California Southern District Court
Judge:Linda Lopez
Referred: D Thomas Ferraro
Case #: 3:24-cv-01155
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332pi Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jul 03, 2024
Case in other court:Superior Court of California, San Diego, 37-02024-00020892-CU-PO-CTL
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2024 12:24 AM PST
Defendant
DS Services of America, Inc.
Represented By
Brett N. Taylor
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Alexander Edwin Robinson
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Joseph Jackson McCormack
Cozen O'Connor
contact info
Defendant
Does 1 through 50
Plaintiff
Douglas Eisberg
Represented By
Norma Jessica Lujan
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info
Brian R Mason
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info
Lara Deitz
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info
Jansen Hyatt
Gomez Trial Attorneys
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/13/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, February 06, 2025
15 15 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Order Thu 02/06 12:22 PM
ORDER Granting Joint Motion to Modify Scheduling Order and Amended Scheduling Order14 Motion for Order Final Pretrial Conference set for 2/26/2026 10:00 AM before Judge Linda Lopez. Mandatory Settlement Conference set for 12/3/2025 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge D. Thomas Ferraro. Proposed Pretrial Order due by 2/12/2026. Signed by Magistrate Judge D. Thomas Ferraro on 2/6/2025. (All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(bdc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
14 14 4 pgs motion Order Wed 02/05 7:07 PM
Joint MOTION for Order Modifying Scheduling Order Regulating Discovery by DS Services of America, Inc.. (McCormack, Joseph)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2025
13 13 order Order of Judge Transfer Thu 01/16 10:22 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge D. Thomas Ferraro for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 24cv1155 LL(DTF).(no document attached) (rmc)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
12 12 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 11/19 12:59 PM
NOTICE of Appearance of Joseph McCormack as New Counsel for Defendant DS Services of America, Inc. a Delaware Corporation dba Primo Water Corporation and Notice of Withdrawal of Attorneys Brett N. Taylor and Alexander Robinson as Counsel of Record by Joseph Jackson McCormack on behalf of DS Services of America, Inc. (McCormack, Joseph)Attorney Joseph Jackson McCormack added to party DS Services of America, Inc.(pty:dft)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2024
11 11 notice Notice of Appearance Mon 11/18 9:42 AM
NOTICE of Appearance of Joseph McCormack as New Counsel for Defendant DS Services of America, Inc. a Delaware Corporation dba Primo Water Corporation and Notice of Withdrawal of Attorneys Brett N. Taylor and Alexander Robinson as Counsel of Record by Brett N. Taylor on behalf of DS Services of America, Inc. (Taylor, Brett)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 04, 2024
10 10 minutes ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Fri 10/04 4:24 PM
NOTICE of Change of Conference: The Pretrial Conference set for Thursday, November 27, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. before District Judge Linda Lopez will now occur on Thursday, December 4, 2025 at 10:00 a.m. (no document attached) (axp). (no document attached) (axp)(no document attached) (axp)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
9 9 order Scheduling Order Fri 09/20 2:10 PM
SCHEDULING ORDER Regulating Discovery And Other Pretrial Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks on 9/20/2024.(ddf)
Related: [-]
8 8 minutes Early Neutral Evaluation Conference Case Management Conference Fri 09/20 1:38 PM
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks: Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference held on 9/20/2024. (Plaintiff Attorney Jessica N. Lujan). (Defendant Attorney Brett Taylor). (Other Participants: Douglas Eisberg (Plaintiff) and Cathy Lutzkamin (Defendant Representative)). Case did not settle. Court to issue scheduling order. (no document attached) (axp)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
7 7 notice Joint Discovery Plan Fri 09/06 12:37 PM
JOINT DISCOVERY PLAN by DS Services of America, Inc. & Rule 16 Conference Statement (Taylor, Brett)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 27, 2024
6 6 minutes ~Util - Set Hearings ~Util - Terminate Hearings Tue 08/27 10:47 AM
NOTICE of Change of Conference: Due to a conflict in the Court's calendar, the Early Neutral Evaluation Conference and Case Management Conference set for Wednesday, 09/4/2024 at 2:00 PM before Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres is CONTINUED to Friday, 09/20/2024 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks. The Parties are ordered to lodge a confidential ENE Statement by e-mail to the Court at efile_cheeks@casd.uscourts.gov by September 6, 2024. IT IS SO ORDERED by Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks (no document attached) (axp)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
5 5 order Order of Judge Transfer Mon 08/26 10:37 AM
MINUTE ORDER OF TRANSFER. Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres is no longer assigned. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Benjamin J. Cheeks for all further proceedings. Pending hearings previously set before the original Judge have been transferred to the newly assigned Judge. The new case number is 24-cv-01155-LL-BJC.(All non-registered users served via U.S. Mail Service)(no document attached) (mjw)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
4 4 9 pgs order Order for Early Neutral Evaluation Fri 07/12 11:38 AM
NOTICE AND ORDER Setting Early Neutral Evaluation Conference And Case Management Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres on 7/12/2024.(ddf)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
3 3 answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/10 4:26 PM
ANSWER to Complaint by DS Services of America, Inc..(Taylor, Brett)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
2 2 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Wed 07/03 4:45 PM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by DS Services of America, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Primo Water Corporation (formally Cott Corporation) for DS Services of America, Inc. (axc1)
Related: [-]
1 1 6 pgs cmp Notice of Removal Wed 07/03 4:36 PM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ACASDC-18987912.), filed by DS Services of America, Inc.. The new case number is 3:24-cv-1155-LL-VET. Judge Linda Lopez and Magistrate Judge Valerie E. Torres are assigned to the case.(axc1)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Info Sheet Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Summons; Complaint; Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Notice to State Court and Adverse Parties of Removal to Federal Cour,
Att: 4 Exhibit C - ADR Forms; Notice of Case Assignment; Proof of Service; Docket,
Att: 5 Proof of Service,
Att: 6 Declaration of Alexander E. Robinson in Support of Notice of Removal