Texas Eastern District Court
Judge:Rodney Gilstrap
Case #: 2:24-cv-00491
Nature of Suit830 Property Rights - Patent
Cause35:271 Patent Infringement
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2024
Terminated:Sep 13, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 01, 2025 2:35 AM CST
Defendant
TCL Technology Group Corp.
Plaintiff
InnoBrilliance, LLC
Represented By
Isaac Phillip Rabicoff
Rabicoff Law LLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Friday, September 13, 2024
8 8 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Fri 09/13 3:20 PM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) at termination of case. AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (CH)
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Order Dismissing Case Fri 09/13 3:19 PM
ORDER granting6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal. Court ACCEPTS AND ACKNOWLEDGES that allclaims asserted in the above-captioned case are DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by District Judge Rodney Gilstrap on 9/13/2024. (CH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Thu 09/12 4:04 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by InnoBrilliance, LLC(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, July 08, 2024
5 5 service Summons Issued Mon 07/08 7:44 AM
SUMMONS Issued as to TCL Technology Group Corp.. (CH)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
4 4 1 pgs notice Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120) Fri 07/05 8:53 AM
Notice of Filing of Patent/Trademark Form (AO 120). AO 120 emailed to the Director of the U.S. Patent and Trademark Office. (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Disclosure Statement/Certificate of Interested Persons Fri 07/05 8:51 AM
Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(a)(1) Disclosure Statement filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 07/05 8:49 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Isaac Phillip Rabicoff on behalf of InnoBrilliance, LLC (Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
1 1 7 pgs cmp Complaint Fri 07/05 8:42 AM
COMPLAINT for Patent Infringement against TCL Technology Group Corp. ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number ATXEDC-10223581.), filed by InnoBrilliance, LLC.(Rabicoff, Isaac)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4,
Att: 5 Civil Cover Sheet
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 07/05 2:10 PM
District Judge Rodney Gilstrap added. (KLC)
Related: [-]
notice Notice of Magistrate Judge Availability Fri 07/05 2:11 PM
In accordance with the provisions of 28 USC Section 636(c), you are hereby notified that a U.S. Magistrate Judge of this district court is available to conduct any or all proceedings in this case including a jury or non-jury trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. The form[LINK:Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge] is available on our website. All signed consent forms, excluding pro se parties, should be filed electronically using the event Notice Regarding Consent to Proceed Before Magistrate Judge . (KLC)
Related: [-]