Texas Western District Court
Case #: 3:24-cr-01376
Case Filed:Jul 01, 2024
Last checked: Thursday Jul 04, 2024 2:35 AM CDT
Defendant
Roberto Mendoza-Romero (1)
Represented By
Manuel Acosta-Rivera
Assistant Federal Public Defender
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Patricia Aguayo
U.S. Attorney'S Office
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/04/2024 3:46 AM CDT
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
Arrest of Roberto Mendoza-Romero (ll) [3:24-mj-02281-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
1 1 COMPLAINT Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres as to Roberto Mendoza-Romero. (ll) [3:24-mj-02281-MAT]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION to Detain Defendant without Bond by USA as to Roberto Mendoza-Romero. (ll) [3:24-mj-02281-MAT]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll) [3:24-mj-02281-MAT]
Related: [-]
4 4 Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Miguel A. Torres:Initial Appearance as to Roberto Mendoza-Romero held on 6/5/2024 (Minute entry documents are not available electronically.), SPANISH Language Interpreter required (E. Gallegos) as to Roberto Mendoza-Romero (Court Reporter ERO.) (ll) [3:24-mj-02281-MAT]
Related: [-]
5 5 ORDER OF TEMPORARY DETENTION: NO BOND SET as to Roberto Mendoza-Romero. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll) [3:24-mj-02281-MAT]
Related: [-]
6 6 ORDER SETTING HEARING IN PERSON as to Roberto Mendoza-Romero, (Detention Hearing set for 6/12/2024 01:30 PM in El Paso before Judge Miguel A. Torres, Preliminary Hearing set for 6/12/2024 01:30 PM in El Paso before Judge Miguel A. Torres), Order Regarding Due Process Protections Act as to Roberto Mendoza-Romero. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (ll) [3:24-mj-02281-MAT]
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2024
7 7 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Patricia Aguayo appearing for USA. . Attorney Patricia Aguayo added to party USA(pty:pla) (Aguayo, Patricia) [3:24-mj-02281-MAT]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE: Manuel Acosta-Rivera appearing for Roberto Mendoza-Romero . Attorney Manuel Acosta-Rivera added to party Roberto Mendoza-Romero(pty:dft) (Acosta-Rivera, Manuel) [3:24-mj-02281-MAT]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2024
9 9 Waiver of Preliminary and Detention Hearing by Roberto Mendoza-Romero (Acosta-Rivera, Manuel) [3:24-mj-02281-MAT]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2024
10 10 ORDER OF DETENTION: Detained Without Bond as to Roberto Mendoza-Romero. Signed by Judge Miguel A. Torres. (em) [3:24-mj-02281-MAT]
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2024
If ordered by the court, all referrals will be assigned to Magistrate Judge Torres (bot2)
Related: [-]
11 11 INDICTMEN Related [+] filed. Unredacted document sealed pursuant to E-Government Act of 2002 as to Roberto Mendoza-Romero (1) count(s) 1. (bot1)
Related: [-] dacted Version
13 13 Personal Data Sheet (SEALED) as to Roberto Mendoza-Romero (bot1)
Related: [-]