Arizona District Court
Judge:Jennifer Choe Groves
Case #: 2:24-cv-01642
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question: Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jul 03, 2024
Last checked: Monday Dec 30, 2024 1:20 AM MST
Defendant
CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated
Represented By
John Dean Curtis, II
Burch & Cracchiolo PA
contact info
Aaron Michael Duell
Burch & Cracchiolo PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Kevin Indra Huskens
Represented By
Elizabeth Ann Delnegro
Pierson Ferdinand LLP
contact info
Alejandro Perez
Ogletree Deakins Nash Smoak & Stewart Pc - Phoenix, Az
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Wednesday, March 26, 2025
23 23 2 pgs notice Notice of Settlement Wed 03/26 9:13 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated. (Duell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
22 22 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 03/13 10:01 AM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated. (Duell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 31, 2024
21 21 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Stay Tue 12/31 2:20 PM
ORDER: Upon consideration of the Parties' Joint Motion by Plaintiff and Defendant to Stay Litigation (Doc.20 ), and all other papers and proceedings in this action, it is hereby ORDERED that this matter is stayed through March 28, 2025 ; and it is further ORDERED that if this matter is not resolved by March 28, 2025, the Parties shall file with the Court a proposed, amended Case Management Order before or by April 4, 2025 . Signed by Judge Jennifer Choe Groves on 12/31/2024. (SST)
Related: [-]
20 20 motion Stay Tue 12/31 11:24 AM
First MOTION to Stay Litigation Pending Arbitration by Kevin Indra Huskens.(Perez, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order
Monday, December 16, 2024
19 19 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 12/16 2:27 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated. (Duell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 02, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Mon 12/02 1:07 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated. (Duell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 14, 2024
17 17 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Thu 11/14 2:22 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated. (Duell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
16 16 2 pgs misc Report - Settlement Talks/Discussions Mon 10/28 12:10 PM
REPORT of Settlement Talks/Discussions by CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated. (Duell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
15 15 notice Notice of Service of Discovery Tue 10/15 2:48 PM
NOTICE of Service of Discovery filed by CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated. (Duell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
14 14 7 pgs order Scheduling Order Tue 09/10 3:33 PM
CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER: Discovery due by 7/21/2025. Dispositive motions due by 8/8/2025. See attached Order for complete details. Signed by Judge Jennifer Choe Groves on 9/10/2024. (ESG)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2024
13 13 notice Notice (Other) Tue 09/03 4:37 PM
NOTICE re: Notice of Lodging by CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated Joint Proposed Scheduling Order .(Duell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Joint Proposed Scheduling Order
Tuesday, August 13, 2024
12 12 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 08/13 3:45 PM
Disclosure Statement by CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated identifying Other Affiliate CAE, Inc. for CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated. (Duell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Disclosure Statement Tue 08/13 12:36 PM
Disclosure Statement by CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated identifying Corporate Parent Upstream Parent Corp. for CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated. (Duell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
10 10 12 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Tue 08/13 12:23 PM
CAE Aviation Academy Phoenix, LLC's ANSWER to1 Complaint with Jury Demand by CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated.(Duell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 01, 2024
9 9 order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Thu 08/01 2:07 PM
ORAL ORDER: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that, not later than thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, the Parties shall meet and confer and file a joint proposed Scheduling Order in this action consistent with the applicable form Case Management Order of Judge Snow, which is posted at https://www.azd.uscourts.gov/ (See Judges' Info, Orders, Forms, & Procedures), along with a cover letter requesting the Court to enter the joint proposed Scheduling Order (if there are no disputes or other issues concerning scheduling that the Court needs to address) or to schedule the Scheduling Conference. If the Parties are unable to agree upon a proposed scheduling order, each Party shall file a proposed scheduling order by the deadline and contact my Case Manager, Steve Taronji, by telephone at (212) 264-1611 or via e-mail at steve_taronji@cit.uscourts.gov, to arrange a video conference with the Court. Ordered by Judge Jennifer Choe Groves on 8/1/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2024
8 8 order Order on Stipulation Fri 07/26 3:06 PM
ORDER that the7 Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint is granted. Defendant's response to the Complaint is due 8/16/2024. Ordered by Judge Jennifer Choe Groves on 7/26/2024. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (ESG)
Related: [-]
Thursday, July 25, 2024
7 7 2 pgs misc Stipulation For Extension of Time To Answer Complaint Thu 07/25 2:07 PM
STIPULATION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER COMPLAINT by CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated.(Duell, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 1 pgs Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Stipulation and Joint Motion to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond
Tuesday, July 09, 2024
6 6 2 pgs service Summons Issued Tue 07/09 7:22 AM
Summons Issued as to CAE Oxford Aviation Phoenix Incorporated. (BAS)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2024
5 5 service Summons Submitted Mon 07/08 7:36 AM
SUMMONS Submitted by Kevin Indra Huskens. (Perez, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
4 4 2 pgs misc Additional Attachments to Main Document Fri 07/05 10:01 AM
Additional Attachments to Main Document re:1 Complaint JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet by Plaintiff Kevin Indra Huskens. (Perez, Alejandro)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2024
3 3 misc Notice of Deficiency (Text Only) Wed 07/03 5:29 PM
NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCY re:1 Complaint filed by Kevin Indra Huskens. Pursuant to the Electronic Case Filing Administrative Policies and Procedures Manual Section II(B), attorneys are required to submit the automated Civil Cover Sheet when filing a new case. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Please submit the Automated JS-44 Civil Cover Sheet using the following: Civil, Other Filings, Other Documents, Additional Attachment to Main Document and link to the Complaint. FOLLOW-UP ACTION REQUIRED: Attorneys must update PACER accounts to match law firm information on pleading: Alejandro Perez and Elizabeth Delnegro . Law firm name listed on pleading: Pierson Ferdinand LLP . Law firm in CM-ECF Account: Ogletree Deakins Nash Soak & Stewart PC as to Alejandro Perez and Fennemore Craig PC as to Elizabeth Ann Delnegro . Deficiency must be corrected within one business day of this notice. This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no PDF document associated with this entry. (REK)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc New Case Opened Wed 07/03 5:24 PM
Filing fee paid, receipt number AAZDC-23212818. This case has been assigned to the Honorable Jennifer Choe Groves. All future pleadings or documents should bear the correct case number: CV 24-01642 PHX-JCG. Notice of Availability of Magistrate Judge to Exercise Jurisdiction form attached. (REK)
Related: [-]
1 1 37 pgs cmp Complaint Wed 07/03 5:23 PM
COMPLAINT. Filing fee received: $405.00, receipt number AAZDC-23212818 filed by Kevin Indra Huskens. (submitted by Alejandro Perez)(REK)
Related: [-]