Massachusetts District Court
Judge:Denise J Casper
Case #: 1:24-cv-11716
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:2000e Job Discrimination (Employment)
Case Filed:Jul 03, 2024
Terminated:Aug 26, 2024
Case in other court:Middlesex Superior Court, 2481CV00751
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2024 3:44 AM EST
Defendant
Roxanne Guenette
Represented By
Andrea Evans Zoia
Morgan, Brown & Joy
contact info
Brendan T. Sweeney
Morgan, Brown & Joy
contact info
Defendant
Mara Prentiss
Represented By
Andrea Evans Zoia
Morgan, Brown & Joy
contact info
Brendan T. Sweeney
Morgan, Brown & Joy
contact info
Defendant
President and Fellows of Harvard College
Massachusetts Hall
Cambridge, MA 02138
Represented By
Andrea Evans Zoia
Morgan, Brown & Joy
contact info
Brendan T. Sweeney
Morgan, Brown & Joy
contact info
Defendant
Christopher Stubbs
Represented By
Andrea Evans Zoia
Morgan, Brown & Joy
contact info
Brendan T. Sweeney
Morgan, Brown & Joy
contact info
Plaintiff
Caroline Zhang
Represented By
Suzanne L. Herold
Herold Law Group, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
15 15 1 pgs order Order of Remand to State Court Wed 08/21 3:20 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ORDER entered. ORDER OF REMAND to the State Court. (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
14 14 order Order on Motion to Amend Wed 08/21 3:17 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting13 Assented to MOTION to Amend and Remand to State Court . (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
13 13 motion Amend Tue 07/30 4:09 PM
Assented to MOTION to Amend and Remand to State Court by Caroline Zhang.(Herold, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Amended Complaint
12 12 service Notice of Service of Process Tue 07/30 3:48 PM
Notice of Service of Process filed by Caroline Zhang. Individual(s)/Entities served: Mara Prentiss. (Herold, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
11 11 service Notice of Service of Process Tue 07/30 3:46 PM
Notice of Service of Process filed by Caroline Zhang. Individual(s)/Entities served: Christopher Stubbs. (Herold, Suzanne)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time Tue 07/30 8:21 AM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting9 Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading. Defendants to file a responsive pleading by 8/30/24 or within fourteen days after any ruling on Plaintiff's forthcoming motion to amend her Compliant. (Hourihan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 29, 2024
9 9 motion Extension of Time Mon 07/29 3:20 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to August 30, 2024 to File a Responsive Pleading by Mara Prentiss, President and Fellows of Harvard College, Christopher Stubbs.(Sweeney, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
8 8 misc State Court Record - no answer filed in state court Fri 07/12 3:11 PM
STATE COURT Record All Defendants.. (Sweeney, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 11, 2024
7 7 order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 07/11 3:04 PM
Judge Denise J. Casper: ELECTRONIC ORDER entered granting6 Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 30, 2024 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint Mara Prentiss answer due 7/30/2024; President and Fellows of Harvard College answer due 7/30/2024; Christopher Stubbs answer due 7/30/2024. (Hourihan, Lisa)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
6 6 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 07/10 2:07 PM
Assented to MOTION for Extension of Time to July 30, 2024 to File Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint by Roxanne Guenette, Mara Prentiss, President and Fellows of Harvard College, Christopher Stubbs.(Sweeney, Brendan) (Main Document 6 replaced on 7/10/2024 with corrected document provided by counsel) (Cook, Savannah)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
5 5 notice Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel Wed 07/03 3:25 PM
Certified Copy of Notice of Removal Provided to Defense Counsel by Email (Horvath, Courtney)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Case Assignment Wed 07/03 2:43 PM
ELECTRONIC NOTICE of Case Assignment. Judge Denise J. Casper assigned to case. If the trial Judge issues an Order of Reference of any matter in this case to a Magistrate Judge, the matter will be transmitted to Magistrate Judge Donald L. Cabell. (Kinsella, Jaylannie)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 07/03 11:27 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by Andrea Evans Zoia on behalf of Roxanne Guenette, Mara Prentiss, President and Fellows of Harvard College, Christopher Stubbs (Zoia, Andrea)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/03 11:13 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Roxanne Guenette, Mara Prentiss, President and Fellows of Harvard College, Christopher Stubbs. (Sweeney, Brendan)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal Wed 07/03 10:52 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Roxanne Guenette, Mara Prentiss, President and Fellows of Harvard College, Christopher Stubbs ( Filing fee: $ 405, receipt number AMADC-10491324 Fee Status: Filing Fee paid)(Sweeney, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A. Summons and Complaint,
Att: 2 Exhibit B. Notice of Filing of Notice of Removal,
Att: 3 Exhibit C. Notice to Plaintiff's Counsel of Removal of Action,
Att: 4 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 5 Category Form