Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:22-bk-10964

New York Southern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Martin Glenn
Case #: 1:24-ap-02233
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jul 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
MIRSAD HODZIC
Represented By
MIRSAD HODZIC
contact info
Plaintiff
MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI, LITIGATION ADMINISTRATOR, AS REPRESENTATIVE FOR THE POST-EFFECTIVE DATE DEBTORS
Represented By
Samuel P Hershey
White & Case LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:09 PM EDT
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
8 8 misc Affidavit of Service Tue 02/25 11:10 AM
Affidavit of Service Related [+] Filed by Marianna Udem on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. (Udem, Marianna)
Related: [-] 1 ,7
Wednesday, February 12, 2025
7 7 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference TO BE DETERMINED (Use with Supervisor Approval ONLY) Wed 02/12 9:11 AM
Fourth Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Ortiz, Carmen)
Related: [-]
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Wed 02/12 9:02 AM
Request for a Fourth Summons filed by Marianna Udem on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. (Udem, Marianna)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Tue 12/17 1:08 PM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Marianna Udem on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. (Udem, Marianna)
Related: [-] 1 ,5
Monday, December 16, 2024
5 5 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference TO BE DETERMINED (Use with Supervisor Approval ONLY) Mon 12/16 4:06 PM
Third Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Mon 12/16 3:28 PM
Request for a Third Summons filed by Marianna Udem on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. (Udem, Marianna)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
4 4 misc Certificate of Service Thu 10/03 9:59 AM
Certificate of Service Related [+] Filed by Samuel P Hershey on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. (Hershey, Samuel)
Related: [-] 1 ,3
Friday, July 26, 2024
3 3 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference TO BE DETERMINED (Use with Supervisor Approval ONLY) Fri 07/26 11:29 AM
Second Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2024
misc Request for Subsequent Summons Mon 07/22 6:33 PM
Request for a Second Summons filed by Samuel P Hershey on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. (Hershey, Samuel)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
2 2 cmp Auto Summons and Notice of Pre-Trial Conference TO BE DETERMINED (Use with Supervisor Approval ONLY) Mon 07/08 11:01 AM
Summons with Notice of Pre-Trial Conference issued by Clerk's Office. Pre-Trial date to be determined by Court Order. (Ramos, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint (fee) Wed 07/03 11:56 AM
Adversary case 24-02233 Complaint against MIRSAD HODZIC (Fee Amount $ 350.). Nature(s) of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (14 (Recovery of money/property - other)) Filed by Samuel P Hershey on behalf of MOHSIN Y. MEGHJI. (Hershey, Samuel)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto - docket of credit card Wed 07/03 5:50 PM
Receipt of Complaint([LINK 24-02233 mg] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A16698304. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc #1