Basker v. Lakeland Tours, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Louis L Stanton |
Case #: | 1:24-cv-05056 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1125la Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act) |
Case Filed: | Jul 02, 2024 |
Last checked: Sunday Dec 29, 2024 3:31 AM EST |
Defendant
Lakeland Tours, LLC
218 W. Water Street Suite 400
Charlottesville, VA 22902 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
James G Basker
370 Riverside Drive APT 15E
New York, NY 10025 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 12 hours ago |
Tuesday, May 20, 2025 | ||
24 | 24
![]() AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Lakeland Tours, LLC, Robert Gogel with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by James G Basker. Related document:1 Complaint..(Strube, Gavin) |
|
Friday, May 16, 2025 | ||
23 | 23
![]() JOINT STIPULATION AS TO DEFENDANT'S CONSENT TO FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT: JOINT STIPULATION AS TO DEFENDANT'S CONSENT TO FILING OF AMENDED COMPLAINT IT IS HEREBY STIPULATED AND AGREED, by and between plaintiff James G. Basker and defendant Lakeland Tours, LLC, d/b/a Oxbridge by WorldStrides, by and through their respective undersigned counsel, as follows: 1. Discovery is ongoing in the captioned action. 2. Defendant has produced numerous documents in response to Plaintiff's discovery requests. 3. Upon reviewing the items produced, Plaintiff has determined that the pending Complaint should be amended to name an additional defendant. A copy of plaintiff's envisioned Amended Complaint is annexed as Exhibit A. SO ORDERED. Motions terminated:22 MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint . filed by James G Basker. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 5/16/2025) (rro) |
|
22 | 22
![]() MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint . Document filed by James G Basker..(Strube, Gavin) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
minutes
Status Conference
Fri 05/16 4:09 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Status Conference held on 5/16/2025. (ml) |
||
Tuesday, April 22, 2025 | ||
21 | 21
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by LaMarte Williams, Jr. on behalf of Lakeland Tours, LLC..(Williams, Jr., LaMarte) |
|
Friday, April 04, 2025 | ||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 04/04 3:09 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/25/2025 is adjourned to 5/16/2025 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ml) |
||
Thursday, April 03, 2025 | ||
20 | 20
![]() LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Jonathan G. Hardin dated April 3, 2025. Document filed by Lakeland Tours, LLC..(Hardin, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, January 03, 2025 | ||
19 | 19
![]() CONFIDENTIALITY STIPULATION AND PROTECTIVE ORDE...regarding procedures to be followed that shall govern the handling of confidential material... (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 1/3/2025) (mml) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2024 | ||
18 | 18
![]() PROPOSED PROTECTIVE ORDER. Document filed by Lakeland Tours, LLC..(Hardin, Jonathan) |
|
Wednesday, October 09, 2024 | ||
17 | 17
![]() RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent WS Holdings Acquisition, Inc. for Lakeland Tours, LLC. Document filed by Lakeland Tours, LLC..(Hardin, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, October 04, 2024 | ||
16 | 16
![]() SCHEDULING ORDER: The Court will hold the Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b) Conference on October 4, 2024 at 2:30 p.m. All depositions to be conducted by June 6, 2025. Expert depositions to be completed by August 29, 2025. Plaintiff has requested a jury trial. The Parties currently estimate that 6-8 days will be needed for trial. SO ORDERED. Deposition due by 8/29/2025. Fact Discovery due by 6/6/2025. Expert Discovery due by 8/29/2025. Initial Conference set for 10/4/2024 at 02:30 PM before Judge Louis L. Stanton. Pretrial Order due by 12/18/2025. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 10/4/2024) (vfr) |
|
minutes
Pretrial Conference - Initial
Fri 10/04 4:07 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Louis L. Stanton: Initial Pretrial Conference held on 10/4/2024. (ml) |
||
utility
Set/Reset Hearings
Fri 10/04 4:10 PM
Set/Reset Hearings: Status Conference set for 4/25/2025 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (ml) |
||
Friday, September 27, 2024 | ||
15 | 15
![]() PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER. Document filed by Lakeland Tours, LLC..(Hardin, Jonathan) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2024 | ||
14 | 14
![]() ORDER FOR CONFERENCE PURSUANT TO RULE 16 (b): Rule 16 (b) Conference set for 10/4/2024 at 02:30 PM in Courtroom 21C, 500 Pearl Street, New York, NY 10007 before Judge Louis L. Stanton. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/30/2024) (tro) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2024 | ||
13 | 13
![]() ANSWER to1 Complaint. Document filed by Lakeland Tours, LLC..(Hardin, Jonathan) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
12 | 12
![]() ORDER GRANTING PRO HAC VICE ADMISSION granting11 Motion for Jonathan G. Hardin to Appear Pro Hac Vice. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 8/13/2024) (vfr) |
|
Friday, August 09, 2024 | ||
11 | 11
![]() MOTION for Jonathan G. Hardin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29731536. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Lakeland Tours, LLC..(Hardin, Jonathan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Fri 08/09 4:33 PM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 11 MOTION for Jonathan G. Hardin to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-29731536. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (rju) |
||
Thursday, July 25, 2024 | ||
10 | 10
![]() ORDER granting9 Letter Motion for Extension of Time to File. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Louis L. Stanton on 7/25/2024) (tg) |
|
9 | 9
![]() LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time to File a Response to the Complaint addressed to Judge Louis L. Stanton from Evelyn Y. Pang dated July 25, 2024. Document filed by Lakeland Tours, LLC..(Pang, Evelyn) |
|
8 | 8
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Evelyn Yue Pang on behalf of Lakeland Tours, LLC..(Pang, Evelyn) |
|
utility
Set/Reset Deadlines
Thu 07/25 5:07 PM
Set/Reset Deadlines: Lakeland Tours, LLC answer due 8/28/2024. (tg) |
||
Thursday, July 11, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() AFFIDAVIT OF SERVICE. Lakeland Tours, LLC served on 7/8/2024, answer due 7/29/2024. Service was accepted by Colleen Banahan, Designated Agent for the New York Secretary of State. Document filed by James G Basker..(Strube, Gavin) |
|
Wednesday, July 03, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Gavin Michael Strube on behalf of James G Basker..(Strube, Gavin) |
|
5 | 5
![]() CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McGuire, James) |
|
4 | 4
![]() ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Lakeland Tours, LLC..(jgo) |
|
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Civil Cover Sheet
Wed 07/03 10:16 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to attorney James Joseph McGuire to RE-FILE Document No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the civil cover sheet is not correct; multiple Nature of Suit codes was selected; Citizenship of Principal Parties must only be selected when Basis of Jurisdiction code is Diversity;. Re-file the document using the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents and attach the correct PDF. Use civil cover sheet issued by S.D.N.Y. dated October 1, 2020. The S.D.N.Y. Civil Cover Sheet dated October 1, 2020 is located at http://nysd.uscourts.gov/file/forms/civil-cover-sheet.. (jgo) |
||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Party Modification
Wed 07/03 10:17 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING PARTY MODIFICATION. Notice to attorney James Joseph McGuire. The party information for the following party/parties has been modified: Lakeland Tours, LLC. The information for the party/parties has been modified for the following reason/reasons: alias party name was omitted;. (jgo) |
||
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Wed 07/03 10:19 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Louis L. Stanton. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Wed 07/03 10:20 AM
Magistrate Judge Jennifer Willis is designated to handle matters that may be referred in this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/sites/default/files/2018-06/AO-3.pdf] . (jgo) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Wed 07/03 10:21 AM
Case Designated ECF. (jgo) |
||
Tuesday, July 02, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to LAKELAND TOURS, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by James G Basker..(McGuire, James) |
|
2 | 2
![]() FILING ERROR - PDF ERROR - CIVIL COVER SHEET filed..(McGuire, James) Modified on 7/3/2024 (jgo) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against Lakeland Tours, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 405.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-29563355)Document filed by James G Basker..(McGuire, James) |