New York Southern District Court
Judge:Laura Taylor Swain
Case #: 1:24-cv-05058
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332bc Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2024
Terminated:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Dec 29, 2024 3:31 AM EST
Defendant
CATEGORY V BIOTECH, INC. F/K/A 4CABLETV INTERNATIONAL INC.
Plaintiff
ANDERSON KILL P.C.
Represented By
Keith A Lazere
Anderson Kill & Olick, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
1 1 order Amended Civil Case Administrative Closing Order Tue 07/09 10:45 AM
AMENDED CASE OPENING ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: New civil actions filed electronically that contain the following deficiencies may be administratively closed without prejudice and summonses may not be issued unless the deficiency is corrected within five (5) days of electronic transmission by the Clerk of a Notice of Deficient Filing: The case initiating document contains the wrong document - an illegible or unreadable document or no document.. Where a new civil action is administratively closed for a reason listed above and the party cures the deficiency within 60 days of the case closing, the party should seek to reopen the case by electronically filing a Notice of Application to Reopen Case through the ECF system. Such Notice shall describe the efforts to cure the deficiency and seek to reopen the case. The Clerk shall review such Notice and, if the deficiency is satisfactorily cured, reopen and randomly reassign the case. Applications to reopen such administratively closed cases filed after 60 days of closing must proceed by motion. Administrative Reopening due by 9/9/2024. (Signed by Judge Colleen McMahon on 1/14/2021) (gp)
Related: [-]
notice Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice Tue 07/09 10:43 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Laura Taylor Swain. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/district-judges] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:https://nysd.uscourts.gov/rules/ecf-related-instructions] ..(gp)
Related: [-]
utility Case Designated ECF Tue 07/09 10:43 AM
Case Designated ECF. (gp)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
misc Notice to Attorney to File Initial Pleading Wed 07/03 10:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO FILE CIVIL INITIAL PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Keith A Lazere to electronically file the initial pleading in this case. Failure to file the initial pleading may result in the dismissal of the case pursuant to Amended Standing Order 15-mc-00131. Initial Pleading due by 7/8/2024. (jgo)
Related: [-]
misc Notice to Attorney to Submit/File Civil Cover Sheet Wed 07/03 10:51 AM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY TO ELECTRONICALLY FILE CIVIL COVER SHEET. Notice to Attorney Keith A Lazere. Attorney must electronically file the Civil Cover Sheet. Use the event type Civil Cover Sheet found under the event list Other Documents. (jgo)
Related: [-]