Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Cecilia M Altonaga
Referred: Lisette M Reid
Case #: 1:24-cv-22563
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity
Case Filed:Jul 05, 2024
Last checked: Wednesday Jan 01, 2025 3:38 AM EST
Consol Defendant
Robert M Koffler
Represented By
Leoncio Ernesto De La Pena
De La Pena Group, PA
contact info
Consol Defendant
Maite, LLC
1111 Brickell Avenue Suite 2150
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Leoncio Ernesto De La Pena
De La Pena Group, PA
contact info
Consol Defendant
RMK NGENGA, LLC
1111 Brickell Avenue Suite 2150 C/O Robert Koffler
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Leoncio Ernesto De La Pena
De La Pena Group, PA
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
530 Mashta, LLC
Represented By
Melanie Emmons Damian
Damian & Valori LLP
contact info
Kristopher E. Pearson
Damian Valori Culmo
contact info
Consol Plaintiff
Tri-Cap Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Melanie Emmons Damian
Damian & Valori LLP
contact info
Kristopher E. Pearson
Damian Valori Culmo
contact info
Counter Claimant
Robert M Koffler
Represented By
Leoncio Ernesto De La Pena
De La Pena Group, PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
Maite, LLC
Represented By
Leoncio Ernesto De La Pena
De La Pena Group, PA
contact info
Counter Claimant
RMK NGENGA, LLC
Represented By
Leoncio Ernesto De La Pena
De La Pena Group, PA
contact info
Counter Defendant
530 Mashta, LLC
Represented By
Melanie Emmons Damian
Damian & Valori LLP
contact info
Kristopher E. Pearson
Damian Valori Culmo
contact info
Defendant
Maite, LLC
a Florida Limited Liability Company 1111 Brickell Avenue Suite 2150
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Leoncio Ernesto De La Pena
De La Pena Group, PA
contact info
Mediator
Raoul G. Cantero
Plaintiff
Reinsurance Partners Investments
a Florida Limited Liability Company 1441 Brickell Avenue Suite 1210
Miami, FL 33131
Represented By
Melanie Emmons Damian
Damian & Valori LLP
contact info
Kristopher E. Pearson
Damian Valori Culmo
contact info

GPO Dec 26 2024
ORDER denying 44 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 12/26/2024. See attached document for full details. (ps1)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Tuesday, May 20, 2025
101 101 order Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Tue 05/20 12:57 PM
ORDER granting95 Motion to Allow Remote Testimony of Non-Party Witness, Keith S. Sharkey, CPA. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/20/2025. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
Monday, May 19, 2025
100 100 respm Reply in Support of Motion Mon 05/19 3:05 PM
REPLY in Support of Motion re95 MOTION to Allow the Remote Testimony of Non-Party Witness, Keith S. Sharkey, CPA . filed by Maite, LLC, Robert M Koffler, RMK NGENGA, LLC. (De La Pena, Leoncio)
Related: [-]
99 99 notice Notice of Striking Mon 05/19 7:51 AM
NOTICE of Striking97 Response in Opposition to Motion, filed by 530 Mashta, LLC, Tri-Cap Holdings, LLC, Reinsurance Partners Investments by 530 Mashta, LLC, 530 Mashta, LLC, Reinsurance Partners Investments, Tri-Cap Holdings, LLC, 530 Mashta, LLC (Damian, Melanie)
Related: [-]
98 98 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/19 7:46 AM
RESPONSE in Opposition re95 MOTION to Allow the Remote Testimony of Non-Party Witness, Keith S. Sharkey, CPA filed by 530 Mashta, LLC, Reinsurance Partners Investments, Tri-Cap Holdings, LLC. Replies due by 5/27/2025.(Damian, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
97 97 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Mon 05/19 7:38 AM
Stricken per DE99 -RESPONSE in Opposition re95 MOTION to Allow the Remote Testimony of Non-Party Witness, Keith S. Sharkey, CPA Plaintiff's Response in Opposition to Defendants' Urgent Motion to Allow the Remote Testimony of Non-Party Witness, Keith S. Sharkey, CPA filed by 530 Mashta, LLC, Reinsurance Partners Investments, Tri-Cap Holdings, LLC. Replies due by 5/27/2025.(Damian, Melanie) Modified text on 5/19/2025 (drz)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet 1
Friday, May 16, 2025
96 96 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) ~Util - Set/Reset Motion/R&R Deadlines and Hearings Fri 05/16 4:34 PM
ORDER Plaintiffs have until 8:00 a.m. on May 19, 2025, to file an expedited response to the Motion [ECF No. 95]. Defendants have until 4:00 p.m. on May 19, 2025, to file a reply. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/16/2025. See attached document for full details. (mee)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
95 95 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/15 6:59 PM
MOTION to Allow the Remote Testimony of Non-Party Witness, Keith S. Sharkey, CPA by Maite, LLC, Robert M Koffler, RMK NGENGA, LLC. (De La Pena, Leoncio)
Related: [-]
94 94 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment Thu 05/15 11:18 AM
ORDER granting93 Motion to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom. Signed by Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga on 5/15/2025. See attached document for full details. (ps1)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 14, 2025
93 93 motion Bring Electronic Equipment Wed 05/14 4:34 PM
Joint MOTION to Bring Electronic Equipment into the courtroom by 530 Mashta, LLC, Reinsurance Partners Investments, Tri-Cap Holdings, LLC. Responses due by 5/28/2025.(Damian, Melanie)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
92 92 minutes Calendar Call Tue 05/13 9:36 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Chief Judge Cecilia M. Altonaga: Calendar Call held on 5/13/2025. Total time in court: 5 minutes. Attorney Appearances: Melanie Emmons Damian & Leoncio Ernesto De La Pena. Court Reporter: Stephanie McCarn, 305-523-5518 / Stephanie_McCarn@flsd.uscourts.gov. (csx)
Related: [-]