Heckscher in Support re:99 MOTION to Compel Yun Ye, Nan Zheng, Qilong Liu, Wenling Wang, and Xiaona Zhou to serve complete responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents .. Document filed by Xin Yang..(Heckscher, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Defendant Xiaona "Lina" Zhou's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories.,
Att: 2 Exhibit Defendant Yurong "Mary" Hu's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories.,
Att: 3 Exhibit Defendant Qilong "Lucy" Liu's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories,
Att: 4 Exhibit Defendant Wenling "Abby" Wang's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories,
Att: 5 Exhibit Defendant Nan "Lucas" Zheng's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories,
Att: 6 Exhibit Defendant Yun Ye's Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories,
Att: 7 Exhibit Defendant Xiaona "Lina" Zhou's Written Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Document Requests,
Att: 8 Exhibit Defendant Yurong "Mary" Hu's Written Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Document Requests,
Att: 9 Exhibit Defendant Qilong "Lucy" Liu's Written Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Document Requests,
Att: 10 Exhibit Defendant Wenling "Abby" Wang's Written Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Document Requests,
Att: 11 Exhibit Defendant Nan "Lucas" Zheng's Written Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Document Requests,
Att: 12 Exhibit Defendant Yun Ye's Written Responses to Plaintiffs' First Set of Document Requests,
Att: 13 Exhibit Exhibit 13 is a true and correct copy of Plaintiffs' First Set of Interrogatories to Defendants,
Att: 14 Exhibit Exhibit 14 is a true and correct copy of Plaintiffs' First Set of Document Requests to Defendants
100 100 18 pgs respm Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion Fri 05/16 6:38 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:99 MOTION to Compel Yun Ye, Nan Zheng, Qilong Liu, Wenling Wang, and Xiaona Zhou to serve complete responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents . . Document filed by Xin Yang..(Heckscher, Alexander)
Related: [-]
99 99 motion Compel Fri 05/16 6:28 PM
MOTION to Compel Yun Ye, Nan Zheng, Qilong Liu, Wenling Wang, and Xiaona Zhou to serve complete responses to Plaintiffs First Set of Interrogatories and First Set of Requests for Production of Documents . Document filed by Xin Yang..(Heckscher, Alexander)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 12, 2025
98 98 order Scheduling Order Mon 05/12 4:58 PM
ORDER SCHEDULING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: A case management conference in this matter has been scheduled for Thursday, May 22, 2025 at 2:00 p.m. in Courtroom 17-D, United States Courthouse, 500 Pearl Street, New York, New York 10007. SO ORDERED. Case Management Conference set for 5/22/2025 at 02:00 PM in Courtroom 17D, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker on 5/12/2025) (vfr)
Related: [-]
97 97 misc Letter Mon 05/12 9:04 AM
LETTER addressed to Magistrate Judge Katharine H. Parker from Aleksander B. Milch, Esq. dated May 12, 2025 re: Response to Letter by Plaintiffs' Attorney dated May 10, 2025. Document filed by Yurong Hu, Qilong Liu, Wenling Wang, Yun Ye, Nan Zheng, Xiaona Zhou..(Milch, Aleksander)
Related: [-]