Texas Southern District Court
Case #: 2:24-cr-00265
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2024
Last checked: Friday Jul 05, 2024 2:26 AM CDT
Defendant
Lee Alexander Crossman (1)
Represented By
Federal Public Defender - Corpus Christi
contact info
Kristen D. Langford-Harris
Federal Public Defender
contact info
Material Witness
Selvin Rolando Gonzalez-Dominguez
Represented By
Ruben R Lerma, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Oscar Hernandez-Sandoval
Represented By
Ruben R Lerma, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Material Witness
Yaneli Salvador-Parra
Represented By
Ruben R Lerma, Jr
Attorney At Law
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Young Min C. Burkett
Us Attorney'S Office
contact info
Financial Litigation
U S Attorney'S Office
contact info
Yasmine Kathrina Tucker
U.S. Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 07/05/2024 2:56 AM CDT
Tuesday, May 07, 2024
Arrest of Lee Alexander Crossman. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2024
US ATTORNEY'S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE. Young Min C. Burkett appearing for USA, filed. (Burkett, Young Min) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT as to Lee Alexander Crossman (1), filed. (Brooks) Initial Appearance set for 5/10/2024 at 09:45 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby (ntg2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
2 2 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Yaneli Sandoval-Parra, Selvin Rolando Gonzalez-Dominguez as to Lee Alexander Crossman. Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 5/10/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby, filed. (ntg2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
3 3 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Yaneli Sandoval-Parra, Selvin Rolando Gonzalez-Dominguez. Ruben R Lerma appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (mej2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
4 4 ORDER APPOINTING FEDERAL PUBLIC DEFENDER. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (mej2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 10, 2024
NOTICE OF ATTORNEY APPEARANCE Kristen D. Langford-Harris, Federal Public Defender, in case as to Lee Alexander Crossman, filed. (Langford-Harris, Kristen) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) YANELI SANDOVAL-PARRA as to Lee Alexander Crossman (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 5/10/2024. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., Bond set at $10,000 cash or surety., Additional conditions of bond are as follows: his/her deposition must be taken prior to release on bond; must appear at all court proceedings where it is necessary for you to testify as a witness or notified/subpoenaed to be back in court; provide contact information to his/her attorney and stay in contact with attorney while on release; not violate any new federal, state or local law while on bond; 3rd party custodian approved by USPO; residence approved by USPO prior to release; must inform immigration officials he/she has been designated as a material witness in a criminal case., Rights to consular notification given; material witness or their counsel may notify the Court if they request notification. MW states her true name is Yaneli Salvador-Parra. Court grants oral motion to amend affidavit. Appearances: Liesel Roscher, AUSA; Ruben Lerma f/Material Witness; USM: L. Byars. (Digital # 9:35-9:45) (ERO: Martin Solis) (Interpreter: J. Zambrana/used). (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) SELVIN ROLANDO GONZALEZ-DOMINGUEZ as to Lee Alexander Crossman (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 5/10/2024. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., Bond set at $10,000 cash or surety., Additional conditions of bond are as follows: his/her deposition must be taken prior to release on bond; must appear at all court proceedings where it is necessary for you to testify as a witness or notified/subpoenaed to be back in court; provide contact information to his/her attorney and stay in contact with attorney while on release; not violate any new federal, state or local law while on bond; 3rd party custodian approved by USPO; residence approved by USPO prior to release; must inform immigration officials he/she has been designated as a material witness in a criminal case., Rights to consular notification given; material witness or their counsel may notify the Court if they request notification. Appearances: Liesel Roscher, AUSA; Ruben Lerma f/Material Witness; USM: L. Byars. (Digital # 9:35-9:45) (ERO: Martin Solis) (Interpreter: J. Zambrana/used). (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: INITIAL APPEARANCE as to Lee Alexander Crossman (Defendant informed of rights) held on 5/10/2024. Defendant requests appointed counsel. Financial Affidavit executed. Court grants request for appointment of counsel. Defendant consents to this hearing by video conference. Government moves for detention and requests a continuance. The Court, on their own motion, orders an expedited detention hearing. Preliminary Examination & Detention Hearing set for 5/13/2024 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby. Appearances: Liesel Roscher, AUSA; Christopher Jenkins for Defendant; USPO: Elizabeth Donez-Delgado; USM: L. Byars. (Digital # 10:00-10:15) (ERO: Martin Solis) (Interpreter: not used) Deft remanded to custody. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
5 5 BRADY ORDER on Rule 5(f) as to Lee Alexander Crossman. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B. Libby) Parties notified. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
6 6 Sealed event, filed. (kwp2) . [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
7 7 Sealed Financial Affidavit CJA 23 by Lee Alexander Crossman, filed. [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
8 8 ORDER AMENDING AFFIDAVIT FOR MATERIAL WITNESS as to Lee Alexander Crossman re: MW: correct name is Yaneli Salvador-Parra. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. (lg2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
9 9 AMENDED Affidavit for Material Witness(es) USA, MW: YANELI SALVADOR-PARRA AND SELVIN ROLANDO GONZALEZ-DOMINGUEZ as to Lee Alexander Crossman, filed. (lg2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
10 10 Pretrial Services Report (Sealed) as to Lee Alexander Crossman, filed. (nrc2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby: PRELIMINARY EXAMINATION & DETENTION HEARING as to Lee Alexander Crossman held on 5/13/2024 Defendant waives preliminary hearing and detention hearing without prejudice in open court. Court may rely upon the complaint as the testimony of the agent for purposes of weighing the evidence during the detention hearing. Court may reconsider the issue of detention if the defendant's personal information is verified, a suitable release plan is established and the pending warrant is resolved. Appearances: Patricia Booth, AUSA; Kristen Langford-Harris f/Defendant; USPO: Alyssa Barrera ; USM: S. Cordero. (Digital # 11:56-11:59) (ERO: Daniel Rosales) (Interpreter: not used) Deft remanded to custody. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
11 11 ORDER OF DETENTION PENDING TRIAL as to Lee Alexander Crossman ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Jason B Libby) Parties notified. (kwp2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2024
***Set/Reset Hearings as to Lee Alexander Crossman: Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 6/4/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock (fmc2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
12 12 NOTICE of designation of a material witness by USA as to Lee Alexander Crossman, filed. (Burkett, Young Min) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Affidavit for Material Witness
13 13 NOTICE of Motion to designate a material witness by USA as to Lee Alexander Crossman, filed. (Burkett, Young Min) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Material Witness
14 14 ORDER - Related document(s)12 ,13 as to Lee Alexander Crossman (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (fmc2) Material Witness Oscar Hernandez-Sandoval added to the case; Initial Appearance set for June 4, 2024 at 9:30 am before U.S. Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock. [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
15 15 Affidavit for Material Witness(es) Oscar Hernandez-Sandoval as to Lee Alexander Crossman Initial Appearance for Material Witness set for 6/4/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock, filed. (fmc2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
16 16 VACATED PER D.E.18 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Oscar Hernandez-Sandoval. Ruben R Lerma appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (jdr2) Modified on 6/3/2024 (lg2). [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
17 17 ORDER APPOINTING COUNSEL for Material Witness(es): Oscar Hernandez-Sandoval. Rene C Flores appointed. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (jdr2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
18 18 ORDER VACATING ORDER APPOINTING CJA COUNSEL FOR MATERIAL WITNESS as to Lee Alexander Crossma, Attorney Ruben R Lerma, Jr terminated in case as to Lee Alexander Crossman. ( Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (lg2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2024
Minute Entry for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock: INITIAL APPEARANCE OF MATERIAL WITNESS(ES) Oscar Hernandez-Sandoval as to Lee Alexander Crossman (Material Witness(es) informed of rights) held on 6/4/2024. Material Witness consents to this hearing by video conference. Court finds Material Witness qualifies for appointed counsel and counsel is appointed and present in court., AUSA moves for detention., Material Witness counsel states his/her client wishes to waive their detention hearing. Court accepts wiaiver of detention hearing. Appearances: Ashley Elizabeth Jurk Martin, AUSA; Rene C. Flores f/Material Witness; USPO: Alyssa Barrera; USM: Deputy Buttitta. (Digital # 9:32-9:38) (ERO: Martin Solis) (Interpreter: J. Zambrana/used). (asm2) [2:24-mj-00198]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2024
19 19 INDICTMENT (The original indictment with the signature of the grand jury foreperson is on file under seal with the clerk) as to Lee Alexander Crossman (1) count(s) 1-3, filed. (fmc2)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Unredacted attachment
20 20 US Attys Criminal Docket Sheet as to Lee Alexander Crossman, filed. (fmc2)
Related: [-]
21 21 SCHEDULING ORDER as to Lee Alexander Crossman. Arraignment set for 6/14/2024 at 10:15 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock. Final Pretrial Conference set for 8/1/2024 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock. Jury Trial set for 8/12/2024 at 08:30 AM before Judge David S. Morales. (Signed by Magistrate Judge Mitchel Neurock) Parties notified. (fmc2)
Related: [-]