Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Stephen J Murphy, III
Referred: Anthony P Patti
Case #: 2:24-cv-11719
Nature of Suit710 Labor - Fair Labor Standards Act
Cause29:201 Fair Labor Standards Act
Case Filed:Jul 03, 2024
Terminated:Nov 26, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2024 3:33 AM EST
Defendant
Samsung SDI America, Inc.
Represented By
Martin B. Heller
Fisher & Phillips LLP
contact info
William E. Altman
Fisher & Phillips
contact info
Plaintiff
Michelle McCaskill
Represented By
Jonathan Melmed
Melmed Law Group P.C
contact info
Jesse L. Young
Sommers Schwartz, P.C.
contact info
Laura Supanich
contact info


Docket last updated: 9 hours ago
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
11 11 order Dismissing Case - Stipulated Order Tue 11/26 4:38 PM
STIPULATION and ORDER Dismissing Case. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
10 10 order Strike Fri 11/22 4:07 PM
ORDER Striking9 Stipulation and Order. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Fri 11/22 3:16 PM
[STRICKEN] STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Michelle McCaskill (Young, Jesse) Modified on 11/22/2024 (RLou)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 30, 2024
8 8 order Staying Case Tue 07/30 4:02 PM
ORDER Staying Case Pending Mediation. Signed by District Judge Stephen J. Murphy, III. (RLou)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2024
7 7 notice Appearance Fri 07/19 3:55 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Martin B. Heller on behalf of Samsung SDI America, Inc.. (Heller, Martin)
Related: [-]
6 6 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Fri 07/19 1:43 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Samsung SDI America, Inc. served on 7/10/2024, answer due 7/31/2024. (Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Appearance Fri 07/19 11:50 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by William E. Altman on behalf of Samsung SDI America, Inc.. (Altman, William)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
4 4 misc Attorney Appearance Mon 07/15 8:52 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Jonathan Melmed appearing on behalf of Michelle McCaskill (Melmed, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Attorney Appearance Mon 07/15 7:50 PM
ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Laura Supanich appearing on behalf of Michelle McCaskill (Supanich, Laura)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued* Wed 07/03 10:21 AM
SUMMONS Issued for *Samsung SDI America, Inc.* (JPar)
Related: [-]
1 1 13 pgs cmp Civil Case - Complaint Wed 07/03 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT filed by Michelle McCaskill against Samsung SDI America, Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: AMIEDC-9851485 - Fee: $ 405. County of 1st Plaintiff: Macomb - County Where Action Arose: Oakland - County of 1st Defendant: Wayne. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Young, Jesse)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Consent to Join