Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-07090

Arizona Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 13
Judge:Daniel P Collins
Case #: 2:24-ap-00153
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
Case Filed:Jul 02, 2024
Terminated:Jul 09, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By
JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
contact info
Defendant
CHASE MANHATTAN BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
Represented By
CHASE MANHATTAN BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION
contact info
Defendant
DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
Represented By
DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY
contact info
Defendant
SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
Represented By
SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC.
contact info
Defendant
OFFICE OF THE COMPROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (OCC)
Represented By
OFFICE OF THE COMPROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (OCC)
contact info
Defendant
CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU (CFPB)
Represented By
CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU (CFPB)
contact info
Defendant
HOUSING AND CIVIL ENFORCEMENT SECTION OF THE CIVIL RIGHTS DIVISION
Represented By
HOUSING AND CIVIL ENFORCEMENT SECTION OF THE CIVIL RIGHTS DIVISION
contact info
Plaintiff
SUSIE MAE BARNES
7025 W. HEARN RD.
PEORIA, AZ 85381
Represented By
SUSIE MAE BARNES
contact info
Plaintiff
JAMES HENRY BARNES
7025 W. HEARN RD.
PEORIA, AZ 85381
Represented By
JAMES HENRY BARNES
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
5 5 court BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Thu 07/11 9:36 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - PDF Document Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 4 Order Dismissing Adversary
court Close Adversary Tue 07/09 7:51 AM
Adversary Terminated . (ETS)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
4 4 order oDismissing Adversary Tue 07/09 7:50 AM
ORDER Dismissing Adversary signed on 7/8/2024 . (ETS)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
3 3 court BNC Certificate of Notice Fri 07/05 9:33 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice Related [+] (Admin.)
Related: [-] 2 Order Re: Potential Dismissal of Adversary
2 2 order oPotential Dismissal of Adversary - VAN Form Wed 07/03 7:53 AM
ORDER Re: Potential Dismissal of Adversary . (MRS)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 07/02 3:43 PM
Adversary case 2:24-ap-00153. Complaint (No Fee Due or Fee Deferred) against JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, CHASE MANHATTAN BANK USA, NATIONAL ASSOCIATION, DEUTSCHE BANK NATIONAL TRUST COMPANY, SELECT PORTFOLIO SERVICING, INC., OFFICE OF THE COMPROLLER OF THE CURRENCY (OCC), CONSUMER FINANCIAL PROTECTION BUREAU (CFPB), HOUSING AND CIVIL ENFORCEMENT SECTION OF THE CIVIL RIGHTS DIVISION filed by SUSIE MAE BARNES, JAMES HENRY BARNES Nature of Suit: 21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property) . (MRS) Additional attachment(s) added on 7/2/2024 (MRS)
Related: [-]