InnoBrilliance, LLC v. TCL Technology Group Corp.
Texas Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Rodney Gilstrap |
Case #: | 2:24-cv-00491 |
Nature of Suit | 830 Property Rights - Patent |
Cause | 35:271 Patent Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jul 05, 2024 |
Terminated: | Sep 13, 2024 |
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 01, 2025 2:35 AM CST |
Defendant
TCL Technology Group Corp.
|
|
Plaintiff
InnoBrilliance, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT |
Friday, September 13, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (CH) |
|
7 | 7
![]() ORDER granting6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Court ACCEPTS AND ACKNOWLEDGES that allclaims asserted in the above-captioned case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/13/2024. (CH) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by InnoBrilliance, LLC(Rabicoff, Isaac) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Monday, July 08, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() SUMMONS Issued as to TCL Technology Group Corp.. (CH) |
|
Friday, July 05, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac) |
|
3 | 3
![]() Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) |
|
2 | 2
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Phillip Rabicoff on behalf of InnoBrilliance, LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against TCL Technology Group Corp. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10223581.), filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC.(Rabicoff, Isaac) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
utility
Add and Terminate Judges
Fri 07/05 2:10 PM
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap added. (KLC) |
||
notice
Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability
Fri 07/05 2:11 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (KLC) |