California Central District Court
Judge:Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha
Referred: Steve Kim
Case #: 2:24-cv-05680
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Labor/Mgmnt. Relations
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2024
Terminated:Oct 24, 2024
Case in other court:Los Angeles County Superior Court, 24STCV09121
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 01, 2025 12:35 AM PST
Defendant
Hunt Construction Group, Inc.
Represented By
Elizabeth J MacGregor
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Steven Wong
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Pamela L Vartabedian
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Ruben Almader
Represented By
Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Kyle R Nordrehaug
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Aparajit Bhowmik
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Jesus Adolfo Sanchez Contreras
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Norman B Blumenthal
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Andrew Gavin Ronan
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik And De Blouw LLP
contact info
Nicholas J De Blouw
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info
Christine T. LeVu
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw
contact info
Kyle R. Nordrehaug
Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Thursday, October 24, 2024
28 28 misc Receipt of Case by Other District (Electronic Case Transfer) Thu 10/24 4:46 PM
TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from Southern District of California, 3:24-cv-01980 filed 10/24/2024. (rolm)
Related: [-]
27 27 order Transferring Case Thu 10/24 1:42 PM
ORDER APPROVING JOINT STIPULATION TO TRANSFER VENUE26 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: On October 23, 2024, Plaintiff Ruben Almader and Defendant Hunt Construction Group, Inc. filed a Stipulation to Transfer Venue. The parties state they agree venue is appropriate in the United States District Court for the Southern District of California and consent to transfer this action to that district, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1404(a). The court hereby APPROVES the Stipulation and ORDERS that this action be transferred to the United States District Court for the Southern District of California. (Case electronically transferred to USDC Southern District of California on 10/24/2024. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (lc) Modified on 10/24/2024 (lc).
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 23, 2024
26 26 stip Change Venue Wed 10/23 4:47 PM
Joint STIPULATION to Change Venue to USDC for the Southern District of California filed by Defendant Hunt Construction Group, Inc..(MacGregor, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, October 21, 2024
25 25 stip Extending Time to Answer (30 days or less) Mon 10/21 4:30 PM
Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Hunt Construction Group, Inc. answer now due 11/4/2024, re Amended Complaint/Petition24 , Order on Motion to Dismiss Case,,23 filed by Defendant Hunt Construction Group, Inc..(MacGregor, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 23, 2024
24 24 othcmp Amended Complaint/Petition Mon 09/23 4:35 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendant Hunt Construction Group, Inc. amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Ruben Almader(Rivapalacio, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
23 23 order Dismiss Case Fri 09/20 12:07 PM
ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION FOR LEAVE TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT22 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. The court, having considered parties' Stipulation and finding good cause therefor, hereby APPROVES the Parties request and ORDERS as follows: 1. Plaintiff Ruben Almader ("Plaintiff") is granted leave to file the First Amended Complaint ("FAC"), a copy of which was attached as Exhibit 1 to the Stipulation, within seven (7) days of this Order; 2. Defendant Hunt Construction Group, Inc. ("Defendant") shall respond to the FAC within thirty (30) days of receipt of the FAC; and 3. Defendant's Motion to Dismiss the Complaint (Dkt. 11) is DENIED without prejudice as moot. (rolm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
22 22 stip Leave Tue 09/17 10:37 AM
Joint STIPULATION for Leave to For Plaintiff To File A First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ruben Almader.(LeVu, Christine)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Monday, September 16, 2024
21 21 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Mon 09/16 4:07 PM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING STIPULATION (DKT.20 )) by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court STRIKES the parties' STIPULATION FOR LEAVE FOR PLAINTIFF TO FILE A FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT for failure to attest on the signature page of the document that all other signatories listed, who electronically signed with a "s" and on whose behalf the filing is submitted, concur in the content of and have authorized the filing. See Local Rule 5-4.3.4. Any renewed stipulation must comply with all applicable statutes and Local Rules. Failure to comply with all applicable statutes and Local Rules in any renewed stipulation, including Local Rule 5-4.3.4, may result in the denial of the stipulation with prejudice. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf)
Related: [-]
20 20 stip Leave Mon 09/16 2:28 PM
(STRICKEN ON SEPTEMBER 16, 2024; REFER TO CM/ECF NO. 21). Joint STIPULATION for Leave to For Plaintiff To File A First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Ruben Almader.(Rivapalacio, Victoria) Modified on 9/16/2024 (tf)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Thursday, September 12, 2024
19 19 notice Appearance Thu 09/12 4:41 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christine T. LeVu on behalf of Plaintiff Ruben Almader (LeVu, Christine)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
18 18 18 pgs respm Memorandum in Opposition to Motion Fri 09/06 4:46 PM
MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case 11 filed by Plaintiff Ruben Almader. (Rivapalacio, Victoria)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2024
17 17 order Scheduling Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings Wed 08/21 4:04 PM
SCHEDULING AND TRIAL ORDER by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: Jury Trial, Final Pretrial Conference and Hearing on Motions in Limine: TO BE SET. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR ALL SPECIFIED DEADLINES TO BE SET AND SET). (lc)
Related: [-]
16 16 order Order/Referral to ADR (No 2) (Mediation Panel) (ADR-12) Wed 08/21 10:10 AM
ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. ADR Proceeding to be held no later than 05/01/2026. (tf)
Related: [-]
15 15 textonly Text Only Scheduling Notice Wed 08/21 8:23 AM
(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha: The court has reviewed the Joint Rule 26(f) Report submitted by the parties, and determines that an in-person Scheduling Conference is unnecessary. Accordingly, the court VACATES the August 23, 2024, Scheduling Conference. Order re Jury/Court Trial to issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (tf)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
14 14 misc Joint Report Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan Fri 08/09 4:55 PM
JOINT REPORT Rule 26(f) Discovery Plan ; estimated length of trial 5-45 days, filed by Plaintiff Ruben Almader.. (Sanchez Contreras, Jesus)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 15, 2024
13 13 order Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only Mon 07/15 12:20 PM
ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. Scheduling Conference set for 8/23/2024 at 01:00 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
12 12 order Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only Mon 07/15 12:14 PM
INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (tf)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 12, 2024
11 11 motion Dismiss Case Fri 07/12 2:48 PM
NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Hunt Construction Group, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 9/27/2024 at 01:30 PM before Judge Fernando L. Aenlle-Rocha. (MacGregor, Elizabeth)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defendant Hunt Construction Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss,
Att: 2 Exhibit (Request for Judicial Notice in Support of Defendant Hunt Construction Group, Inc.'s Motion to Dismiss),
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 10, 2024
10 10 notice Appearance Wed 07/10 3:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jesus Adolfo Sanchez Contreras on behalf of Plaintiff Ruben Almader (Attorney Jesus Adolfo Sanchez Contreras added to party Ruben Almader(pty:pla))(Sanchez Contreras, Jesus)
Related: [-]
9 9 notice Appearance Wed 07/10 3:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Victoria Bree Rivapalacio on behalf of Plaintiff Ruben Almader (Attorney Victoria Bree Rivapalacio added to party Ruben Almader(pty:pla))(Rivapalacio, Victoria)
Related: [-]
8 8 notice Notice to Counsel Re: Consent to Proceed Before a US Magistrate Judge - optional html form Wed 07/10 8:30 AM
Notice to Counsel Re Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge. (ghap)
Related: [-]
7 7 adr Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form Wed 07/10 8:29 AM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
Related: [-]
6 6 notice Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form Wed 07/10 8:29 AM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando L Aenlle-Rocha and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (ghap)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 05, 2024
5 5 service Proof of Service (subsequent documents) Fri 07/05 11:54 AM
PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Hunt Construction Group, Inc., re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties3 , Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Corporate Disclosure Statement4 served on July 5, 2024. (Vartabedian, Pamela)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/05 11:50 AM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hunt Construction Group, Inc. (Vartabedian, Pamela)
Related: [-]
3 3 notice Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties Fri 07/05 11:47 AM
CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hunt Construction Group, Inc., (Vartabedian, Pamela)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) Fri 07/05 11:44 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Hunt Construction Group, Inc.. (Vartabedian, Pamela)
Related: [-]
1 1 notice Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening) Fri 07/05 11:41 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 24STCV09121 Receipt No: ACACDC-37779371 - Fee: $405, filed by Defendant Hunt Construction Group, Inc.. (Attorney Pamela L Vartabedian added to party Hunt Construction Group, Inc.(pty:dft))(Vartabedian, Pamela)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Declaration of Philip Perry in Support of Defendant's Notice of Removal to Federal Court Pursuant to USC Sections 1331 and 1441(a)
cmp Complaint - (Discovery) Fri 07/05 3:47 PM
CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Does 1 through 50, inclusive, Hunt Construction Group, Inc. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiff Ruben Almader. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/11/2024 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A) (ghap)
Related: [-]